Kiemde v. Dorochoff
Plaintiff: Francois Xavier Kiemde
Defendant: Ruth Dorochoff
Case Number: 3:2009cv00660
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Each party to bear its own attorneys fees, costs and disbursements. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/1/10. (elc),(ps)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order that plaintiff has until 1/29/10 to advise what steps he has taken to serve the complaint on the defendant or case to be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/8/10. (elc),(ps)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff directed to serve complaint. Proof of service to be submitted by 1/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/3/09. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiemde v. Dorochoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois Xavier Kiemde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Dorochoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?