Grissom, Terrance v. Schwochert, James et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Grissom
Defendant: James R. Schwochert and Edward Wall
Case Number: 3:2014cv00194
Filed: March 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 16 , 17 motions for preliminary injunctive relief. Defendant Wall is dismissed from the case. Plaintiff is to submit a check or money order for $0.03 made payable to the clerk of court on or before March 26, 2015. If plaintiff fails to make the initial partial payment by this deadline or show cause for his failure to do so, I will direct the clerk of court to close the case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/12/15. (jef),(ps)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing 1 Complaint, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8; denying 13 Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief, denying 6 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. Plaintiff may have until August 18, 2014 to file an amended complaint more fully explaining the basis for his claims that defendants allowed plaintiff's conditions of confinement to exacerbate his mental illnesses and that defendant Edward Wall was responsible for failing to protect him from assaults by prison st aff. Service of the complaint on defendant Schwochert is STAYED pending receipt of plaintiff's amended complaint. Plaintiff is assessed $0.03 as an initial partial payment of the $350 fee for filing this case. He is to submit a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in this amount on or before August 18, 2014. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/28/2014. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grissom, Terrance v. Schwochert, James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Schwochert
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Wall
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?