Lush v. Hill
Plaintiff: William Stephen Lush, II
Defendant: Belinda Hill
Case Number: 3:2010cv00064
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 12 Motion for Dismissal under Rule 42(a). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/12/2010. (jef),(ps)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Leave to proceed ifp on appeal denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/12/2010. (eds),(ps)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 6 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/1/2010. (eds),(ps)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant dismissing the case. ( PAO) Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/11/2010. (eds),(ps)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on ifp request: Partial filing fee of $175 assessed. Partial filing fee due 3/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/12/10. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lush v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Stephen Lush, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?