Roger Seehafer v. Weyerhaeuser Company, et al

Plaintiff: Roger Seehafer
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Company and Owens-Illinois
Case Number: 3:2014cv00161
Filed: February 27, 2014
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William M. Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2016 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 354 Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part 362 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/5/2016. (arw)
February 22, 2016 353 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Weyerhaeuser Company dismissing the case. (voc)
February 19, 2016 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 203 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 268 Motion in Limine; granting 271 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 328 Motion to Strike; denying 334 Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Authenti cated; denying as moot 331 Motion to Take Deposition of David B. Allen; denying as moot 272 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 298 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant Weyerhaeuser Company. The Clerk of Court is further directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/19/2016. (arw)
July 21, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 188 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/21/2015. (voc)
June 4, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion to Compel Weyerhaeuser to Produce Documents Pursuant to Rule 34 ; Granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion to Compel by Plaintiffs ; Granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion for Protective Order from Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice by Defendant. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/3/2015. (voc)
June 2, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/2/2015. (lak)
March 23, 2015 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Motion to Establish a Protocol and Procedure for the Collection of Medical, Healthcare, Employment Bankruptcy Trusts and Other Relevant Records ; accepting 114 Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Expert Deadline ; granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Amend/Correct case management schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/20/2015. (voc)
March 20, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Establishing Records Collection Protocol and Procedures Relating to the Authorization for Release of Medical and Other Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/20/2015. (arw)
November 4, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 95 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; granting 96 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs' proposed second amended complaint is deemed the operative pleading. Defendants' answer is due within 21 days, except as expressly excused in this opinion and order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/4/2014. (arw)
August 22, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by defendant Weyerhaeuser Company; granting 37 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Owens-Illinois; granting 55 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Counts III and IV of plaintiffs' first ame nded complaint are dismissed with prejudice and defendant Weyerhaeuser is dismissed from this action. Counts I and II of plaintiffs' first amended complaint premised on Owens-Illinois' role as a licensor are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs may have until 9/22/2014 to file an amended complaint alleging specific facts necessary to state a claim against Owens-Illinois, provided they can do so in good faith. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/22/2014. (arw)
August 7, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Declaratory Judgment ; denying as moot 64 Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/7/14. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roger Seehafer v. Weyerhaeuser Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Seehafer
Represented By: Michael P. Cascino
Represented By: Robert G. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Company
Represented By: Mark S. DesRochers
Represented By: Tanya D. Ellis
Represented By: Joshua J. Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois
Represented By: Edward M. Casmere
Represented By: Matthew John Fischer
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Studebaker
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?