Wallace, James v. Cooper, Sarah et al
Plaintiff: James Allen Wallace
Defendant: Sarah Cooper and Thomas Ross
Case Number: 3:2013cv00507
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Winnebago
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Construing Notice of Appeal as Request to Proceed ifp. Leave to proceed ifp denied. Plaintiff's motion for the court's assistance in recruiting him counsel for his appeal, dkt. # 31 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/5/2014. (jef),(ps)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 24 Motion to alter or amend the January 7, 2014 judgment in this case. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/20/2014. (jef),(ps)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Sarah Cooper, Thomas Ross dismissing this case for plaintiff James Allen Wallace's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (PAO/elc ),(ps)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 2 , 15 Motions for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel; denying 11 Motion for (Pre-Trial) Evidentiary Hearing; denying 15 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. Plaintiff may have until November 22, 2013 to file an amende d complaint providing further explanation of the ways he is harmed by confiscation of his legal materials. If he fails to respond by that date, I will dismiss the case with prejudice and issue a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/7/2013. (jef/cc: plaintiff w/ attachment),(ps)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that plaintiff James Wallace's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to his filing an amended complaint that addresses the problems discussed in this order with respect to his claims for denial of his right to access the courts. Plainti ff may have until October 9, 2013, to file an amended complaint. If he fails to respond by that date, I will dismiss the case with prejudice and issue a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/18/2013. (jef),(ps)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 6.27 assessed. ( Initial partial filing fee due 8/26/2013.) Plaintiff's 5 motion for extension of time is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/5/2013. (jef),(ps)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit Trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due 8/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 7/22/2013. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace, James v. Cooper, Sarah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Cooper
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Ross
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allen Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?