Dougan, Donald v. State of Wisconsin
Petitioner: Donald Allan Ray Dougan
Respondent: William Pollard
Case Number: 3:2011cv00193
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that petitioner shall pay the $505 appellate docketing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a Trust Fund Account Statement within 20 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/22/2014. (jef),(ps)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT denying the supplemental amended petition of Donald Allan Ray Dougan for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 and dismissing this case with prejudice. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Petitioner to submit Trust fund account statement or $5 filing fee. Trust Fund Account Statement due 4/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/17/2011. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dougan, Donald v. State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Pollard
Represented By: Mark Anthony Neuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Allan Ray Dougan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?