Rivera, Nataneal v. Jimenez, George, et al
Plaintiff: Natanael Rivera
Defendant: George J. Jimenez
Case Number: 3:2012cv00476
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Leave to proceed ifp granted. Plaintiff may have until February 7, 2014, in which to submit a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in the amount of $0.50. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/24/2014. (jef),(ps)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying plaintiff's 41 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/23/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 25 Motion for order directing defendants to allow plaintiff to view Exhibit 101 as unnecessary. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/22/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that plaintiff's $6.01 initial partial payment of the $350 fee for filing this case may be taken from his release account funds. Initial partial filing fee due 8/17/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/27/2012. (jef),(ps)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER that this case is SEVERED from case 12-cv-240-bbc in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 20. Plaintiff's "Amended Verified Complaint," will proceed as a case no. 12-cv-476-bbc. Plaintiff is directed to make an initial partial payment of $6.01 for case no. 12-cv- 476-bbc. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/5/2012. (jef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera, Nataneal v. Jimenez, George, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natanael Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George J. Jimenez
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?