Douglas Dynamics, LLC v. Buyers Products Company

Plaintiff: Douglas Dynamics, LLC
Defendant: Buyers Products Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00261
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Milwaukee
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:183 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2010 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting trial deadlines re: expert background/experience statements, deposition summaries and exhibits. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/29/2010. (llj)
October 1, 2010 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on telephone hearing held 9/30/2010 re: 218 Renewed Motion for Sanctions filed by Douglas Dynamics, LLC. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/30/2010. (llj)
October 1, 2010 332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 136 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 158 Motion for Summary Judgment. ; granting in part and denying in part 170 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/1/2010. (mfh)
October 6, 2010 445 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 166 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/6/2010. (mfh)
October 8, 2010 478 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER confirming rulings made at 10/7/2010 final pretrial re: motions in limine. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/8/2010. (llj)
October 8, 2010 479 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on objections to deposition narratives. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/8/2010. (llj)
September 28, 2011 549 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered. (WMC / PAO) Signed by Judge William M. Conley and Clerk of Court Peter Oppeneer on 9/28/2011. (llj)
September 27, 2013 578 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing schedule. Initial briefs due by 10/11/02013, Responses due by 10/25/2013. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/27/2013. (voc)
February 13, 2014 609 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Defendant Buyers Products Company's Motions for Reconsideration and For Leave to File Supplemental Brief Regarding Invalidity (dkts. ## 594 , 595 ) are DENIED;Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination (dkt. # 605 ) is DENIE D;Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Briefs (dkt. # 602 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Motions in Limine are now due on Friday, March 14, 2014, with responses due Friday, March 28, 2014; while all other dates remain the same. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/13/2014. (voc)
March 13, 2014 611 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Granting plaintiff's motions for summary judgment of no invalidity (dkt. #120) and infringement (dkt. #158) and denying defendant's motions for summary judgment of invalidity (kdt. #166) and non-infringement (dkt. #170). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 03/13/2014. (mfh)
April 4, 2014 701 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ruling on motions in limine. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/4/14. (krj)
April 21, 2014 732 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff Douglas Dynamics, LLC against defendant Buyers Products Company in the amount of $ 9,750,000.00 and entering injunction against defendant. (WMC / PAO). (rep)
December 31, 2014 805 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff Douglas Dynamics, LLC's 749 motion to alter or amend judgment; denying defendant Buyers Products Company's 755 motion to alter or amend judgment; denying defendant's 757 moti on for judgment as a matter of law; granting defendant's 770 motion for leave to file a supplemental brief in support of its motion to alter or amend. The clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of Douglas Dynamics in the amount of $9,935,983. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/31/2014. (nln)
January 5, 2015 806 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Douglas Dynamics, LLC against Buyers Products Company in the amount of $9,935,983.00. (PAO/nln) (nln)
November 18, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on claims construction; no claims construction hearing to be held; terms identified by the court to be construed using the parties' written submissions. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/17/2009. (llj)
March 2, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing claims and amending scheduling order; denying 71 defendant's motion to exclude expert opinions. Dispositive motions due 5/3/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/2/2010. (llj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas Dynamics, LLC v. Buyers Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Dynamics, LLC
Represented By: George H. Solveson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buyers Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.