Townsend, Reggie v. Pulver et al
Plaintiff: Reggie L. Townsend
Defendant: Pulver, Mark Clements, Captain Schueler, 1st Shift Seg Sgt. and 2nd Shift Seg Sgt.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00896
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants and dismissing this case with prejudice. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER that defendant Brian Schueler may have until April 7, 2014, in which to advise plaintiff and the court whether he agrees to plaintiff's request for dismissal of this action without prejudice. If defendant Schueler does not agree to such a dismissal, plaintiff may have until April 14, 2014 in which to either (1) withdraw his motion to dismiss or (2) advise the court that he has no objection to a dismissal of this case with prejudice. Briefing on defendant's motion for summary judgment is STAYED pending resolution of plaintiff's motion to dismiss without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/31/2014. (jef),(ps)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 25 motion for assistance in recruiting counsel; granting 26 motion for partial summary judgment. Plaintiff's retaliation claim is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/26/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER dismissing plaintiff's claim that defendants Marc Clements and Captain Pulver subjected him to unsanitary cell conditions without prejudice to plaintiff's refiling it at a later date. Plaintiff's claim that prison officials tran sferred a dangerous prisoner into his cell and failed to respond when plaintiff complained is dismissed for plaintiff's failure to provide adequate notice as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Plaintiff may have until March 7, 2013, to file an amen ded complaint that includes the information requested in this order. If plaintiff does not respond by that date, I will construe his silence as a voluntary dismissal of this claim with prejudice and I will assess a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/21/2013. (jef),(ps)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that plaintiff may have until February 13, 2013 to identify for the court the claim(s) he is proceeding with. If plaintiff fails to respond to this order by February 13, 2013, I will enter an order dismissing the lawsuit as it presently exists without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/31/2013. (jef),(ps)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 5.83 assessed. ( Initial partial filing fee due 1/4/2013.) Plaintiff's 4 motion to use his release account funds to pay the entire filing fee is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/7/2012. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend, Reggie v. Pulver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reggie L. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulver
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Clements
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Schueler
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Shift Seg Sgt.
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2nd Shift Seg Sgt.
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?