St. Aubin, Robert v. M.A.D. Critical Power Services, LLC et al

Defendant: Michelle Detmer, M.A.D. Critical Power Services, LLC and Edward Detmer
Plaintiff: Robert St. Aubin
Case Number: 3:2013cv00344
Filed: May 16, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on status conference. Additional telephonic status conference set for 5/21/14 at 8:30 a.m. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/23/14. (krj)
February 20, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on status conference; additional telephonic status conference set for 4/23/14 at 8:30 a.m. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/20/14. (krj)
August 14, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that if no lawyer enters appearance for defendants before midnight, 8/21/13, motion for default judgment to be entered. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/14/13. (krj)
July 22, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 7/22/13. (krj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Aubin, Robert v. M.A.D. Critical Power Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Detmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.A.D. Critical Power Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Detmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert St. Aubin
Represented By: Noah Reinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?