Apple, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Apple, Inc.
Defendant: Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00661
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2012 Filing 45 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (rep)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER closing this case administratively. Case may be reopened by either party at any time. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/27/12. (rep)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 42 Motion to Admit Robert Vlasis Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/26/2012. (llj)
September 26, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer: Status Conference held on 9/26/2012 [:15] (jaf)
September 25, 2012 Filing 42 Motion to Admit Robert T. Vlasis, III Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice fee $50 receipt number 0758-1054205) by Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Vlasis, Robert) Modified on 9/26/2012 (llj).
August 24, 2012 Set Status Conference: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/26/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at 608-261-5795. (llj)
April 13, 2012 Filing 41 Status Report Regarding Related Investigations in the United States International Trade Commission by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. (Schmidt, Jill)
April 10, 2012 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine Cetrangolo for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc. (Cetrangolo, Catherine) Modified on 4/11/2012 (llj).
April 2, 2012 Action Requested: Counsel are requested to file a brief status report by 4/13/2012 re: 745 and 750 Investigations. (llj)
March 27, 2012 Filing 39 Notice by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. of Attorney Name Change from Jill Jane Ho to Jill Jane Schmidt . (Schmidt, Jill) Modified on 3/28/2012 (llj).
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/22/2012. (llj)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw by Godfrey & Kahn, S.C., James D. Peterson and Bryan J. Cahill as Attorneys for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/27/2011. (llj)
September 26, 2011 Filing 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Godfrey & Kahn, S.C. by Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc.. Response due 10/3/2011. (Peterson, James)
July 8, 2011 Filing 35 Notice by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. of Change of Address as to Attorneys Matthew D. Powers and Steven S. Cherensky. (Peterson, James)
June 2, 2011 Filing 34 Status Report by Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
June 2, 2011 Filing 33 Status Report by Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc. (Peterson, James)
May 16, 2011 Action Requested: Counsel are requested to electronically file a brief status report re: related ITC investigations by 6/2/2011. (llj)
March 8, 2011 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa Nester Kass for Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Kass, Lisa)
February 28, 2011 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance by Covington & Burling, LLP (Robert Fram, Christine Haskett, Samuel Ernst, Winslow Taub) for Plaintiff Apple, Inc. (Peterson, James) Modified text on 3/1/2011 (llj/c).
February 28, 2011 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance by Robert T. Haslam as counsel for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc. (Haslam, Robert) Modified text on 3/1/2011 (llj/c).
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 28 Motion to Withdraw Patricia Young as Attorney for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/25/2011. (llj)
February 18, 2011 Filing 28 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw by Patricia Young as Attorney for Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Response due 2/25/2011. (Peterson, James) Modified text on 2/22/2011 (llj/c).
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Order granting motion to admit David A. Nelson pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/8/2011. (llj)
January 24, 2011 Action Requested: CM/ECF registration required by Attorneys Verhoeven and Nelson prior to admission pro hac vice. (llj)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Order granting motion to admit Jennifer Bauer Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/6/2011. (llj)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 **TEXT ONLY ORDER**Order granting motion to admit Alexander Rudis Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/29/2010. (llj)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Order granting motion to admit Edward DeFranco pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/21/2010. (llj)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 15 Motion to Admit Kevin Johnson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/15/2010. (llj)
December 14, 2010 Filing 22 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) Modified docket text on 12/15/2010 (jas).
December 14, 2010 Filing 21 Declaration of Alexander Rudis filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 20 Declaration of Jennifer Bauer filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 19 Declaration of Edward DeFranco filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 18 Declaration of Kevin Johnson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 17 Declaration of David Nelson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 16 Declaration of Charles Verhoeven filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hansen, Scott) Modified on 12/15/2010 (jas/t).
December 14, 2010 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca Frihart Kennedy for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
December 2, 2010 Notice: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial set for 12/17/2010, 9:30 AM, is cancelled. (llj)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay Apple's Claims and Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Counterclaims. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/2/2010. (llj)
November 30, 2010 Filing 12 Joint Motion to Stay Apple Inc.'s Claims and Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Counterclaims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659(a). Response due 12/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple's ITC Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 337-TA-750 Federal Register Notice of Institution, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Mobility's ITC Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 337-TA-745 Federal Register Notice of Institution) (Peterson, James) Modified text on 12/1/2010 (llj/p).
November 29, 2010 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2010 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Note: This is the same date and time as the pretrial set in Case No. 10-cv-662-bbc, Apple v. Motorola). Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (llj)
November 29, 2010 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
November 12, 2010 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Jacqueline Tatjana Harlow for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc. (Harlow, Jacqueline)
November 12, 2010 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motorola, Inc. served on 11/2/2010, answer due 11/23/2010. (Peterson, James) Modified on 11/12/2010 from defendant to plaintiff as the filer. (vob).
November 12, 2010 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motorola Mobility, Inc. served on 11/2/2010, answer due 11/23/2010. (Peterson, James) Modified on 11/12/2010 from defendant to plaintiff as the filer. (vob)
November 9, 2010 Filing 8 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott) Modified docket text on 11/10/2010 (jas).
November 9, 2010 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
November 9, 2010 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Claimant Motorola, Inc., Defendant Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
November 9, 2010 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple, Inc. by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent No. 5,359,317, # 2 Exhibit B - Patent No. 5,636,223, # 3 Exhibit C - Patent No. 6,246,697, # 4 Exhibit D - Patent No. 6,246,862, # 5 Exhibit E - Patent No. 6,272,333, # 6 Exhibit F - Patent No. 7,751,826) (Hansen, Scott) Added exhibit labels on 11/10/2010 (jas).
November 1, 2010 Filing 4 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (llj)
November 1, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Motorola, Inc. (Main Document) and Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Motorola Mobility) (llj)
November 1, 2010 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: Briefing Guidelines, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order Regarding Assignment of Civil Cases, Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, Order on Dispositive Motions. (llj)
October 29, 2010 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. (Peterson, James)
October 29, 2010 Filing 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 34690009111.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 7,812,828, issued 10/12/2010, held by Apple Inc. ; Patent # 7,663,607, issued 02/16/2010, held by Apple Inc. ; Patent # 5,379,430, issued 01/03/1995, held by Apple Inc. , filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 7,812,828, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent 7,663,607, # 3 Exhibit C - US Patent 5,379,430, # 4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, # 5 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons - Motorola, Inc., # 7 Summons - Motorola Mobility, Inc.) (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 11/1/2010 (jas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: James Donald Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?