Weston, Henry v. Pollard, William et al

Plaintiff: Henry Weston
Defendant: William Pollard, Manlove, Belinda Schrubbe and D. Larson
Case Number: 3:2014cv00306
Filed: April 25, 2014
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Madison Office
County: Fond du Lac
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that for the remainder of this lawsuit, with respect to the defendants Belinda Schrubbe, Ed Neiser, Dr. Jeffrey Manlove, and Amy Radcliffe, plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Wisconsin Department of Justice. R.N. Cole will be treated as a Doe defendant, whose identity will be ascertained through discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/29/2016. (jef),(ps) Modified docket text on 6/29/2016 (jef).
February 5, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 1 complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8., denying 16 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. (Amended complaint due 2/26/2016.) Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/5/2016. (jef),(ps)
November 21, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing 1 Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. (Amended Complaint due 12/19/2014.) Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/21/2014. (jef),(ps)
April 30, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 85.93 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 5/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 4/30/2014. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weston, Henry v. Pollard, William et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manlove
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Schrubbe
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Larson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?