Schmidt, Travanti v. Reynolds
Plaintiff: Travanti Schmidt
Defendant: Reynolds
Case Number: 3:2013cv00810
Filed: November 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 29 Motion for return of filing fee and any funds sent by Melissa Lay. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/20/2015. (elc),(ps)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JUDGMENT entered denying plaintiff leave to proceed and dismissing this case with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. (PAO). (jef),(ps)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 2.30 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 1/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/11/2013. (jef),(ps)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that plaintiff is granted an enlargement of time to submit Trust fund account statement. ( Trust Fund Account Statement due 12/17/2013. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/27/2013. (jef),(ps)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff to submit $400 or trust fund account statement. Trust Fund Account Statement or $400 fee due 12/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 11/18/2013. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schmidt, Travanti v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travanti Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?