Pacific Cycle, Inc. v. PowerGroup International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pacific Cycle, Inc.
Defendant: PowerGroup International, LLC, Tomberlin Automotive Group, Inc. and Michael Tomberlin
Counter_claimant: Tomberlin Automotive Group, Inc., Michael Tomberlin and PowerGroup International, LLC
Counter_defendant: Pacific Cycle, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00529
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER that judgment to be entered in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $1,560,000 against defendant Powergroup International and in favor of defendant Michael Tomberlin dismissing plaintiff's claims with prejudice. The case is dismissed against defendant Tomberlin Automotive Group without prejudice subject to reopening upon completion of bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/22/13. (rep)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER that plaintiff Pacific Cycle, Inc.'s claim of alter ego liability against Michael Tomberlin is dismissed with prejudice, and this case is closed pending further action of the Georgia bankruptcy court. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/6/13. (rep)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion in Limine to preclude testimony or other evidence from Thomas Frazee. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/23/13. (rep)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER that defendants are to respond by 10/16/13 to plaintiff's request that, in the alternative, it be allowed to amend the complaint. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/11/13. (rep)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying 96 Motion for Recusal. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/7/13 at 10:00 am. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/1/13. (rep)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION AND ORDER re: 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/30/2013. (lak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Cycle, Inc. v. PowerGroup International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Cycle, Inc.
Represented By: James Donald Peterson
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Gregor
Represented By: Dustin Brett Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PowerGroup International, LLC
Represented By: Catherine M. Rottier
Represented By: Tasha R. Roberts
Represented By: Latasha Rebecca Roberts
Represented By: Richard L. Braun, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomberlin Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Braun, II
Represented By: Latasha Rebecca Roberts
Represented By: Tasha R. Roberts
Represented By: Catherine M. Rottier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Tomberlin
Represented By: Richard L. Braun, II
Represented By: Latasha Rebecca Roberts
Represented By: Tasha R. Roberts
Represented By: Catherine M. Rottier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Tomberlin Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Braun, II
Represented By: Latasha Rebecca Roberts
Represented By: Tasha R. Roberts
Represented By: Catherine M. Rottier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Michael Tomberlin
Represented By: Richard L. Braun, II
Represented By: Latasha Rebecca Roberts
Represented By: Tasha R. Roberts
Represented By: Catherine M. Rottier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PowerGroup International, LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Braun, II
Represented By: Latasha Rebecca Roberts
Represented By: Tasha R. Roberts
Represented By: Catherine M. Rottier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pacific Cycle, Inc.
Represented By: Dustin Brett Brown
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Gregor
Represented By: James Donald Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?