Ibeagwa v. United States of America (Internal Revenue Service)
Plaintiff: Christian C. Ibeagwa
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2014cv00369
Filed: May 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying plaintiff's 144 Motion for Reconsideration; plaintiff's denying 148 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/27/2015. (jef),(ps)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying plaintiff's 126 request for costs; denying plaintiff's 130 motion for leave to amend; denying plaintiff's 132 motion for leave to further amend. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/26/2015. (jef),(ps)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendant Internal Revenue Service dismissing this case. (PAO/jef). (jef),(ps)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER deferring ruling on 80 Motion for Summary Judgment; deferring ruling on 87 Motion for Protective Order; denying 102 Motion to Vacate; denying 106 Motion for Court to take judicial notice in ruling on defendant's motion for partial summary judgment on plaintiff's FOIA claim. Plaintiff may have until May 29, 2015, to file supplemental materials. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/15/2015. (jef),(ps)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting defendant Internal Revenue Service's 64 motion for judgment on the pleadings on plaintiff Christian Ibeagwa's claims under the equal protection clause, the due process clause and the Administrative Procedure Act. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/4/2015. (jef),(ps)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that defendant Internal Revenue Service's 34 motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction is DENIED. Plaintiff Christian Ibeagwa's 54 motion for leave to file a corrected surreply brief is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 57 "motion to take judicial notice" is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/06/2014. (nln),(ps)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 30 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/17/2014. (nln),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibeagwa v. United States of America (Internal Revenue Service)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian C. Ibeagwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: AUSA
Represented By: Ann E. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?