Bushmaker v. A.W. Chesterton Company et al
Plaintiff: Gerald F. Bushmaker
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company, CBS Corporation, Durabla Manufacturing Company, General Electric Company, Rapid American Corporation and Union Carbide Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv00726
Filed: December 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Wood
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting defendant's motion in limine #23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/5/2013. (lak)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (certified copy). Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of MDL Panel on 5/29/12. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 ED PA docket sheet) (krj) Modified on 6/5/2012 (krj).
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER remanding action from MDL. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 5/29/12. (rep)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order. Case closed. (krj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bushmaker v. A.W. Chesterton Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald F. Bushmaker
Represented By: Michael P. Cascino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durabla Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?