Vasquez, Luis et al v. Braemer, Daniel et al
Plaintiff: Luis Vasquez, David Greenwood, Javier Salazar, Julian Lopez and Anthony Riach
Defendant: Daniel Braemer, Don Strahota, William Pollard, Pamela Zank, Jeffrey Garbelman, Michael Thurmer and Gary Ankarlo
Case Number: 3:2011cv00806
Filed: December 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting plaintiffs Luis Vasquez, David Greenwood, Javier Salazar, Julian Lopez and Anthony Riach's 106 motion for an extension of time to file a notice of appeal from the August 14, 2013 judgment. Plaintiffs' motion for an extensio n of time to submit a notice with all five plaintiffs' signatures, dkt. # 108 , is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' motion to submit one $455 filing fee for their joint appeal, dkt. # 108 , is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motions for an extensi on of time to submit their motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, supporting financial information and individual fees, dkts. # 108 , 122 , are DENIED as unnecessary. Plaintiffs Lopez's and Salazar's motions for leave to proceed i n forma pauperis on appeal, dkt. # 124 , 132 , are GRANTED. Plaintiff Lopez may have until November 29, 2013, in which to submit a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in the amount of $134.19. Plaintiff Salazar may have unti l November 29, 2013, in which to submit a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in the amount of $21.92. If either of these plaintiffs fails to pay the initial partial payment or explain his failure to do so, I will advise the court of appeals of his noncompliance in paying the assessment so that it may take whatever steps it deems appropriate with respect to this appeal. Plaintiff Greenwood may have until November 22, 2013, in which to submit a trust fund account statement for the period beginning March 16, 2013 and ending approximately September 16, 2013. Plaintiff Riach's motion to withdraw from the appeal, dkt. # 131 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/12/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants dismissing the case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 8/14/2013. (elc),(ps)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 67 Motion to Stay ; denying 67 Motion to Compel; denying 68 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel and to Appoint Expert; granting 89 , 98 Motions for Leave to File. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment for defendants and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/13/2013. (jef),(ps)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that each plaintiff may have until April 3, 2012 to notify the court whether he wishes to prosecute this action jointly or whether he wishes to initiate his own lawsuit. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/23/2012. (jef),(ps)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on ifp requests: Initial partial filing fees of $50.12, $135.13, $57.06, $121.46 and $102.78 assessed. ( Initial partial filing fees due 1/26/2012.) Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/5/2012. (jef),(ps)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that each plaintiff may have until January 3, 2012, in which to advise the court whether he wishes to prosecute this action jointly. If plaintiffs decide to proceed with the action, each may have until January 3, 2012, in which to submit a trust fund account statement covering the period beginning May 29, 2011 and ending November 29, 2011. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/6/2011. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez, Luis et al v. Braemer, Daniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Riach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Braemer
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Strahota
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Zank
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Garbelman
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Thurmer
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Ankarlo
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?