United States of America v. Williams

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Raymond J. Williams
Case Number: 3:2009cv00405
Filed: June 25, 2009
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/15/10. (krj)
July 20, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Enforce IRS Summons re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/20/09. (krj)
July 16, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/16/2009. (llj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard D. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond J. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?