Tyler, Matthew v. Wick, Stephanie et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Tyler
Defendant: Stephanie Wick, Sandra Hansen, Peter Marik, Kimberly Marks, David H. Schwarz, Margaret Beckwith, Deborah McCulloch, Robert Kneepkens, Jeffrey P. Hrudka, Mark Spees, Albert Lavender, Eric Swiatly, Mike Lutz, Val Litty, Donna Hedrich, Jamie Olson, Steve Schneider and William Parker
Case Number: 3:2014cv00068
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Juneau
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing the case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 9/29/2016. (jef),(ps)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Order GRANTING defendants' 129 Motion for protection from plaintiff's January 2016 discovery requests and to stay discovery pending resolution of immunity issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/26/2016. (elc),(ps)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 101 Motion to Compel. The court recognizes as part of this lawsuit plaintiff's due process claims regarding defendants Agent Lutz, McCulloch, Kneepkens, and Parker's deprivation of his property interest in his personal property and money. Defendants McCulloch, Kneepkens, and Parker, who were previously dismissed from the case, are now considered acti ve defendants. The current schedule is STRICKEN. The schedule for briefing a summary motion by defendants on plaintiff's due process claims is as follows: Defendants' brief-in-chief: February 8, 2016 Plaintiff's response: March 7, 2016 Defendants' reply: March 17, 2016 Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/4/2015. (jef),(ps)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting in part 103 Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file his summary judgment response; defendants' 105 Motion to Stay discovery is granted. Plaintiff may have until July 21, 2015 to submit his reply on his motion to compel. Plaintiff may have until July 28, 2015 to submit his response to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Defendant may have August 10, 2015, to file her reply. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/14/2015. (elc),(ps)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying plaintiff's 32 motion for preliminary injunctive relief regarding his legal materials. Defendants' motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 41 , is GRANTED in all respects except regarding plaintiff's federal and state claim s against defendant Agent Lutz in her individual capacity for providing false information at plaintiff's revocation hearing. All defendants other than Agent Lutz are DISMISSED from the case. The current schedule is STRICKEN and a new schedule will be set shortly. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/31/2015. (jef),(ps)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 6 Motion to Remand; granting 9 Motion to Stay Discovery. Defendants may have until April 28, 2014 to file their motion for judgment on the pleadings or provide good cause for failing to do so. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/31/2014. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler, Matthew v. Wick, Stephanie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Wick
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Hansen
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Marik
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Marks
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Schwarz
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Beckwith
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah McCulloch
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kneepkens
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey P. Hrudka
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Spees
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Lavender
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Swiatly
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lutz
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Val Litty
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hedrich
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Olson
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Schneider
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Parker
Represented By: Richard Briles Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?