McNulty, Randall v. Wisconsin Department of Public Safety

Petitioner: Randall Wayne McNulty
Respondent: Wisconsin Department of Public Safety
Case Number: 3:2013cv00732
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 13 Motion to stay proceedings. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/25/2014. (jef),(ps)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT entered denying plaintiff Randall Wayne McNulty leave to proceed and dismissing this case for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 20.00 assessed. ( Initial partial filing fee due 11/29/2013.) Plaintiff's 3 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED as premature. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/29/2013. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNulty, Randall v. Wisconsin Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wisconsin Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randall Wayne McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?