Betco Corporation, Ltd. v. Peacock et al
Plaintiff: |
Betco Corporation, Ltd. |
Defendant: |
Malcolm D. Peacock, Marilyn Peacock, B. Holdings, Inc. and E. Holdings, LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00193 |
Filed: |
March 10, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin |
Office: |
Madison Office |
County: |
Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
William M. Conley |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen L. Crocker |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 23, 2016 |
Filing
209
ORDER denying 195 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 196 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 192 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant awarded attorney fees in the amount of $757,752.65; denying as moot 161 Motion for Sanctions; Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/23/2016. (jls)
|
June 8, 2015 |
Filing
176
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion for Summary Judgment. Trial will proceed as scheduled on Betco's only remaining claim for breach of the contractual duty of good faith and fair dealing against defendant Malcolm Peacock. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/8/15. (jls)
|
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
128
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff Betco Corporation has until 3/20/2015 to file a response only addressing defendant's newly-raised damages argument. Defendants may file and additional motion for summary judgment on or before 3/20/2015. Plaintiff may have 14 days to respond; no reply will be allowed unless invited by the court. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 2/27/2015. (voc)
|
July 22, 2014 |
Filing
95
ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall have until August 5, 2014, to file and serve an amended complaint containing good faith allegations sufficient to establish complete diversity of citizenship for purposes of determining subject matter jur isdiction under 28 U.S.C. § 1332; failure to amend timely shall result in prompt dismissal of this matter for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity Citizenship due 8/5/2014. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/22/2014. (voc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Betco Corporation, Ltd. v. Peacock et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Betco Corporation, Ltd. |
Represented By: |
Sara L. Gehrig |
Represented By: |
Reginald S. Jackson, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Reginald Sherman Jackson, Jr. |
Represented By: |
David Charles Moore |
Represented By: |
Timothy P. Nackowicz |
Represented By: |
Timothy Patrick Nackowicz |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Malcolm D. Peacock |
Represented By: |
Albert Bianchi, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Mary C. Turke |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Marilyn Peacock |
Represented By: |
Albert Bianchi, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Mary C. Turke |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: B. Holdings, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Albert Bianchi, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Mary C. Turke |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: E. Holdings, LLC |
Represented By: |
Albert Bianchi, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Mary C. Turke |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?