Thomas, Darreyll v. Reese, Michael et al
Plaintiff: Darreyll T. Thomas
Defendant: Michael Reese, Robin Hampton, Rob VanNorman, Christopher Larsh, Dane County Jail, Prison Health Services Inc., Dane County - Madison, WI, Madison Police Department, Department of Corrections, C.C.I. Dept. / Health Serv. Unit and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2013cv00597
Filed: August 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Portage
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 4/3/2017. (jef),(ps)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER that the clerk's office enter Patrick Koenen of the law firm of Hinshaw & Culbertson as plaintiff's pro bono counsel of record and to set this case for a status conference in June 2016, as the court's schedule allows. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/10/2016. (jef),(ps)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 115 motion for reconsideration; denying 120 Motion to allow plaintiff to present video footage/recording as an expert witness; denying 123 motion to amend complaint; denying 124 motion to stay decision; denying 125 , 131 m otions for summary judgment. The proceedings in this case are STAYED pending recruitment of counsel for plaintiff. If the court finds counsel willing to represent plaintiff, the court will advise the parties. Soon thereafter, a status conference will be held.4. Within two weeks of plaintiff's recruited counsel's notice of appearance, defendants shall arrange for plaintiff and his counsel to view the video footage or provide a copy of the video footage to plaintiff's counsel. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/15/2016. (jef),(ps)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER that plaintiff Darreyll T. Thomas's motion to amend his complaint to include a claim against the Dane County Jail Administrator (dkt. # 102 ) is DENIED. The existing defendants are directed to file an answer to plaintiff's amended c omplaint within ten days of this order. 2. Plaintiff's motion in limine (dkt. # 91 ) is DENIED without prejudice. 3. Plaintiff's motion for a hearing (dkt. # 100 ) is DENIED. 4. Plaintiff's motion to compel (dkt. # 87 ) and defendants' motion for a protective order (dkt. # 94 ) are resolved as as described within this order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/2/2015. (jef),(ps)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting plaintiff's 59 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, granting in part plaintiff's 59 motion for use of release account funds. Initial Partial Appeal Filing Fee of $96.18 due November 21, 2014. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/31/2014. (jef),(ps)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying plaintiff's 54 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/15/2014. (jef),(ps)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting defendants' 34 Motion to Dismiss. The complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for plaintiff Darreyll T. Thomas's failure to exhaust available administrative remedies as required by 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a). The clerk 9;s office is directed to close this case and to terminate all pending motions. Plaintiff may move to reopen this case within thirty days of the date of this order if he presents evidence showing that he exhausted administrative remedies at the Dane County Jail. If plaintiff fails to so move, the clerk's office is directed to enter judgment dismissing this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/6/2014. (jef),(ps)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying plaintiff Darreyll T. Thomas's 22 motion for reconsideration regarding his request to proceed with a deliberate-indifference claim and granting Thomas's 22 request for clarification of the screening order. Thomas may proce ed with claims of excessive-force and/or failure to intervene against defendants Michael Reese, Robin Hampton, Robert Van Norman, Christopher Larsh and John Does 1 through 5. Thomas may also proceed with claims of retaliation and state law battery against defendant Reese. Thomas's request for leave to proceed with a state law negligence claim is denied. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/19/2014. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas, Darreyll v. Reese, Michael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darreyll T. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob VanNorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Larsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane County - Madison, WI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C.I. Dept. / Health Serv. Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?