Julka v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Peter T. Julka
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00534
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Standard Insurance Company dismissing the case. ( PAO). Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 11/22/2010. (jef),(ps)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying as moot plaintiff's 51 Motion for Court to Hold Matter in Abeyance Until the end of 10.18.2010 re 16 Pretrial Conference Order; denying plaintiff's 52 Motion for Leave to File; denying plaintiff's 53 Motion to Ame nd/Correct. Because plaintiff has failed to file any opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment, it will be taken under advisement and decided as the court's calendar permits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/2/2010. (jef),(ps)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss claims for breach of contract, promissory estoppel and bad faith; denying 31 motion for extension of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/27/2010. (eds),(ps)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying as moot 20 Motion for Extension of Time and 11 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 19 Motion to Amend Complaint. The amended complaint is the operative pleading in this case Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/16/09. (elc),(ps)
November 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that plaintiff is to submit a brief in opposition to defendants motion to dismiss by 12/10/09 or the clerk of court is directed to enter judgment dismissing the case with prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/25/09. (elc),(ps)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing clerk of court to calendar another pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/14/2009. (eds),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Julka v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter T. Julka
Represented By: Kenneth B. Axe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: W. Sebastian von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?