Apple, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Apple, Inc.
Defendant: Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00662
Filed: October 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2011 Filing 277 Letter from Clementine Blanc, Chief of International Civil and Commercial Aid, Paris, France. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (voc)
December 1, 2011 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Illinois. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (voc)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER transferring case to Norther District of Illinois. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/30/2011. (voc)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting 274 Stipulation for Documentary Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/29/2011. (voc)
November 28, 2011 Filing 274 Stipulation for Documentary Evidence by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. (Haskett, Christine)
November 28, 2011 Filing 273 Notice of Appearance filed by Raymond N. Nimrod for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Nimrod, Raymond)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 271 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition due 12/2/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/23/2011. (voc)
November 22, 2011 Filing 271 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond and Reply to Summary Judgment Papers by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 11/29/2011. (Stathas, Lynn)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 267 Motion to Admit Michael T. Pieja Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/18/2011. (voc)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 268 Motion to Admit Lawrence Lien Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/18/2011. (voc)
November 17, 2011 Filing 268 Motion to Admit Lawrence Lien Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-882171.) by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Lien, Lawrence)
November 17, 2011 Filing 267 Motion to Admit Michael T Pieja Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-882169.) by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Pieja, Michael)
November 16, 2011 Filing 266 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond and Reply to Summary Judgment Papers by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 11/23/2011. (Stathas, Lynn)
November 16, 2011 Filing 265 Notice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re 258 Letter responding to Court's letter regarding Trial Judge/Location. (Stathas, Lynn)
November 16, 2011 Filing 264 Notice by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re 258 Letter responding to Court's letter re trial location. (Ferguson, Brian)
November 16, 2011 Filing 263 Corrected MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 12/7/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/19/2011. (Hansen, Scott)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 259 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/16/2011. (voc)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 260 Motion to Admit Cheryl Berry Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/14/2011. (voc)
November 14, 2011 Filing 260 Motion to Admit Cheryl Berry Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-879083.) by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Berry, Cheryl)
November 14, 2011 Filing 259 Motion for Leave to File Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment (Redlined version)) (Hansen, Scott)
November 10, 2011 Filing 258 Letter from the court re: Trial Judge/Location. (voc)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 256 Motion to Admit Brian E. Ferguson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/9/2011. (voc)
November 9, 2011 Filing 256 Motion to Admit Brian E. Ferguson Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-876410.) by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Ferguson, Brian)
November 8, 2011 Filing 255 Exhibit to 236 Declaration filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28 - Prosecution History for Patent No. 5,915,131, # 2 Exhibit 34 - Prosecution History for Patent No. 6,275,983, # 3 Exhibit 61 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Operations Manual) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/9/2011 (mmo).
November 8, 2011 Filing 254 Declaration of Qualcomm-Atheros filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Stipulation of Qualcomm Atheros re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 8, 2011 Filing 253 Exhibit to 236 Declaration filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 112- Part 1 - Heegard Expert Report re '559 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 112- Part 2 - Heegard Expert Report re '559 Patent) (Burrows, James) Modified exhibit descriptions on 11/8/2011 (mmo).
November 7, 2011 Filing 252 Disregard - refiled as entry 253 ; Modified on 11/8/2011; unable to open the document. (mmo).
November 7, 2011 Filing 251 Deposition of Deborah Coutant taken on July 14, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James)
November 7, 2011 Filing 250 Deposition of Boris Teksler taken on July 7, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James)
November 7, 2011 Filing 249 Deposition of Thomas Cronan taken on July 6, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James)
November 5, 2011 Filing 248 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 70 - February 19, 2002 Motorola ETSI IPR Licensing Decl., # 2 Exhibit 71 - April 8, 2003 Corr from Motorola to ETSI, # 3 Exhibit 72 - December 17, 2010 Corr from Motorola to ETSI (MOTO-APPLE-0007144810), # 4 Exhibit 73 - December 17, 2010 Corr from Motorola to ETSI (MOTO-APPLE-0007144718), # 5 Exhibit 74 - January 26, 1998 Corr from Motorola to ETSI, # 6 Exhibit 75 - September 21, 2009 Motorola ETSI IPR Licensing Decl., # 7 Exhibit 76 - December 20, 2002 Corr from Motorola to ETSI, # 8 Exhibit 77 - September 24, 2009 Motorola ETSI IPR Licensing Decl., # 9 Exhibit 78 - June 9, 2000 Corr from Motorola to ETSI, # 10 Exhibit 79 - December 17, 2010 Corr from Motorola to ETSI (MOTO-APPLE-0007144372)) (Kass, Lisa)
November 5, 2011 Filing 247 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 84 - Dialey to Rosenbrock, dated January 26, 1998, # 2 Exhibit 85 - McCormack to Rosebrock, dated December 20, 2002, # 3 Exhibit 110 - Civil Docket, Case No. 3:11-cv-00178-bbc (W.D. Wis.), # 4 Exhibit 111 - Apple's Amended Invalidity Contentions, # 5 Exhibit 115 - Order Denying Apple's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Case No. 3:11-cv-00178-bbc (W.D. Wis.), # 6 Exhibit 117 - Hearing Transcript regarding Apple's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Case No. 3:11-cv-00178-bbc (W.D. Wis.), # 7 Exhibit 118 - Prosecution History for Patent No. 6,493,002, # 8 Exhibit 119 - Order Denying Apple's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Case No. 3:11-cv-00178-bbc (W.D. Wis.), # 9 Exhibit 120 - Patent No. 5,319,712, # 10 Exhibit 122 - Patent No. 5,572,193, # 11 Exhibit 121 - Patent No. 6,175,559, # 12 Exhibit 123 - Patent No. 6,359,898, # 13 Exhibit 125 - Elihu to Haskett, dated August 22, 2011, # 14 Exhibit 126 - Apple's Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Motorola's Answer and Counterclaims to Apple's Amended Complaint, # 15 Exhibit 127 - Motorola's First Set of Interrogatories to Apple) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/7/2011; correct #120 patent number (mmo).
November 5, 2011 Filing 246 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 45 - Prosecution history for Patent No. 7,479,949, # 2 Exhibit 46 - Correspondence regarding trial witnesses, # 3 Exhibit 56 - Oxford Dictionary definition of "heuristic", # 4 Exhibit 57 - Webster's definition of "heuristic", # 5 Exhibit 59 - Droid X User Guide, # 6 Exhibit 60 - IEEE Standards Bylaws, Section 6, # 7 Exhibit 62 - ETSI's IP Rights Policy, # 8 Exhibit 63 - ETSI's Guide on IP Rights) (Burrows, James)
November 5, 2011 Filing 245 Exhibit to 236 Declaration filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 91 - March 19, 1993 Licensing Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 92 - May 17, 2000 Licensing Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 93 - July 15, 2010 Licensing Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 94 - September 30, 2000 License Agreement, # 5 Exhibit 95 - July 1, 2005 License Agreement, # 6 Exhibit 96 - December 23, 2003 License Agreement, # 7 Exhibit 97 - January 1, 2003 License Agreement, # 8 Exhibit 98 - March 28, 2003 License Agreement, # 9 Exhibit 99 - June 1, 2010 License Agreement, # 10 Exhibit 100 - April 2, 2002 License Agreement, # 11 Exhibit 101 - October 1, 2005 License Agreement, # 12 Exhibit 102 - Excerpts from Deposition of Richard Lutton (April 1, 2011), # 13 Exhibit 103 - Apple's Response to Motorola's First RFAs, # 14 Exhibit 104 - Apple's 4th Supp Obj and Resp to Motorola's 1st ROGs, # 15 Exhibit 105 - Excerpts from Deposition of Richard Lutton (July 8, 2011), # 16 Exhibit 106 - Excerpts from Deposition of Tom Mavrakakis, # 17 Exhibit 107 - August 6, 2007 Corr from Motorola to Apple, # 18 Exhibit 108 - Excerpts from Deposition of Kirk Dailey, # 19 Exhibit 109 - Excerpts from Deposition of Brian Blasius, # 20 Exhibit 112 - Heegard Expert Report re: '559 Patent - See entry 253 , # 21 Exhibit 113 - Cimini Expert Report re: '898 Patent, # 22 Exhibit 114 - Jeager Expert Report re: '712 and '193 Patents, # 23 Exhibit 116 - Royalty History, # 24 Exhibit 124 - Apple's 3d Supp Obj and Resp to Motorola's 1st ROGs) (Kass, Lisa) Modified on 11/7/2011; cannot open exhibit #112. Requested attorney refile. (mmo). Modified on 11/8/2011; see entry 253 for Exhibit #112. (mmo).
November 5, 2011 Filing 244 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39-1 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 2 Exhibit 39-2 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 3 Exhibit 39-3 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 4 Exhibit 39-4 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 5 Exhibit 39-5 - PVPlayer SDK Developer's Guide, # 6 Exhibit 43-2 - Patent No. 7,479,949, # 7 Exhibit 43-3 - Patent No. 7,479,949, # 8 Exhibit 43-1 - Patent No. 7,479,949) (Burrows, James)
November 5, 2011 Filing 243 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 82 - Excerpts from Deposition of Dominic Tolli, # 2 Exhibit 83 - Excerpts from Deposition of Tyler Brown, # 3 Exhibit 86-1 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 4 Exhibit 86-2 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 5 Exhibit 86-3 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 6 Exhibit 86-4 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 7 Exhibit 86-5 - Dailey Decl. re: Opp. to Apple's Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 8 Exhibit 87 - January 24, 1992 Licensing Agreement, # 9 Exhibit 88 - October 29, 2010 Release and Amendment, # 10 Exhibit 89 - January 1, 1996 Licensing Agreement, # 11 Exhibit 90 - May 12, 2005 License Agreemnent) (Kass, Lisa)
November 5, 2011 Filing 242 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31 - Developer.android.com Printout, # 2 Exhibit 33 - Patent No. 5,915,131, # 3 Exhibit 34 - Disregard; wrong document filed, see replaced version entry 255 , # 4 Exhibit 35 - Apple's Supplemental Infringement Contentions for Patent No. 6,275,983, # 5 Exhibit 37 - Patent No. 6,343,263, # 6 Exhibit 40 - Patent No. 6,493,002, # 7 Exhibit 42 - Developer.android.com Layout Params Printout) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/8/2011 (llj). Modified Exhibit 34 with replaced version entry on 11/9/2011 (mmo).
November 5, 2011 Filing 241 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 22 - Apple's 2d Supp Obj and Resp to Motorola's 1st ROGs, # 2 Exhibit 36-1 - Spielman Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit 36-2 - Spielman Expert Report, # 4 Exhibit 36-3 - Spielman Expert Report) (Kass, Lisa)
November 5, 2011 Filing 240 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15 - Excerpt from April 25, 2011 ITC Hearing, Inv. No. 337-TA-710, # 2 Exhibit 17 - Patent No. 5,519,867, # 3 Exhibit 18 - Patent No. 6,275,983, # 4 Exhibit 20 - Prosecution History for Patent No. 5,519,867, # 5 Exhibit 21 - Patent No. 5,566,337, # 6 Exhibit 23 - Apple's Infringment Contentions regarding Patent No. 5,566,337, # 7 Exhibit 25 - Email, dated June 3, 2011, # 8 Exhibit 26 - Motorola's Preliminary Proposed Claim Constructions, # 9 Exhibit 27 - Email, dated June 6, 2011, # 10 Exhibit 28 - Disregard; wrong document filed, see entry 255 for replaced version # 11 Exhibit 30 - Anatomy and Physiology of an Android) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/8/2011 (llj). Modified Exhibit #28 with replaced version entry on 11/9/2011 (mmo).
November 5, 2011 Filing 239 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Patent No. RE39,486, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 5,929,852, # 3 Exhibit 4 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Chart for RE '486 Patent, # 4 Exhibit 5 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Chart for '852 Patent, # 5 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from '575 File History, # 6 Exhibit 9 - Patent No. 5,455,599, # 7 Exhibit 10 - July 30, 2010 ITC Order No. 18, Inv. No. 337-TA-704, # 8 Exhibit 12.1 - July 15, 2011 ITC Initial Determination, Inv. No. 337-TA-710, # 9 Exhibit 12.2 - July 15, 2011 ITC Initial Determination, Inv. No. 337-TA-710, # 10 Exhibit 13 - Patent No. 5,481,721, # 11 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts from '721 File History) (Burrows, James)
November 5, 2011 Filing 238 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 5, 2011 Filing 237 Exhibit to 236 Declaration,,,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 50 - Excerpts from Deposition of Nitin Ganatra, # 2 Exhibit 51 - Excerpts from Deposition of Scott Herz, # 3 Exhibit 52 - Excerpts from Deposition of Paul Marcos, # 4 Exhibit 53 - Excerpts from Deposition of Bas Ording, # 5 Exhibit 54 - Excerpts from Deposition of Wayne Westerman, # 6 Exhibit 55 - Excerpts from Deposition of Richard Williamson, # 7 Exhibit 58 - Feiner Rebuttal Expert Report re: '949 Patent, # 8 Exhibit 64 - Motorola's Responses to Apple's 1st RFAs, Inv. No. 337-TA-745, # 9 Exhibit 65 - Excerpts from Deposition of Latonia Gordon, # 10 Exhibit 66 - Excerpts from Deposition of Neill Taylor, # 11 Exhibit 67 - Excerpts from Deposition of David Andrus, # 12 Exhibit 68 - Excerpts from Deposition of David Singer, # 13 Exhibit 69 - Cannon Declaration Opp. Mot. for Prelim. Inj., # 14 Exhibit 80 - Excerpts from Deposition of Mark Cudak, # 15 Exhibit 81 - Excerpts from Deposition of Jeffrey Smolinske) (Kass, Lisa) Modified exhibit numbers on 11/7/2011 (mmo).
November 5, 2011 Filing 236 Declaration of David M. Elihu filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Deposition of Stephen Fisher, # 2 Exhibit 7- Excerpts from Deposition of Michael Cleron, # 3 Exhibit 8 - Goodin Expert Report re: '486 and '852 Patents, # 4 Exhibit 11 - Egbert Expert Report re: '599 Patent, # 5 Exhibit 16 - Goodin Expert Report re: '721 Patent, # 6 Exhibit 19 - Aldrich Expert Report re: '867 Patent, # 7 Exhibit 24 - Aldrich Expert Report re: '337 Patent, # 8 Exhibit 29 - Goodin Expert Report re: '131 Patent, # 9 Exhibit 32 - Aldrich Expert Report re: '983 Patent, # 10 Exhibit 38 - Polish Expert Report re: '263 Patent, # 11 Exhibit 41 - Snoeren Expert Report re: '002 and '315 Patents, # 12 Exhibit 44 - Feiner Expert Report re: '949 Patent, # 13 Exhibit 47 - Excerpts from Deposition of Chris Blumenberg, # 14 Exhibit 48 - Excerpts from Deposition of Andre Boule, # 15 Exhibit 49 - Excerpts from Deposition of Imran Chaudhri) (Kass, Lisa)
November 5, 2011 Filing 235 Exhibit to 231 Declaration filed by Apple, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 45 English translation of the complaint filed in Germany, dated April 1, 2011, # 2 Ex. 46 e-mail from Richard Erwine, # 3 Ex. 47 Motorolas Infringement Contentions regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,349,898, # 4 Ex. 48 letter from Motorola to Donald Rosenberg at Apple, # 5 Ex. 49 Patent No. 5,239,294, # 6 Ex. 50 Patent No. 5,091,942, # 7 Ex. 51 American National Standard, Financial Institution Retail Message Authentication, X9.19, # 8 Ex. 52 Supplemental Information Disclosure Statement filed with the USPTO, # 9 Ex. 53 File History for U.S. Patent No. 5,572,193, # 10 Ex. 54 (not used), # 11 Ex. 55 interrogatory responses, # 12 Ex. 56 excerpts that highlight testing done for Section 5.2.4 and Section 5.2.13, # 13 Ex. 57 Motorola's Preliminary Proposed Claim Constructions, # 14 Ex. 58 interrogatory responses, # 15 Ex. 59 excerpts from Motorola invalidity contentions, # 16 Ex. 60 excerpts from Chase invalidity report re '721, # 17 Ex. 61 excerpts from Chase report re invalidity of '337, # 18 Ex. 62 excerpts of Jaffay report, # 19 Ex. 63 excerpts of Dezmelyk report, # 20 Ex. 64 excerpts of Conte report, # 21 Ex. 65 excerpts from '721 file history, # 22 Ex. 66 excerpts from '337 file history) (Haslam, Robert)
November 5, 2011 Filing 234 Exhibit to 231 Declaration filed by Apple, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 24 Infringement Contentions, # 2 Ex. 25 Infringement Contentions Chart, # 3 Ex. 26 3GPP Technical Specification, # 4 Ex. 27 WiFi Alliance ASD 544 Test Plan, 2010,, # 5 Ex. 28 WiFi Alliance 802.11n Draft 2.0 System Interoperability Test Plan, # 6 Ex. 29 WiFi Alliance Press Release, # 7 Ex. 30 Linksys webpage, # 8 Ex. 31 paper titled Practical attacks against WEP and WPA, # 9 Ex. 32 iOS webpage titled iOS: Recommended settings for Wi-Fi routers and access points, # 10 Ex. 33 webpage AirPort Utility 5.1 Help, Setting wireless options for your network, # 11 Ex. 34 excerpts of an Excel file entitled 802.11mb Issues Listv12, Jan. 20, 2009,, # 12 Ex. 35 EIA/TIA Interim Standard, IS-54, # 13 Ex. 36 GSM Technical Specification, # 14 Ex. 37 Nortel ETSI SMG2/3/GPRS, # 15 Ex. 38 excerpts from the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Tim A. Williams, # 16 Ex. 39 excerpts of the Initial Expert Report of Tim A. Williams, # 17 Ex. 40 dictionary definition of Quotient from The New Shorter Oxford English Dictionary, # 18 Ex. 41 dictionary definition of Divide from The New Shorter Oxford English Dictionary, # 19 Ex. 42 excerpts of 3GPP TS 44.060 v4.1.0 Technical Report, # 20 Ex. 43 excerpts of 3GPP TS 44.060 v4.1.0 Technical Report, # 21 Ex. 44 excerpts of 3GPP TS 44.060 v4.1.0 Technical Report) (Haslam, Robert)
November 5, 2011 Filing 233 Exhibit to 231 Declaration filed by Apple, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 IEEE Standard excerpts, # 2 Ex. 2 Almeroth report excerpts, # 3 Ex. 3 Almeroth report excerpts, # 4 Ex. 4 Interrogatory responses, # 5 Ex. 5 Interrogatory responses, # 6 Ex. 6 Patent No. 4,908,828, # 7 Ex. 7 Patent No. 4,975,952, # 8 Ex. 8 Linksys E3000 User Guide, # 9 Ex. 9 Patent No. 7,173,919, # 10 Ex. 10 '713 Provisional Appl., # 11 Ex. 11 3GPP Technical Specification, # 12 Ex. 12 Kenney report excerpts, # 13 Ex. 13 Kenney report excerpts, # 14 Ex. 14 Nokia Proposal TSGR1-598/99., # 15 Ex. 15 Nokia Proposal TSGR1-599/99, # 16 Ex. 16 Product Specs, # 17 Ex. 17 TS 44.060 excerpts, # 18 Ex. 18 TS 44.060 excerpts, # 19 Ex. 19 Interrogatory responses, # 20 Ex. 20 Interrogatory responses, # 21 Ex. 21 Interrogatory responses, # 22 Ex. 22 June 29, 1999 Memo, # 23 Ex. 23 3GPP/TSGR1#6(99)893) (Haslam, Robert)
November 5, 2011 Filing 232 Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Erwine, Richard)
November 5, 2011 Filing 231 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 230 Brief in Support of 208 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Erwine, Richard)
November 4, 2011 Filing 229 Declaration of David M. Elihu filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 215 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended and Restated Certificate of Incorporation of Taligent, # 2 Exhibit - Excerpts of Thomas Cronin6, 2011 deposition, taken July 6, 2011, Inv. No. 337-TA-750, # 3 Exhibit Stock Purchase and Stockholder Agreement, # 4 Exhibit Stock Purchase Agreement between Taligent and Hewlett-Packard, # 5 Exhibit 1994-95 Correspondence between HP and Taligent, # 6 Exhibit Agreement between HP and Taligent, # 7 Exhibit Restructing among Taligent and IBM Corporation, # 8 Exhibit Certificate of Incorporation of Object Technology Licensing Corporation, # 9 Exhibit Stock Sale Agreement between IBM and Taligent, # 10 Exhibit Stock Sale Agreement between Apple and Taligent, # 11 Exhibit Bates range HP-Apple0000089 to HP-Apple0000091, # 12 Exhibit Sept. 30, 1991 Agreement between IBM and Motorola, # 13 Exhibit Stock Purchase Agreement between Apple and IBM, dated March 31, 2006, # 14 Exhibit Assignment, Bates range 750-Apple0023917 to 750-Apple0023960, # 15 Exhibit Assignment, Bates range 750-Apple0022886 to Apple0022899, # 16 Exhibit Patent Assignment, recorded on April 11, 1996, # 17 Exhibit Assignment history resulting in U.S. Patent No. 6,684,261, # 18 Exhibit Assignment history resulting in U.S. Patent No. 6,259,446, # 19 Exhibit Assignment history resulting in U.S. Patent No. 5,519,867, # 20 Exhibit Assignment history resulting in U.S. Patent No. 5,455,599, # 21 Exhibit - Excerpts of Deborah Coutant deposition, taken July 14, 2011, Inv. No. 337-TA-750, # 22 Exhibit - Excerpts of Boris Teksler deposition, taken July 7, 2011, Inv. No. 337-TA-750, # 23 Exhibit W. Christopher Bakewell's Rebuttal Expert Report, served October 25, 2011, # 24 Exhibit Amendment to Research and Experimentation Agreement) (Burrows, James) Modified on 11/7/2011; requested full depos. to be filed separately for Cronin, Coutant and Teksler. (mmo).
November 4, 2011 Filing 228 Brief in Support of 213 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 227 Declaration of Tito Thomas filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 226 Declaration of Robert Newberry filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 225 Declaration of Paul Rekieta filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 224 Declaration of Jochen Vaihinger filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 223 Declaration of Martin Lefkowitz filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 222 Declaration of Ken Ho filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 221 Declaration of Trent Jaeger, Ph.D. filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 220 Declaration of Dr. Chris Heegard filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re '559 Patent re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 219 Declaration of Chris Heegard, Ph.D. filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re '516 re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 218 Declaration of Joan Gervino filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Gervino Ex. 1 - American National Standard) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 217 Brief in Support of 215 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James)
November 4, 2011 Filing 216 Declaration of George Kondylis filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 215 MOTION TO DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 11/25/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/5/2011. (Burrows, James)
November 4, 2011 Filing 214 Declaration of Dr. Leonard J. Cimini filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. re: 213 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Cimini CV) (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 213 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 11/25/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/5/2011. (Haslam, Robert)
November 4, 2011 Filing 212 Declaration of David Sparks filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James)
November 4, 2011 Filing 211 Declaration of Dianne Hackborn filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James)
November 4, 2011 Filing 210 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Chase filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James)
November 4, 2011 Filing 209 Declaration of Dan Bornstein filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 208 Motion for Summary Judgment (Sealed Document) (Burrows, James)
November 4, 2011 Filing 208 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 11/25/2011. Brief in Reply due 12/5/2011. (Hansen, Scott)
November 4, 2011 Filing 207 Deposition of Wayne Westerman taken on October 11, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 206 Deposition of Tom Mavrakakis taken on July 19, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 205 Deposition of Stephen Fisher taken on August 25, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 204 Deposition of David Singer taken on May 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 203 Deposition of Scott Herz taken on August 19, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 202 Deposition of Richard Williamson taken on September 15, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 201 Deposition of Richard Lutton taken on July 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 200 Deposition of Richard Lutton taken on April 1, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 199 Deposition of Paul Marcos taken on August 31, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 198 Deposition of Nitin Ganatra taken on September 23, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 197 Deposition of Neill Taylor taken on June 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 196 Deposition of Michael Cleron taken on September 23, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 195 Deposition of Latonia Gordon taken on July 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 194 Deposition of Kirk W. Dailey taken on April 12, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 193 Deposition of Jeffrey Smolinske taken on August 19, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 192 Deposition of Imran Chaudhri taken on July 29, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 191 Deposition of Dominic Tolli taken on August 9, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 190 Deposition of Chris Blumenberg taken on September 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 189 Deposition of Brian Blasius taken on June 3, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 188 Deposition of Bas Ording taken on August 3, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 187 Deposition of David Andrus taken on May 6, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 186 Deposition of Andre Boule taken on October 5, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Kass, Lisa)
November 4, 2011 Filing 185 Deposition of Mark Cudak taken on September 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 3, 2011 Filing 184 Deposition of Jason Shi taken on May 13, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 3, 2011 Filing 183 Deposition of Anand Dabak taken on September 30, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 3, 2011 Filing 182 Deposition of Louis Finkelstein taken on August 17, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 3, 2011 Filing 181 Deposition of Costen Burch taken on September 8, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 3, 2011 Filing 180 Deposition of Tyler Brown, Ph.D. taken on June 28, 2011 (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
November 3, 2011 Filing 179 Notice of Appearance of James M. Burrows filed by James M. Burrows for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Burrows, James)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 177 Motion to Admit Jonathan M. Sobel Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/19/2011. (voc)
October 18, 2011 Filing 177 Motion to Admit Jonathan M. Sobel Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 50 receipt number 0758-862097.) by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Sobel, Jonathan)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 113 Motion for Leave to File supplemental claim construction evidence. The parties' request for claims construction is denied. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/13/2011. (voc)
October 11, 2011 Filing 175 Notice of Appearance filed by Mitchell Feller for Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Feller, Mitchell) Modified docket text on 10/12/2011 (mmo).
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 152 Motion to Admit Amanda Wilson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/3/2011. (voc)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying 154 Motion to Stay Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 by Plaintiffs Apple and Granting 166 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Defendants. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/3/2011. (voc)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 165 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/29/2011. (voc)
September 29, 2011 Filing 171 Declaration of Xie Guanbin filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of Reply re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, AML, # 2 Ex. 2, extract from Proxy Statement, # 3 Ex. 3, Notif. of Concentrations, # 4 Ex. 4, press conference report, # 5 Ex. 5, MOFCOM press conference report, # 6 Ex. 6, MOFCOM announcement, # 7 Ex. 7, FTC decision, # 8 Ex. 8, joint press release, # 9 Ex. 9, Nokia 2010 press release, # 10 Ex. 10, Nokia 2011 press release, # 11 Ex. 11, FT report, # 12 Ex. 12, Caterpillar press release, # 13 Ex. 13, Caterpillar press release, # 14 Ex. 14, HP Press release, # 15 Ex. 15, HP early termination) (Haslam, Robert)
September 29, 2011 Filing 170 Declaration of Alexander Viktorovich Viktorov filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of Reply re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, Russian Fed. Law excerpts, # 2 Ex. 2, Proxy Statement, # 3 Ex. 3, materials from FAS website) (Haslam, Robert)
September 29, 2011 Filing 169 Declaration of James McGill Aitken filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of Reply re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, EU Merger Regulation, # 2 Ex. 2, Motorola Proxy Statement, # 3 Ex. 3, Best Practices Guidelines, # 4 Ex. 4, Oracle 8-K, # 5 Ex. 5, DOJ press release, # 6 Ex. 6, EU Sun Oracle decision, # 7 Ex. 7, TomTom Fed. Register, # 8 Ex. 8, TomTom EU decision, # 9 Ex. 9, Nokia Fed. Register, # 10 Ex. 10, Navteq EU decision, # 11 Ex. 11, DOJ GE Honeywell Press Release, # 12 Ex. 12, EU Decision re GE Honeywell) (Haslam, Robert)
September 29, 2011 Filing 168 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of Reply re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, Dist. Court Order, # 2 Ex. 2, Motorolas 9/28/2011 Form 8-K, # 3 Ex. 3, Sirius 4/12/2007 Form 8-K, # 4 Ex. 4, DOJ 2008 Press Release, # 5 Ex. 5, Sirius 8/1/2008 Form 8-K, # 6 Ex. 6, Silver Declaration - Dist. of Columbia case, # 7 Ex. 7, DOJ 2002 Press Release) (Haslam, Robert) Modified exhibit description on 9/30/2011 (mmo).
September 29, 2011 Filing 167 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. in Support of 154 Motion to Stay (Haslam, Robert)
September 29, 2011 Filing 166 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion for Stay, # 2 Exhibit Order on Motion to Stay) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
September 29, 2011 Filing 165 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports and Summary Judgment Motion Papers by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 10/6/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Bryan J Cahill and James Donald Peterson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/27/2011. (voc)
September 26, 2011 Filing 163 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel by Godfrey & Kahn, S.C. by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Response due 10/3/2011. (Peterson, James)
September 21, 2011 Filing 162 Declaration of Amanda S. Williamson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - Merger Agreement) (Hansen, Scott) Modified exhibit number on 9/22/2011 (mmo).
September 21, 2011 Filing 161 Brief in Opposition by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 154 Motion to Stay filed by Next Software, Inc., Apple, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
September 19, 2011 Filing 160 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine Cetrangolo for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Cetrangolo, Catherine)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition due 9/21/2011. Brief in Reply due 9/29/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/13/2011. (voc)
September 12, 2011 Filing 158 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 9/19/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
September 12, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 154 Motion to Stay Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc.and Next Software, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 9/16/2011. Brief in Reply due 9/21/2011. (voc/sp)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 149 Motion to Admit David Elihu Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/12/2011. (arw)
September 9, 2011 Filing 156 Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 154 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, Part 1 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 2 Ex. 1, Part 2 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 3 Ex. 1, Part 3 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 4 Ex. 1, Part 4 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 5 Ex. 1, Part 5 - Agreement and Plan of Merger, # 6 Ex. 2, Supercharging Article, # 7 Ex. 3, M&A Call transcript, # 8 Ex. 4, Letter to Counsel, # 9 Ex. 5, Letter to Counsel, # 10 Ex. 6, Google's Motion to Dismiss, # 11 Ex. 7, Email to Counsel, # 12 Ex. 8, Email to Counsel) (Ernst, Samuel)
September 9, 2011 Filing 155 Brief in Support of 154 Motion to Stay Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 9, 2011 Filing 154 Motion to Stay Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Response due 9/16/2011. (Ernst, Samuel)
September 8, 2011 Filing 153 Declaration of Amanda Williamson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 152 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2011: # 1 ECF Registration Form) (arw)
September 8, 2011 Filing 152 Motion to Admit Amanda Williamson Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
September 7, 2011 Filing 151 Notice by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re 148 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Response To Motorolas Notice of Supplemental Authority Concerning Claim Construction. (Peterson, James) Modified party text on 9/8/2011 (mmo).
September 1, 2011 Filing 150 Declaration of David Elihu filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 149 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
September 1, 2011 Filing 149 Motion to Admit David Elihu Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
August 26, 2011 Filing 148 Notice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. of Supplemental Authority Concerning Claim Construction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of 2 - Initial Determination published on August 24, 2011 by the ITC in Investigation No. 337-TA-710, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of 2 - Initial Determination published on August 24, 2011 by the ITC in Investigation No. 337-TA-710) (Stathas, Lynn)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The jointly proposed addendum to the protective order 146 is accepted and entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/26/2011. (voc)
August 25, 2011 Filing 146 Joint Motion for Protective Order Apple Inc.'s and Non-Party Google Inc.'s Joint [Proposed] Addendum to the Protective Order by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. (Ho, Jill)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting 140 Motion to Admit Kevin S. Kudlac, Justin Constant and Rodney R. Miller Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/25/2011. (voc)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 138 Motion to Admit Jeffrey Boozell Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/25/2011. (voc)
August 23, 2011 Filing 143 Declaration of Rodney R. Miller filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 140 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan)
August 23, 2011 Filing 142 Declaration of Justin Constant filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 140 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan)
August 23, 2011 Filing 141 Declaration of Kevin S. Kudlac filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 140 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan)
August 23, 2011 Filing 140 Motion to Admit Kevin S. Kudlac, Justin Constant and Rodney R. Miller Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CMECF Form - Kudlac, # 2 CMECF Form - Constant, # 3 CMECF Form - Miller) (Cahill, Bryan)
August 23, 2011 Filing 139 Declaration of Jeffrey Boozell filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 138 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
August 23, 2011 Filing 138 Motion to Admit Jeffrey Boozell Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 133 Motion to Admit Anupam Sharma and Ranganath Sudarshan Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/19/2011. (voc)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 131 Motion to Admit Amy L. Signaigo Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/19/2011. (voc)
August 18, 2011 Filing 135 Declaration of Ranganath Sudarshan filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 133 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan)
August 18, 2011 Filing 134 Declaration of Anupam Sharma filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. re: 133 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, (Cahill, Bryan)
August 18, 2011 Filing 133 Motion to Admit Anupam Sharma and Ranganath Sudarshan Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CM ECF Regsitration Form - Sharma, # 2 CM ECF Registration Form - Sudarshan) (Cahill, Bryan)
August 18, 2011 Filing 132 Declaration of Amy L. Signaigo filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 131 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
August 18, 2011 Filing 131 Motion to Admit Amy L. Signaigo Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 125 Motion to Admit David A. Perlson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/18/2011. (voc)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 127 Motion to Admit Robert R. Cleary Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/17/2011. (voc)
August 16, 2011 Filing 128 Declaration of Robert R. Cleary filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 127 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
August 16, 2011 Filing 127 Motion to Admit Robert R. Cleary Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
August 16, 2011 Filing 126 Declaration of David A. Perlson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 125 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF Registratio Form) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
August 16, 2011 Filing 125 Motion to Admit David A. Perlson Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 122 Motion to Admit Kevin A. Smith Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/15/2011. (voc)
August 15, 2011 Filing 123 Declaration of Kevin A. Smith filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 122 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Smith, Kevin)
August 15, 2011 Filing 122 Motion to Admit Kevin A. Smith Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Smith, Kevin)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 119 Motion to Admit David C. Radulescu Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/4/2011. (voc)
August 2, 2011 Filing 120 Declaration of David C. Radulescu filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 119 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
August 2, 2011 Filing 119 Motion to Admit David C. Radulescu Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Radulescu CM/ECF Registration) (Kass, Lisa)
July 28, 2011 Filing 118 Transcript of Claims Construction Hearing, held 7/22/2011 before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see Electronic Transcript Instructions and Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (arw)
July 26, 2011 Filing 117 Deposition of Leonard Cimini, Ph.D. taken on July 13, 2011 (Kass, Lisa)
July 22, 2011 Motions for Claims Construction. (Dummy Motion/llj)
July 22, 2011 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb: Claims Construction Hearing held on 7/22/2011; presentations made by all parties; matters taken under advisement. [3:15] (Court Reporter LS.) (llj)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 112 Joint Motion for Approval of Additional Presentation Equipment During Claims Construction Hearing.. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/19/2011. (llj)
July 19, 2011 Filing 114 Supplemental Declaration of Winslow B. Taub filed by Plaintiffs/Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., NeXT Software, Inc. re: 113 Motion for Leave to File, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from Certified Translation of JP Prosecution History, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from Certified Translation of JP Prosecution History, Claim 9) (Peterson, James)
July 19, 2011 Filing 113 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Claims Construction Evidence by Plaintiffs/Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., NeXT Software, Inc. (Peterson, James) Modified on 7/20/2011 (llj).
July 18, 2011 Filing 112 Joint Motion for Approval of Additional Presentation Equipment During Claims Construction Hearing by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Next Software, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Response due 7/25/2011. (Peterson, James) Modified on 7/19/2011 (mmo).
July 15, 2011 Filing 111 Declaration of J. Stevenson Kenney filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Kenney CV) (Hansen, Scott) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj).
July 15, 2011 Filing 110 Exhibit to 109 Declaration of Carlos A. Rodriguez,, filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. Exhibit 3 (Excerpts from November 16, 2010 Deposition of Betrand Serlet, USITC Inv. No. 337-TA-710) (Sealed Document) (Hansen, Scott) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj).
July 15, 2011 Filing 109 Declaration of Carlos A. Rodriguez filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Patent No. 6,275,983 Prosecution History, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from Patent No. 6,212,575 Prosecution History, # 3 Exhibit 4 - July 4, 1011 Correspondence from Erwine to Haskett, # 4 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Patent No. 6,175,559 Prosecution History, # 5 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from July 13, 2011 Deposition of Leonard Cimini, Ph.D., # 6 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from American Heritage College Dictionary) (Hansen, Scott) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj).
July 15, 2011 Filing 108 Claims Construction Response Brief re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Hansen, Scott) Modified event on 7/18/2011 (llj).
July 15, 2011 Filing 107 Declaration of Winslow B. Taub filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Softward, Inc. re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, '486 Inf. Chart, # 2 Ex. B, '354 file history excerpt, # 3 Ex. C, '354 file history excerpt, # 4 Ex. D, Spielman report excerpts, # 5 Ex. E, '983 file history excerpts, # 6 Ex. F, '983 file history excerpts, # 7 Ex. G, '337 Inf. Chart, # 8 Ex. H, '002 Inf. Chart, # 9 Ex. I, '002 file history excerpt, # 10 Ex. J, '002 file history excerpt, # 11 Ex. K, '002 file history excerpt, # 12 Ex. L, dictionary definitions, # 13 Ex. N, JPS63-167588 cert. trans., # 14 Ex. O, appl. 08/050952 file history excerpt, # 15 Ex. P, invalidity conten. excerpt, # 16 Ex. Q, 6,371,977, # 17 Ex. R, 5,474,831) (Haslam, Robert) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj).
July 15, 2011 Filing 106 Claims Construction Response Brief re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Winslow Taub - See also entry 107 , # 2 Taub Ex. M - Excerpts of Tyler Brown Deposition) (Haslam, Robert) Modified on 7/18/2011 (mmo) Modified event on 7/18/2011 (llj).
July 15, 2011 Filing 105 Claims Construction Submission re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Next Software, Inc. - Apple Inc. Technical Tutorial CD. (Filed in Clerk's Office Exhibit Room.) (llj) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj).
July 15, 2011 Filing 104 Claims Construction Submission re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. - Motorola Technical Tutorial CDs. (Filed in Clerk's Office Exhibit Room.) (llj) Modified on 7/18/2011 (llj).
July 8, 2011 Filing 103 Notice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. of Change of Address as to Attorneys Matthew D. Powers and Steven S. Cherensky. (Peterson, James)
July 1, 2011 Filing 102 Notice of Appearance filed by David G. Hanson for Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hanson, David)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 99 Motion regarding technical tutorial. Each side may submit a technical tutorial regarding the technology relevant to its claim construction disputes by 7/15/2011. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/28/2011. (voc)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by plaintiffs and granting 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction be defendants. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/22/2011 at 9:00 AM. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/24/2011. (voc)
June 23, 2011 Filing 99 Joint Motion for Regarding the Need for Technical Tutorial by Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. Response due 6/30/2011. (Haskett, Christine)
June 20, 2011 Filing 98 Declaration of Leonard J. Cimini filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. in Support of re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, CV) (Haslam, Robert)
June 17, 2011 Filing 97 Declaration of Carlos A. Rodriguez filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 96 Claims Construction Initial Brief, 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Patent No. 6,275,983, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 5,969,705, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Patent No. 5,566,337, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Patent No. 5,455,599, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Patent No. 6,424,354, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Reissued Patent No. RE 39,486, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Patent No. 5,929,852, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Patent No. 5,946,647, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Patent No. 5,481,721, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Patent No. 6,493,002, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Patent No. 6,175,559, # 12 Exhibit 12 - Patent No. 5,490,230, # 13 Exhibit 13 - Patent No. 5,319,712, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Patent No. 5,572,193, # 15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpts from '983 Patent Prosecution History, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts from '354 Patent Prosecution History, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Excerpts from '486 Patent Prosecution History, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Excerpts from '230 Patent Prosecution History, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '983 Patent, # 20 Exhibit 20 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '705 Patent, # 21 Exhibit 21 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '337 Patent, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '599 Patent, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '354 Patent, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '486 Patent, # 25 Exhibit 25 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '852 Patent, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '647 Patent, # 27 Exhibit 27 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '721 Patent, # 28 Exhibit 28 - Apple's Infringement Contentions Claim Chart for '002 Patent, # 29 Exhibit 29 - Excerpts from NeXTSTEP Object-Oriented Programming and the Objective C Language, # 30 Exhibit 30 - July 30, 2010 ITC Order Construing Terms of Asserted Claims in Inv. No. 337-TA-704, # 31 Exhibit 31 - April 4, 2011 Joint Motion to Amend Filed in ITC Inv. No. 337-TA-710, # 32 Exhibit 32 - Excerpts from '002 Patent Prosecution History, # 33 Exhibit 33 - Patent No. 5,588,105, # 34 Exhibit 34 - Patent No. 5,659,693, # 35 Exhibit 35 - Henderson & Card Article, # 36 Exhibit 36 - Patent No. 5,202,961, # 37 Exhibit 37 - Patent App. No. 08/316,237) (Hansen, Scott)
June 17, 2011 Filing 96 Claims Construction Initial Brief re: 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction and Claim Construction Hearing by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
June 17, 2011 Filing 95 Motion Requesting Claims Construction and Claim Construction Hearing by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
June 17, 2011 Filing 94 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 12 Finkelstein Deposition Excerpts) (Haslam, Robert)
June 17, 2011 Filing 93 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 21 IEEE Dictionary, # 2 Ex. 22 '575 file history, # 3 Ex. 23 '486 file history, # 4 Ex. 24 Order No. 18, # 5 Ex. 25 '705 file history, # 6 Ex. 26 '647 file history, # 7 Ex. 27 Brad Cox, # 8 Ex. 28 Microsoft Press Dictionary, # 9 Ex. 29 '002 file history, # 10 Ex. 30 Dictionary of Computer Words, # 11 Ex. 31 Computer Dictionary, # 12 Ex. 32 Academic Press Dictionary, # 13 Ex. 33 IBM Dictionary, # 14 Ex. 34 Black's Law Dictionary, # 15 Ex. 35 About 3GPP, # 16 Ex. 36 '919 patent, # 17 Ex. 37 '713 provisional application) (Haslam, Robert)
June 17, 2011 Filing 92 Declaration of Christine Saunders Haskett filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 Moto Infring. Cont. Ex. A, # 2 Ex. 2 '157 patent, # 3 Ex. 3 '179 patent, # 4 Ex. 4 '329 patent, # 5 Ex. 5 '230 file history, # 6 Ex. 6 Oxford dictionary definition, # 7 Ex. 7 '559 file history, # 8 Ex. 8 The OSI Model, # 9 Ex. 9 ISO Standard, # 10 Ex. 10 Japanese file history, # 11 Ex. 11 Japanese prosecution appeal, # 12 Ex. 13 Moto Infring. Cont. Ex. E, # 13 Ex. 14 IEEE Standard, # 14 Ex. 15 '333 patent, # 15 Ex. 16 '721 file history, # 16 Ex. 17 '193 file history, # 17 Ex. 18 Moto Infring. Cont. Ex. F, # 18 Ex. 19 Merriam Webster Dictionary, # 19 Ex. 20 Webster's Dictionary) (Haslam, Robert)
June 17, 2011 Filing 91 Claims Construction Initial Brief re: 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction and Claim Construction Hearing by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. (Sealed Document) (Haslam, Robert)
June 17, 2011 Filing 90 Motion Requesting Claims Construction and Claim Construction Hearing by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. ** Disregard Declaration of Leonard Cimini, to be refiled as a separate document** # 2 Ex. A to Cimini Declaration) (Haslam, Robert) Modified on 6/20/2011 (voc).
June 17, 2011 Filing 89 Notice of Appearance of Elizabeth Weiswasser filed by James Donald Peterson for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. (Peterson, James)
May 9, 2011 Filing 88 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Hansen, Scott)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 84 Motion to Admit Robert W. Stone Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/2/2011. (voc)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Granting Motion to admit Linda L. Brewer pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/25/2011. (voc)
April 22, 2011 Filing 85 Declaration of Robert W. Stone filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 84 Motion to Admit Robert W. Stone Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 22, 2011 Filing 84 Motion to Admit Robert W. Stone Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CM/ECF Registration Form, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Kass, Lisa)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan Bordonaro and Davis L. Shaul Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/18/2011. (voc)
April 15, 2011 Filing 82 Plaintiffs' Reply to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.s Answer and Counterclaims to Apple Inc.s Amended Complaint against Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc. and NeXT Software, Inc. (Haskett, Christine) Modified docket text on 4/18/2011 (mmo).
April 11, 2011 Action Requested: Attorneys Thomas R. Watson, Brian Cannon, Richard Erwine, Linda Brewer, Carlos Rodriguez, Meghan Bordonaro, David Shaul and Melissa Chan must be registered for CM/EC before the motion for pro hac vice is granted. (voc)
April 8, 2011 Filing 81 Notice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. of Agreement Regarding Email Discovery. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreement Regarding Email Discovery) (Peterson, James)
April 8, 2011 Filing 80 Notice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. of Cross-Use Agreement for Discovery Materials. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Cross-Use Agreement) (Peterson, James)
April 8, 2011 Filing 79 Declaration of Thomas R. Watson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 Filing 78 Declaration of David L. Shaul filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 Filing 77 Declaration of Carlos A. Rodriguez filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 Filing 76 Declaration of Richard W. Erwine filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 Filing 75 Declaration of Melissa N. Chan filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 Filing 74 Declaration of Brian C. Cannon filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 Filing 73 Declaration of Linda J. Brewer filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 Filing 72 Declaration of Meghan E. Bordonaro filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice (Kass, Lisa)
April 8, 2011 Filing 71 Motion to Admit Thomas R. Watson, Brian C. Cannon, Richard W. Erwine, Linda J. Brewer, Carlos A. Rodriguez, Meghan E. Bordonaro, David L. Shaul, and Melissa N. Chan Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kass, Lisa)
March 22, 2011 Filing 70 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. against Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Patent No. 5,311,516, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Patent No. 5,319,712, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Patent No. 5,490,230, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Patent No. 5,572,193, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Patent No. 6,175,559, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Patent No. 6,359,898, # 7 Certificate of Service) (Hansen, Scott)
March 15, 2011 Filing 69 Notice by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., Next Softward, Inc. re 68 Text Order - Apple's Notice that Parties have Reached Agreement Concerning Cost Shifting. (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 3/16/2011 (mmo). Modified on 3/23/2011 (llj/c).
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER denying 59 Motion to Stay. In light of this court's order today denying defendants' motion to dismiss or transfer certain counts 66 , defendants' motion to stay certain discovery 59 is denied without a hearing because it is moot. Because the court intended to deny defendants' discovery motion on its merits (since it would be illogical and inefficient to stay discovery when the information sought would have been relevant in either this court or in Delaware), because defendants' motion violated this court's admonition in the second paragraph of the December 20, 2011 preliminary pretrial conference order 27 , and because defendants' required a response and counter-motion from plaintiffs, costs are shifted in favor of plaintiffs pursuant to Rule 37(a)(5)(B). Plaintiffs have until March 15, 2011 to provide an itemized list of its reasonable expenses incurred in opposing defendant's motion, with defendant's response due not later than March 22, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/8/2011. (lak)
March 8, 2011 Filing 67 Notice of Appearance filed by Lisa Nester Kass for Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Kass, Lisa)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 28 Motion to dismiss or sever and transfer by defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Motorola, Inc. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/8/2011. (voc)
March 7, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to 63 Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Certain Asserted Patents. Brief in Opposition due 3/8/2011. **Counsel be advised that this motion also will be considered & decided at the March 9, 2011 Motion Hearing. (voc)
March 4, 2011 Filing 65 Declaration of Steven S. Cherensky filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 63 Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Certain Asserted Patents (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Responses to First Set of Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit B - Motorola Solutions, Inc.'s Responses to First Set of Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit C -Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Responses to First Set of Requests for Production, # 4 Exhibit D - Motorola Solutions, Inc.'s Responses to First Set of Requests for Production) (Peterson, James)
March 4, 2011 Filing 64 Brief in Support of 63 Motion to Compel and Brief in Opposition to Motorola's Motion to Stay Certain Discovery Pending Resolution of Their Motion to Dismiss or Sever and Transfer 59 by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 3/7/2011 (mmo/t).
March 4, 2011 Filing 63 Motion to Compel Discovery Regarding Certain Asserted Patents by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 3/11/2011. (Peterson, James)
March 3, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to 59 Motion to Stay Certain Discovery. Brief in Opposition due 3/8/2011. Telephone Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2011 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Defendants responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (voc)
March 2, 2011 Filing 62 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
March 2, 2011 Filing 61 Declaration of Rebecca F. Kennedy re: 59 Motion to Stay Certain Discovery filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit February 11, 2011 Letter) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) Modified docketing text on 3/3/2011 (mmo/c).
March 2, 2011 Filing 60 Brief in Support of 59 Motion to Stay by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
March 2, 2011 Filing 59 Motion to Stay Certain Discovery by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Response due 3/9/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
February 28, 2011 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance of Covington & Burling, LLP filed by James Donald Peterson for Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. (Peterson, James)
February 28, 2011 Filing 57 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert T. Haslam for Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patricia Young terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/25/2011. (voc)
February 18, 2011 Filing 55 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC.. Response due 2/25/2011. (Peterson, James)
February 11, 2011 Filing 54 Certificate of Service by Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
February 11, 2011 Filing 53 Answer and Reply to 50 Amended Counterclaims by Counter Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) Modified event/docket text on 2/14/2011 (mmo).
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/1/2011. (voc)
January 28, 2011 Filing 51 Motion for Protective Order - Joint Proposed Protective Order by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC., Counter Defendants Apple, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgement and Agreement To Be Bound by Joint Proposed Protective Order) (Peterson, James)
January 28, 2011 Filing 50 Apple, Inc's Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Motorola, Inc. and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Joint Counterclaims and Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Counterclaims - - Reply to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Peterson, James)
January 24, 2011 Filing 49 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
January 24, 2011 Filing 48 Declaration of Rebecca F. Kennedy filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (13) - Apple Ans. S.D. Fla., # 2 Exhibit (14) - Order Denying HTC Transfer, # 3 Exhibit (15) Order Granting Apple Transfer Motion, # 4 Exhibit (16) HTC Unopposed Motion to Stay, # 5 Exhibit (17) - Notice of Related Case) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
January 24, 2011 Filing 47 Brief in Reply in Support re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
January 14, 2011 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance of Rachelle H. Thompson filed by Rachelle Harley Thompson for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc., Counter Claimant Apple, Inc. (Thompson, Rachelle)
January 13, 2011 Filing 45 Declaration of Steven S. Cherensky filed by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint filed by Motorola ND IL 10-CV-06381, # 2 Exhibit B - Complaint filed by Motorola ND IL 10-CV-06385, # 3 Exhibit C - Complaint filed by Motorola SD FL 10-CV-23580, # 4 Exhibit D - Complaint filed by Motorola with USITC, # 5 Exhibit E - Complaint filed by Apple with USITC, # 6 Exhibit F - Voluntary dismissal by Motorola ND IL 10-cv-06381, # 7 Exhibit G - Voluntary dismissal by Motorola ND IL 10-cv-06385, # 8 Exhibit H - Complaint filed by Motorola against Microsoft WD WI 10-cv-00699, # 9 Exhibit I - Complaint filed by Motorola against Microsoft WD WI 10-cv-00700, # 10 Exhibit J - Complaint filed by Motorola against Microsoft WD WI 10-cv-00826, # 11 Exhibit K - Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue DE 10-cv-00867, # 12 Exhibit L - Opening Brief DE 10-cv-00867, # 13 Exhibit M - Email to E. DeFranco from S. Cherensky dated Dec 28, 2010, # 14 Exhibit N - Joint planning schedule SD FL 10-cv-023580, # 15 Exhibit O - Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue SD FL 10-cv-23580, # 16 Exhibit P - Motorola's Brief in Opposition DE 10-cv-00867, # 17 Exhibit Q - Reply Brief DE 10-cv-00867, # 18 Exhibit R - Article) (Peterson, James) Modified exhibit description on 1/14/2011 (mmo).
January 13, 2011 Filing 44 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Peterson, James)
January 10, 2011 Filing 43 Notice of Appearance of Brian C. Chang filed by Brian Chang for Plaintiff Apple, Inc. (Chang, Brian)
January 10, 2011 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance of Nathan A. Greenblatt filed by Nathan A. Greenblatt for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc., Counter Claimant Apple, Inc. (Greenblatt, Nathan)
January 10, 2011 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance filed by Julian Moore for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc., Counter Claimant Apple, Inc. (Moore, Julian)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 15 Motion to Admit Jennifer Bauer Pro Hac Vice. Jennifer A Bauer for Motorola Mobility, Inc. Jennifer A Bauer for Motorola, Inc. admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/10/2011. (vob)
December 30, 2010 Filing 39 Certificate of Service by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 30, 2010 Filing 38 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Hansen, Scott)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order granting 15 Motion to admit Edward DeFranco pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/29/2010. (vob)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order granting 15 Motion to admit Kevin Johnson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/29/2010. (vob)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order granting 15 Motion to admit Alexander Rudis Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/27/2010. (vob)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Order granting 15 Motion to admit David Nelson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/27/2010. (vob)
December 23, 2010 Filing 33 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
December 23, 2010 Filing 32 Declaration of Rebecca F. Kennedy filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Copy of Joint Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit 2-Copy of Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, # 3 Exhibit 3-Copy of redacted version of Apple Inc. and NeXT Software Opposition to Defts. Motion to Transfer Venue, # 4 Exhibit 4-Copy of Motorola Declaration of mailing, #10-867-GMS, # 5 Exhibit 5-Copy of Motorola complaint, #10-867-GMS, # 6 Exhibit 6-Copy of Apple and NeXT Software Complaint,#10-cv-00166-UNA # 7 Exhibit 7-Copy of Apple Complaint,#10-cv-00167-RK, # 8 Exhibit 8-Copy of Apple Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims, #09-1002-GMS, # 9 Exhibit 9-Copy of Apple Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims, #09-791-GMS, # 10 Exhibit 10-Copy of Order in #09-10020GMS, # 11 Exhibit 11-Copy of 12/6/10 Order in #10-cv-166-UNA,10-cv-167-RK,09-791-GMS,09-1002-GMS, # 12 Exhibit 12-Copy of Apple Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims, #10-cv-249.) (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca) Modified on 12/27/2010; added exhibit descriptions. (mmo).
December 23, 2010 Filing 31 Declaration of Michael Romie filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
December 23, 2010 Filing 30 Declaration of William P. Alberth Jr. filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
December 23, 2010 Filing 29 Brief in Support by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
December 23, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS OR SEVER AND TRANSFER by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 1/13/2011. Brief in Reply due 1/24/2011. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
December 21, 2010 Filing 27 Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 1/28/2011. Motions Requesting Claims Construction due 6/17/2011. Claims Construction Response Brief due 7/15/2011. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/22/2011 at 09:00 AM. Dispositive Motions due 10/21/2011. Settlement Letters due 3/16/2012. Motions in Limine due 3/16/2012. Response to Motion due 4/2/2012. Final Pretrial Submissions due 4/5/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2012 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/30/2012 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/20/2010. (vob)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due 12/23/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/20/10. (rep)
December 20, 2010 Filing 25 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
December 20, 2010 Filing 24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker.Response due 12/27/2010. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
December 17, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 12/17/2010 [:30] (cak)
December 15, 2010 Action Requested: Attorneys Charles K. Verhoeven, David A. Nelson, Edward J. DeFranco, Jennifer A. Bauer and Alexander Rudis must be registered for CM/ECF before the Motion for Pro Hac Vice is granted. (vob)
December 14, 2010 Filing 23 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiffs Apple, Inc., NEXT SOFTWARE, INC., Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Ho, Jill)
December 14, 2010 Filing 22 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice, 20 Declaration, 17 Declaration, 16 Declaration, 18 Declaration, 21 Declaration, 19 Declaration (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 21 Declaration of Alexander Rudis filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 20 Declaration of Jennifer Bauer filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 19 Declaration of David Nelson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 18 Declaration of Edward DeFranco filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 17 Declaration of Kevin Johnson filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 16 Declaration of Charles K. Verhoeven filed by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. re: 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice filed by Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 15 Motion to Admit Verhoeven, Nelson, Johnson, DeFranco, Bauer and Rudis Pro Hac Vice by Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hansen, Scott)
December 14, 2010 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance Rebecca Frihart Kennedy filed by Rebecca Frihart Kennedy for Defendants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Frihart Kennedy, Rebecca)
December 3, 2010 Filing 13 Reply to Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc. by Counter Claimants Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Peterson, James)
December 2, 2010 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola, Inc., filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '949 patent, # 2 Exhibit B - '002 patent, # 3 Exhibit C - '315 patent, # 4 Exhibit D - RE '486 patent, # 5 Exhibit E - '354 patent, # 6 Exhibit F - '263 patent, # 7 Exhibit G - '983 patent, # 8 Exhibit H - '705 patent, # 9 Exhibit I - '647 patent, # 10 Exhibit J - '852 patent, # 11 Exhibit K - '131 patent, # 12 Exhibit L - '337 patent, # 13 Exhibit M - '867 patent, # 14 Exhibit N - '721 patent, # 15 Exhibit O - '599 patent) (Peterson, James)
November 29, 2010 Case randomly reassigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
November 12, 2010 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Jacqueline Tatjana Harlow for Plaintiff Apple, Inc., Counter Defendant Apple, Inc. (Harlow, Jacqueline)
November 12, 2010 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed by Plainitiff Apple, Inc. Motorola, Inc. served on 11/2/2010, answer due 11/23/2010. (Peterson, James) Modified on 11/12/2010 from defendant to plaintiff as the filer. (vob).
November 12, 2010 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. Motorola Mobility, Inc. served on 11/2/2010, answer due 11/23/2010. (Peterson, James) Modified on 11/12/2010 (vob) from defendant to plaintiff as the filer.
November 12, 2010 Telephone Pretrial Conference rescheduled from 12/10/2010 to 12/17/2010 at 09:30 AM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (vob)
November 10, 2010 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2010 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (vob)
November 9, 2010 Filing 8 Certificate of Service by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
November 9, 2010 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Claimant Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
November 9, 2010 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Counter Claimant Motorola, Inc., Defendant Motorola, Inc. (Hansen, Scott)
November 9, 2010 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple, Inc. by Defendants Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Plaintiff Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Patent No. 5,311,516, # 2 Exhibit Patent No. 5,319,712, # 3 Exhibit Patent No. 5,490,230, # 4 Exhibit Patent No. 5,572,193, # 5 Exhibit Patent No. 6,175,559, # 6 Exhibit Patent No. 6,359,898) (Hansen, Scott)
November 1, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Motorola, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Motorola Mobility) (vob)
November 1, 2010 Filing 3 Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (vob)
November 1, 2010 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: Briefing Guidelines, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order Regarding Assignment of Civil Cases, Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, Order on Dispositive Motions. (vob)
November 1, 2010 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (vob)
October 29, 2010 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Apple, Inc. (Peterson, James)
October 29, 2010 Filing 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 34690009112.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 7,479,949, issued 01/20/2009, held by Apple Inc. ; Patent # 6,493,002, issued 12/10/2002, held by Apple Inc. ; Patent # 5,838,315, issued 11/17/1998, held by Apple Inc. ;, filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 - US Patent 7,479,949, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 - US Patent 7,479,949, # 3 Exhibit B - US Patent 6,493,002, # 4 Exhibit C - US Patent 5,838,315, # 5 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, # 6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons - Motorola, Inc., # 8 Summons - Motorola Mobility, Inc.) (Peterson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple, Inc. v. Motorola, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: James Donald Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?