Luce, Gregory et al v. Town of Campbell, Wisconsin et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Luce and Nicholas Newman
Defendant: Town of Campbell, Wisconsin, Tim Kelemen and Nathan Casper
Case Number: 3:2014cv00046
Filed: January 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: La Crosse
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 203 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, Expenses and Nominal Damages; denying 198 Billl of Costs. Plaintiffs Gregory Luce and Nicholas Newman are awarded $53,625.85 in attorney fees and costs and $1 in nominal damages. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/9/2020. (arw)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 OPINION AND ORDER denying 170 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 175 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 177 Motion to Strike Declarations and Proposed Findings of Fact. Defendant is permanently ENJOINED from enforcing the Town of Campell, Wisconsin, Ordinance 912.2(2). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/29/19. (jat)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 65 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 75 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing without prejudice plaintiff Luce's state law claims. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 07/02/2015. (mfh)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 OPINION AND ORDER granting 60 Town of Campbell, Wisconsin's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and reserving in part 65 Tim Kelemen's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 70 Community Insurance Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying in part and reserving in part 75 Gregory Luce and Nicholas Newman's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/16/15. (jat)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Intervene; denying as moot 41 Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/21/14. (jat)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Clarification; denying without prejudice 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/27/14. (jat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luce, Gregory et al v. Town of Campbell, Wisconsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Luce
Represented By: Bernardo Cueto
Represented By: Erin Kuenzig
Represented By: Erin E. Mersino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Newman
Represented By: Bernardo Cueto
Represented By: Erin Kuenzig
Represented By: Erin E. Mersino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Campbell, Wisconsin
Represented By: Justin Harold Lessner
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Kelemen
Represented By: Justin Harold Lessner
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Casper
Represented By: Justin Harold Lessner
Represented By: Lori Marie Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?