Kraemer, John v. Hoffman, Herman
Plaintiff: John C. Kraemer
Defendant: Herman E. Hoffman
Case Number: 3:2013cv00860
Filed: December 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Trempealeau
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER directing the clerk's office to provide a check payable to the Dane County Sheriff's office in the amount of $36,685.57. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/7/14. (rep),(ps)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 62 Motion to Intervene; denying 63 Motion to Stay ; denying 64 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/17/14. (rep)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Default Judgmetn ; granting 55 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher A. Beck terminated. Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $195,506.57. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/6/14. (rep)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction except that plaintiff may only receive up to the sum of $30,000 from the proceeds of the sale. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/6/14. (rep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraemer, John v. Hoffman, Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman E. Hoffman
Represented By: Justin William Peterson
Represented By: Daniel S. Diehn
Represented By: Christopher A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Kraemer
Represented By: Richard Radcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?