Johnson, Lorenzo v. Wienslo et al
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Johnson
Defendant: Wienslo, Sabish, Schenerder, Borah, Lundha, Gills, Greff and Beahn
Case Number: 3:2013cv00114
Filed: February 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that the clerk's office enter Michelle Umberger and Lissa Koop of the law firm of Perkins Coie as plaintiff's pro bono counsel of record. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/25/2016. (jef),(ps)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that the clerk's office enter Michael Mishlove and Louis Butler of the law firm of Gonzalez, Saggio & Harlan as plaintiff's pro bono counsel of record and to set this case for a scheduling conference in July 2015, as the court's schedule allows. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/16/2015. (jef),(ps)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 48 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel; denying as moot 53 Motion to Stay. All pre-trial deadlines and the trial date are STRUCK pending recruitment of pro bono counsel for plaintiff. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/29/2015. (jef),(ps)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the parties shall treat Sgt. Borah and C.O. 2 Lundha as John Doe defendants until plaintiff can ascertain their identities, and notice regarding informal service agreement with the Wisconsin Department of Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 1/17/2014. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson, Lorenzo v. Wienslo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wienslo
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabish
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenerder
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borah
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lundha
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gills
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greff
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beahn
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?