Masephol, Richard v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: Richard Masephol
Defendant: 3M Company, Donaldson Company, Gardner Denver Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Owens-Illinois Inc. and Weyerhaeuser Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv00186
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2016 545 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 534 Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part and denying in part 542 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/5/2016. (arw)
February 19, 2016 530 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 221 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 300 Motion in Limine; granting 303 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 406 Motion to Strike; denying 428 Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Authe nticated; denying as moot 425 Motion to Take Deposition of David B. Allen; denying as moot 312 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 363 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant Weyerhaeuser Company. The Clerk of Court is further directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/19/2016. (arw)
February 11, 2016 529 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 528 Notice of Settlement filed by 3M Company. Pending motions involving defendant 3M 210 , 304 , 422 , 429 , 436 are denied without prejudice as moot. All pretrial deadlines and the trial date for all claims involving defendant 3M only are stricken. Should these claims be renewed, the pending motions, remaining schedule and trial will be taken up on an expedited basis. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/11/16. (jat)
November 9, 2015 490 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 317 Motion to Bar Plaintiffs' Expert, Dr. Arnold Brody; granting in part and denying in part 320 Motion to Amend Complaint. Party Katrina Masephol added. The trial dates and pre-trial deadlines are rescheduled. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/6/15. (jat)
July 21, 2015 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 191 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/21/15. (jat)
June 4, 2015 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/3/15. (jat)
June 2, 2015 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 108 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/2/2015. (kwf)
March 23, 2015 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 119 Motion to Establish a Protocol and Procedure for the Collection of Medical, Healthcare, Employment, Bankruptcy Trusts and Other Relevant Records; accepting 136 Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Expert Deadline; granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/20/2015. (kwf) Modified on 3/23/2015 (kwf).
March 20, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Establishing Records Collection Protocol and Procedures Relating to the Authorization for Release of Medical and Other Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/20/2015. (arw)
November 4, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; granting 106 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 91 Motion for Reconsideration. Owens-Illinois Inc. termina ted as defendant in this action. Plaintiffs' proposed second amended complaint is deemed the operative pleading. Defendants' answer is due within 21 days, except as expressly excused in this opinion and order. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/4/2014. (arw)
August 22, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion to Dismiss; granting 57 Motion to Dismiss; granting 77 Motion for Leave to File; granting 80 Motion for Leave to File. Weyerhaeuser is dismissed from this action. Plaintiff may have until September 22, 2014, to file an amended complaint alleging specific facts necessary to state a claim against Owens-Illinois. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/22/14. (jat)
May 29, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court Disregard. Filed in wrong case. (rep) Modified on 5/29/2014 (rep).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masephol, Richard v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Masephol
Represented By: Michael P. Cascino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donaldson Company
Represented By: Julie P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?