Herrington, Pamela v. Waterstone Mortgage Corporation

Plaintiff: Pamela Herrington
Defendant: Waterstone Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv00779
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2018 157 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 136 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff Pamela Herrington, both individually and on behalf of all similarly situated persons, is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $97,308.50 and costs in the amount of $870.62. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/12/2018. (kwf)
January 5, 2018 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 142 Motion to Stay Execution on Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/5/2018. (kwf)
December 4, 2017 133 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Enforce Judgment of Arbitration Award; granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, or, in the Alternative, to Modify the Award; denying 118 Motion to Stay; denying 125 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/4/2017. (kwf)
January 28, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 82 Motion to Reopen Case ; denying 83 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/28/14. (rep)
December 16, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 and 86 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/16/13. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrington, Pamela v. Waterstone Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Herrington
Represented By: Matthew Dunn
Represented By: Dan Getman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterstone Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Russell B. Berger
Represented By: Ari Karen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?