Parrish, Kenneth v. McCulloch, Deborah et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Parrish
Defendant: Deborah McCulloch and William Parker
Case Number: 3:2012cv00750
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Juneau
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Plaintiff may have until May 5, 2014, in which to submit a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in the amount of $27.16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/11/2014. (jef),(ps)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Trust Fund Account Statement due 4/21/2014. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/1/2014. (jef),(ps)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Deborah McCulloch, William Parker dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying plaintiff's 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/26/2013. (jef),(ps)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 14.55 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 11/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/24/2012. (jef),(ps)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 11/5/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/12/2012. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish, Kenneth v. McCulloch, Deborah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah McCulloch
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Parker
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?