Boyer et al v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Don Walz, Mary Lou Trowbridge, Gordon Trowbridge, Susan Hollenbeck, Lois Timmerman, Lawrence Taft Kuman, Carol Stoner, Michael Stoner, Marcia Stiwell, Joan Sedlmayr, Eileen Schiffman, Donald Schiffman, Pamela Peters, Kathryn S Peters, Wesley C Morse, Hollie Moore, Marian Miller, Douglas Miller, MARY MARTIN, Dan Martin, Glenn E Marshall, Denise K Fuller, Diane Kuman, Theresa Klema, Joanne F Kieler, Jeidy, Brian N James, Kenneth R Irish, Jean Irish, Tanya Haffele, Bill Haffele, Rita Gerrish, James Gerrish, Carol Everett, Mary Ecker, Elwyn Ecker, Melinda Dilley, Mark Dilley, Mardyne Davis, Joyce Davis, Barb Collins, Michael Collins, Barbara A Bruce, Larry Trudo, Beatrice Boyer, Mary Walz, Arnold Wells, Elaine Wells, Paul Jackley, Ruth Jackley, Robert Petereson, Jeffrey R Mezera, Julie Mezera, Larkin and Darlene Maahs
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv00260
Filed: April 7, 2014
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant BNSF Railway Company dismissing the case. (rep)
July 31, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Jurisdiction. Proof of Diversity Citizenship due 8/13/2014. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/30/14. (rep)
May 22, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting briefing deadlines on 36 Motion for Sanctions and 34 MOTION TO DISMISS: Brief in Opposition due 6/13/2014. Brief in Reply due 6/27/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/21/14. (rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyer et al v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Walz
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Trowbridge
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Trowbridge
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Hollenbeck
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Timmerman
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Taft Kuman
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Stoner
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stoner
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Stiwell
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Sedlmayr
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Schiffman
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Schiffman
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Peters
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn S Peters
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley C Morse
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollie Moore
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Miller
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Miller
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY MARTIN
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Martin
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn E Marshall
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise K Fuller
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Kuman
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Klema
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne F Kieler
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeidy
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian N James
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R Irish
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Irish
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Haffele
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Haffele
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Gerrish
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gerrish
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Everett
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ecker
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elwyn Ecker
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Dilley
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Dilley
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mardyne Davis
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Davis
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barb Collins
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Collins
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A Bruce
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Trudo
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Boyer
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Walz
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Wells
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Wells
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Jackley
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Jackley
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Petereson
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey R Mezera
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Mezera
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larkin
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Maahs
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Represented By: Brian G. Brooks
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Represented By: Christopher D. Stombaugh
Represented By: Tiffany R. Wunderlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Leah Ceee O. Boomsma
Represented By: Barry Deacon
Represented By: Jason Mark Milne
Represented By: Timothy R. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?