Parrish, Kenneth v. McCulloch, Deborah et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Parrish
Defendant: William Parker and Deborah McCulloch
Case Number: 3:2012cv00280
Filed: April 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Juneau
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (PAO/lak). (jef),(ps)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 9.60 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 6/22/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/30/2012. (jef),(ps)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 5/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/23/2012. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish, Kenneth v. McCulloch, Deborah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Parker
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah McCulloch
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?