Williams, Warren v. Dane County Sheriff's Office
Plaintiff: Warren Williams
Defendant: Dane County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 3:2013cv00068
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT entered denying plaintiff Warren Williams' leave to proceed and dismissing with prejudice this case for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. (PAO/nln) (nln),(ps)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Dismissing 1 Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Amended Complaint due 1/21/2014. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/18/2013. (jef),(ps)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 9.00 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/21/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/30/2013. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams, Warren v. Dane County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?