Neuroscience, Inc. et al v. Forrest, Richard et al
Plaintiff: Neuroscience, Inc. and Pharmasan Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Richard T. Forrest and Cerulean Investments, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2012cv00813
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Polk
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying as premature defendant Richard T. Forrest's 133 Motion to dismiss certain motions that may be filed in the future by plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/14/2015. (jef),(ps)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying plaintiff's 122 Motion to Vacate Judgment; denying defendants' 128 , 129 , 130 Motions for Garnishment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/2/2014. (jef),(ps)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 JUDGMENT in favor of Neuroscience, Inc., Pharmasan Labs, Inc. against Cerulean Investments, Incorporated, Richard T. Forrest in the amount of $ 548,477.32. (BBC / PAO). (jef),(ps)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that plaintiffs Neuroscience, Inc.and Pharmasan Labs, Inc. are awarded damages in the amount of $548,477.32 against defendants Richard T. Forrest and Cerulean Investments, Incorporated, who are in default. The clerk of court is directed to enter default judgment against both defendants accordingly and close this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/2/2014. (jef),(ps)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying the request filed by plaintiffs Neuroscience, Inc. and Pharmasan Labs, Inc. to resolve their damages claim through written submissions. Plaintiffs may have until May 30, 2014, to submit a memorandum identifying the amount of damages they seek and the basis for that amount. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/28/2014. (elc),(ps)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER that the clerk of court is to UNSEAL 97 Response to Order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/25/2014. (jef),(ps)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER that the clerk of court is directed to UNSEAL docket nos. 45 - 47 , 70 and 89 . The "motion for noncompliance" filed by plaintiffs Neuroscience, Inc. and Pharmasan Labs, Inc., dkt. # 94 , is DENIED. A telephone status conference will be held before Magistrate Judge Stephen Crocker on April 23, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. It is the responsibility of plaintiffs' counsel to set up the call, but it is defendant Richard Forrest's responsibility to insure that plaintiffs' cou nsel have a telephone number that allows them to reach him at the scheduled time. The May 12, 2014 trial date is STRICKEN. A default hearing on damages is scheduled for June 2, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. If defendant Forrest does not participate in the statu s conference or appear at the scheduled deposition, he will forfeit his right to present any evidence to challenge plaintiffs' reasonable estimate of their damages at the June 2 hearing. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/15/2014. (jef),(ps)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs' counsel shall attempt to arrange a mutually convenient time for defendant to appear for a deposition no later than the week of March 24, 2014. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/7/2014. (jef),(ps)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion for Sanctions and Denying 79 Motion for Default Motion. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/14/2014. (voc)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 49 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/5/2013. (voc)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Ex Parte Motion for Sanctions by Plaintiffs Neuroscience, Inc. and Pharmasan Labs, Inc. Not later than 12/6/2013, defendant Richard Forrest shall produce to defendants all items, devices and medi a, without limitation, in his actual or constructive possession or under his actual or constructive control on which electronically stored information currently is stored or was stored that relates in any manner to this lawsuit. Defendant shall not d elete, encrypt or otherwise alter information and shall not sever, disguise or otherwise alter any links or paths to this information from these items, devices or media. Plaintiffs may mirror or otherwise copy from these items, devices and media all information related in any manner to this lawsuit. On 12/6/2013 at noon, the court shall unseal plaintiffs' ex parte motion and supporting documents while maintaining under seal from the public documents identified as confidential. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/3/2013. (arw) Modified on 12/3/2013. (arw)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Dismiss by defendants. Granting 20 Motion to Strike by plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/16/2013. (voc)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Compel; granting 29 Motion to Amend Schedule; granting 32 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/5/13. (krj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neuroscience, Inc. et al v. Forrest, Richard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neuroscience, Inc.
Represented By: Henry M Helgen, III
Represented By: Pamela Hodges Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pharmasan Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Henry M Helgen, III
Represented By: Pamela Hodges Nissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard T. Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerulean Investments, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?