Jenkins v. Wisconsin Resource Center et al
Plaintiff: James Jenkins, III
Defendant: Wisconsin Resource Center, Byron Bartow, PCT's and Tom Speech
Case Number: 3:2009cv00323
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order appointing attorneys Christopher C. Davis and John C. Scheller to represent the plaintiff in this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/13/2010. (jef),(ps)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order denying 25 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by James Freeman. Case stayed pending appointment of counsel; 8/16/2010 trial date stricken. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/15/2010. (eds),(ps)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order on Status Conference. Plaintiff's declaration or supplemental materials due 6/22/2010. Defendant's reply due 7/2/2010. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/9/2010. (eds),(ps)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order setting telephone status conference for 6/7/10 at 10:00. Counsel for defendant responsible for setting up the call to Chambers. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/28/10. (elc),(ps)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel and for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/5/09. (elc),(ps)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order dismissing complaint; plaintiff to submit amended complaint that provides adequate notice of his claims by 7/8/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/23/09. (elc),(ps)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 9.00 assessed. ( Initial partial filing fee due by 6/15/2009.) (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Wisconsin Resource Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jenkins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Resource Center
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Bartow
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCT's
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Speech
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?