Parrish v. Pugh
Petitioner: Michael C. Parrish
Respondent: Jeffrey Pugh
Case Number: 3:2010cv00076
Filed: February 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Chippewa
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Respondent dismissing with prejudice the petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 6/11/10. (elc),(ps)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing with prejudice 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/10/2010. (eds),(ps)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order : Petitioner to submit $5 filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis and a signed statement that the petition was submitted under penalty of perjury, as required by Rule 2(c)(5) by 3/3/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/17/10. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish v. Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael C. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Pugh
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?