Brenson, Darlyn v. Colvin, Carolyn

Plaintiff: Darlyn Brenson
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2013cv00752
Filed: October 29, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Darlyn Brenson against Carolyn W. Colvin awarding plaintiff attorney fees and costs under EAJA in the amount of $ 5,465.42. (VO) Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 7/16/2015. (voc)
July 15, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA. Plaintiff awarded attorney fees in the amount of $ 5,465.42. Plaintiff may have until July 22, 2015, to file a notice with the court confirming that she has assigned her right to fees to her attorney. Should she fail to do so, the clerk's office will enter judgment stating that the fees are to be paid directly to plaintiff. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/15/2015. (voc)
March 23, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered reversing the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security remanding case to the Commissioner of Social Security for further proceedings. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/23/2015. (voc)
March 20, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVERSING and REMANDING the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security denying plaintiff's application for disability benefits. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 03/20/2015. (mfh)
February 12, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the court will hear argument on plaintiff's 8 motion for summary judgment at 11:00 a.m., Thursday, March 19, 2015, in Room 360. The court will devote approximately an hour to argument. Then, following a short recess, the court expects to issue its decision from the bench. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/11/2015. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brenson, Darlyn v. Colvin, Carolyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlyn Brenson
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard Davis Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?