Toshiba Corporation v. Imation Corp. et al.
Plaintiff: Toshiba Corporation
Defendant: Imation Corp., Moser Baer India Ltd., Glyphics Media, Inc., CMC Magnetics Corp., Hotan Corp., Khypermedia Corp., Ritek Corp. and Advanced Media, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00305
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER denying 485 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law re direct infringement of '966 patent; granting 516 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law re pre-suit damages; denying 518 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and alternative mot ion for new trial; granting in part and denying in part 520 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law 43 induced infringement of '751 and '966 patents; denying 522 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law re direct infringement of '966 patent; denying 534 Motion for Relief from Judgment re exhaustion of '751 patent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/31/13. (krj)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 499 JUDGMENT entered partially in favor of Plaintiff Toshiba Corporation and partially in favor of defendant. (SLC / PAO). (rep)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER re: motions in limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/26/13. (krj)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 280 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Advanced Media, Inc., CMC Magnetics Corp., Glyphics Media, Inc., Hotan Corp., Imation Corp., Khypermedia Corp., Moser Baer India Ltd., and Ritek Corp. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 1/7/11. (krj)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting 198 Unopposed Motion for Amended Court Order to Obtain Testimonial Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/30/10. (krj)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 195 Motion for Court Order to Obtain Testimonial Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/23/10. (krj)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order Construing Claims "pit", "reflecting layer formed on said substrate", "track pitch", and "said information being reproduced by projecting a light beam via an objective lens" from the '651 patent; &qu ot;pit" from the '751 patent; and "number-of-recording planes identifying information", and "recording-plane identifying information that uniquely identifies that recording plane" from the '966 patent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/10/10. (krj)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order granting 74 motion for construction of claim terms filed by plaintiff; granting in part and denying in part 69 motion for construction of claim terms filed by defendants. Claims construction hearing set for 2/26/10 at 9:00 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/19/10. (krj) Modified docket text on 2/10/2010 (krj).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toshiba Corporation v. Imation Corp. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Catherine Cetrangolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imation Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moser Baer India Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glyphics Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Magnetics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotan Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khypermedia Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ritek Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?