Williams v. Raemisch et al
Plaintiff: Derek Williams
Defendant: Rick Raemisch, Welcome Rose, William Pollard, Lt. Campbell, Diane Longsine and Jane/John Doe
Case Number: 3:2009cv00485
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants dismissing the case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 10/8/2010. (jef),(ps)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/8/10. (elc),(ps)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Reconsideration - the order compelling the production of documents in plaintiff's requests 1-4 is vacated ; denying 44 Motion for Reconsideration of the denial of plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel; denying 43 Motion for extension of time ; defendants' motion for summary judgment is now taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/22/10. (elc),(ps)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Compel. Defendants must provide the requested information not later than 8/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/16/2010. (jef),(ps)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 17 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/9/2010. (eds),(ps)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 4 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff to identify by 10/20/09 which lawsuits he wishes to pursue or submit an amended complaint that complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 and 20. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/5/09. (elc),(ps)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that plaintiff's complaint violates Rule 20. Plaintiff to identify by 10/2/09 which lawsuits he wishes to pursue. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/17/09. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Raemisch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welcome Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Longsine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?