Patrick, Millard v. State of Wisconsin

Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Plaintiff: Millard Patrick, II
Case Number: 3:2013cv00231
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the civil rights complaint filed by plaintiff Millard Patrick II in Case No. 13- cv-422 is CONSOLIDATED with Case No. 13-cv-231. The clerk's office is directed to close Case No. 13-cv-422 and terminate all pending motions in that case. The parties shall file all further pleadings in Case No. 13-cv-231. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/25/2013. (jef),(ps)
April 8, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 4/30/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/8/2013. (jef),(ps)
February 12, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's 1 complaint with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/12/2014. (jef),(ps)
February 12, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case with prejudice for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
May 1, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 11.33 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/31/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/1/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick, Millard v. State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millard Patrick, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.