Componex Corporation v. Electronics For Imaging, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Componex Corporation |
Defendant: |
Electronics For Imaging, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00384 |
Filed: |
May 30, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Madison Office |
County: |
Rock |
Presiding Judge: |
William M. Conley |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen L. Crocker |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 12, 2014 |
Filing
199
ORDER Entering Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/12/14. (jat)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing
195
OPINION & ORDER: Defendant EFI's motion for summary judgment on Componex's claims of non-infringement and willful infringement (dkt. # 41 ) is GRANTED in part with respect to claims 1-4 of the '059 patent and is otherwise DENIED. P laintiff's cross-motion on the same issues is DENIED. Defendant EFI's motion for damages (notice) (dkt. # 41 ) is GRANTED in part with respect to claims 1-4 of the '059 patent. On or before 11/14/2014 the parties are DIRECTED to file updated charts listing claims and products that remain in issue consistent with the court's claim constructions and summary judgment opinions. To the extent the parties are unable to agree, the parties may also file a trial brief on or before 11 /18/2014 addressing what, if any, dispute remains with respect to the facts and law of those individual claims and products, particularly with respect to any assertion of an implied license. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/4/14. (jat)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing
152
OPINION & ORDER granting 36 Componex's Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing the inequitable conduct claim and denying the motion for infringement; granting 41 EFI's Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity and no willful infringement; denying 88 Componex's Motion to Strike; denying 116 Componex's Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/21/14. (jat)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing
119
ORDER on Claim Construction Relating to the U.S. Patent No. 6,113,059. Defendant EFI's construction of the disputed terms, as described in this opinion, are adopted by the court. Defendant EFI's motion for non-infringement 41 is GRANTED w ith respect to claims 5-22 as to the '059 patent. The court reserves judgment on claims 1-4 and plaintiff Componex's motion for infringement 36 as to the '059 patent pending submission of the parties' claims chart and, if necessary, respective explanations. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/18/2014. (arw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?