Sundsmo, Lester John v. Garrigan, Daniel et al
Plaintiff: Lester John; Sundsmo
Defendant: Daniel Garrigan, Dennis Richards, John E. Accardo, Alan J. White, Gary Freyberg, Roy R. Korte, John Does #1, #2, #3, #4, #5, Other John/Jane Does #6 to #200? and County of Columbia Commissioners
Case Number: 3:2013cv00682
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Columbia
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 73 , 77 Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/2/2015. (jef),(ps)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Dismissing 1 Complaint, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. (Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due 10/23/2014. ) Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Rule 64 Seizure of a Person or Property is DENIED. The county defendants' 30 Motion t o Dismiss is DENIED. The state of Wisconsin defendants' 43 Motion to Stay proceeding pending resolution of issues related to sufficiency of the complaint and immunity is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/9/2014. (jef),(ps)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Strike. The motion for a more definite statement filed by defendants Daniel Garrigan, Dennis Richards and County of Columbia Commissioners dkt. # 13 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff Lester John Sundsmo may have until March 18, 2014 to file an amended complaint that complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/4/2014. (jef),(ps)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying plaintiff's 3 Motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/8/2013. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sundsmo, Lester John v. Garrigan, Daniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester John; Sundsmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Garrigan
Represented By: Daniel G. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Richards
Represented By: Daniel G. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Accardo
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan J. White
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Freyberg
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy R. Korte
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1, #2, #3, #4, #5
Represented By: Daniel G. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other John/Jane Does #6 to #200?
Represented By: Daniel G. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Columbia Commissioners
Represented By: Daniel G. Jardine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?