Hageman, Cynthia v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia A. Hageman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2011cv00377
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security, granting his motion to dismiss this case as untimely. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that plaintiff may have until August 22, 2011 to show why her complaint should not be dismissed as untimely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/20/2011. (jef),(ps)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that plaintiff may have until July 14, 2011 to submit information to the court identifying the final decision that she is challenging. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/30/2011. (jef),(ps)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER staying plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is to submit information identifying the final decision being challenged, the final decision date or the Appeals Council letter authorizing plaintiff to file a federal action. Amendments to Pleadings due 6/21/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/31/2011. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hageman, Cynthia v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia A. Hageman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard D. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?