Sanders, Christopher v. Lundmark
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Sanders
Defendant: Lundmark
Case Number: 3:2011cv00206
Filed: March 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Chippewa
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (PAO/lak). (jef),(ps)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER staying a decision on defendant's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment For Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies until October 19, 2011 to allow plaintiff to supplement the record if he chooses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/5/2011. (jef),(ps)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 40.59 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 4/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/22/2011. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders, Christopher v. Lundmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lundmark
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?