Nouis Technologies, Inc. v. Polaris Industries Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nouis Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc. and Polaris Industries Manufacturing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00233
Filed: March 28, 2014
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 101 Motion for Leave from Requirements of Administrative Order 311 re 92 Brief in Reply, 93 Declaration, and 98 Exhibit. Plaintiff has three days to comply with Administrative Order 311 by filing redacted public versions of Dkt. 92 and Dkt. 93 . Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/13/2015. (jls)
July 28, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overuling 83 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Defendants Polaris Industries Inc., Polaris Industries Manufacturing. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 7/28/2015. (jls)
May 27, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER that Plaintiff Nouis Technologies, Inc.'s motion to strike defendants Polaris Industries Inc., Polaris Industries Inc., and Polaris Industries Manufacturing LLC's affirmative defenses and to dismiss their counterclaims, Dkt. 29 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/27/15. (jls)
October 6, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of dismissal without prejudice. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/6/2014. (voc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nouis Technologies, Inc. v. Polaris Industries Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nouis Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Konrad V. Sherinian
Represented By: Frank W. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries Manufacturing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?