ABS Global, Inc. v. Inguran, LLC
Plaintiff: ABS Global, Inc.
Defendant: Inguran, LLC d/b/a Sexing Technologies
Counter Defendant: Genus PLC
Intervenor: XY, LLC
Intervenor Defendant: Cytonome/ST, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00503
Filed: July 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Justin Harold Lessner re: Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC (Notice of Withdrawal of John W. McBride as Counsel) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Lessner, Justin)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Justin Harold Lessner re: Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC Notice of Withdrawal of Paul J. Rogerson as Counsel Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Lessner, Justin)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 ORDER from USCA dismissing appeal pursuant to Rule 42(b). No record to be returned. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Issuance of Mandate) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1295 ORDER granting #1294 (693 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Joint Motion for Satisfaction and Release of Registry. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/29/2022. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 Joint Motion for Satisfaction and Release of Registry by Defendant Inguran, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Moffett, Daniel) Modified on 12/27/2022. (lak)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 ORDER granting #1291 Stipulation for Agreed Order Staying Enforcement of Attorneys' Fee Award. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/15/2022. (jls)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 Redaction to (1291 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Stipulation. Agreed Order Staying Enforcement of Attorneys' Fee Award by Counter Defendants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sealed cover) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Moffett, Daniel) Modified on 8/8/2022. (lak)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 Stipulation by Counter Defendants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Agreed Order Staying Enforcement of Attorneys' Fee Award. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Credit) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Moffett, Daniel) Modified on 8/8/2022: Changed from Notice to Stipulation. (lak)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 2022-2098 for (685 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (rks)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 22-2346 for (1289 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 689 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Notice of Appeal, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1290 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheets to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: (1289 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 689 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Docket Sheet for 14-cv-503, #3 Docket Sheet for 17-cv-446) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (lak)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC as to (1283 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Stipulation. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number WIWDC-3099154 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Moffett, Daniel) Modified on 7/29/2022. (lak)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Information Sheet, Amended Judgment, Orders and Docket Sheets to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re: (1285 in 3:14-cv-503-wmc, 685 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Information Sheet, #2 Amended Judgment, #3 Order No.: 280, #4 Order No.: 403, #5 Order No.: 592, #6 Order No.: 683, #7 Docket Sheet for 17-cv-446, #8 Docket Sheet for 14-cv-503) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc. (lak)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Orders, Judgment and Docket Sheets to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: (1284 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 684 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc,) Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Order No.: 1197, #2 Order No.: 1211, #3 Judgment No.: 1212, #4 Order No.: 1283, #5 Docket Sheet for 14-cv-503, #6 Docket Sheet for 17-cv-446) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (lak)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 Appeal Information Packet. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (lak)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 22-2339 for (689 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Notice of Appeal filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC as to (613 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Judgment, (1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order on Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 USC 2255, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion Requesting Redactions to Transcript, Order on Motion to Seal, (1008 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 403 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion for Clarification, Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (280 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, (1283 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 683 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Stipulation. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number WIWDC-3098710 paid. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2022. (lak)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1284 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC as to (1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order on Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 USC 2255, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion Requesting Redactions to Transcript, Order on Motion to Seal, (1212 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Judgment, (1211 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 606 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order, (1283 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 683 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for New Trial, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Stipulation. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number WIWDC-3098674 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2022. (lak)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 POST-JUDGMENT ORDER on various pending motions to alter or amend judgment, for awards of attorney's fees and costs and other related motions. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 07/01/22. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (mfh)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Justin Harold Lessner re: Plaintiffs ABS Global, Inc., Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Kevin M. Fee Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Lessner, Justin)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1281 Redaction to (679 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1279 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Stipulation Regarding Extension of Original Letter of Credit Protecting ST's Interest in Secured Portion of ABS II Judgment [re: Case No. 17-cv-446] (Sealed Document) [re: Case No. 17-cv-446] by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal: Replacement Letter of Credit) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Lessner, Justin)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1280 Redaction to (678 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1278 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Stipulation Regarding Extension of Original Letter of Credit Protecting ST's Interest in Secured Portion of ABS I Judgment [re: Case No. 14-cv-503] (Sealed Document) [re: Case No. 14-cv-503] by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal: Replacement Letter of Credit) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Lessner, Justin)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Original Letter of Credit Protecting ST's Interest in Secured Portion of ABS II Judgment [re: Case No. 17-cv-446] (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Replacement Letter of Credit) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Lessner, Justin)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Original Letter of Credit Protecting ST's Interest in Secured Portion of ABS I Judgment [re: Case No. 14-cv-503] (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Replacement Letter of Credit) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Lessner, Justin)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Daniel L Moffett re: Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Kirt S. O'Neill Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Moffett, Daniel)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 Notice by Counter Claimant Inguran, LLC, Counter Defendants XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiff Inguran, LLC Regarding Patent Office Affirmance of the '309 Patents Validity in Concurrent Reexamination Proceeding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reexamination Certificate for '987, #2 Exhibit B - Reexamination Certificate for '476, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Intent To Issue Reexamination Certificate of US 7,611,309) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Moffett, Daniel)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 Notice of Appearance filed by Justin Harold Lessner for Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Lessner, Justin)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Regarding Patent Office Affirmance of the '476 Patent's Validity Concerning Reexamination Proceeding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Moffett, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Michael J. Modl re: Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Withdrawal of PHV Counsel Paul J. Zegger Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Daniel L Moffett re: Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Clayton N. Matheson Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Moffett, Daniel)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Notice Regarding Patent Office Affirmance of the '987 Patent's Validity in Concurrent Reexamination Proceeding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Moffett, Daniel)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re (1269 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Notice (Other), ST's Response to ABS's Notice Regarding Concurrent Proceedings Involving the '987 Patent. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Moffett, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Regarding Concurrent Proceedings Involving the '987 Patent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order granting reexamination) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2021. (lak)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1268 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Michael J. Modl re: Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC Withdrawal of PHV Counsel Bryan C. Mulder Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1267 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Second Notice Regarding Developments Bearing on ST's Motion for a Prioritized Ruling on Post-Trial Motions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 309 Reexam Ordered) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 Declaration of Paul J. Rogerson re (665 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Notice (Other) Notice Regarding Ongoing Royalties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8/31/20 letter from Atty Rein to Atty O'Neill, #2 Exhibit B - 9/30/20 letter from Atty neill to Atty Rein) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Notice Regarding Ongoing Royalties. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1264 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re (1262 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 662 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Prioritized Ruling on ABS's Post-Judgment Motion Regarding the '987 Patent ABS's Notice Regarding Developments Bearing on ST's Motion for a Prioritized Ruling on Post-Trial Motions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 476 Reexam Ordered) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1263 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1262 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 662 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Response to ST's Motion for a Prioritized Ruling on ABS Post-Judgment Motion re '987 Patent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '987 Reexam Ordered) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1262 Motion for Prioritized Ruling on ABS's Post-Judgment Motion Regarding the '987 Patent by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Response due 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Ex Parte Reexam of U.S. Patent No. 8,206,987) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of (620 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Attorney Fees, Relating to Successful Antitrust Claim Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 Brief in Reply by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd in Support of (1221 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for New Trial, re Damages (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of (1219 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, re: '987 Patent Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1258 Brief in Reply by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd in Support of (1220 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, re: Infringement for the Cytonome '476 and '309 Patents Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 Brief in Reply by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd in Support of (1218 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, re: Cytonome Patent Invalidity Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1255 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 653 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 Motion for Leave to File a Reply In Support of ABS Motion to Stay the Judgments with Respect to Ongoing Royalties by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply Brief) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1254 Brief in Reply by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC in Support of (1228 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 626 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Attorney Fees, Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1245 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 643 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Stay, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1225 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 623 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Bill of Costs to Facilitate Offset of Costs Awards filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Filing of Trial Demonstratives. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ST Opening Liability, #2 Exhibit 2 - Moreno, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sharpe, #4 Exhibit 4 - Vacca Infringement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Nolan Enablement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Nolan Breach of Contract, #7 Exhibit 7 - Vacca Validity, #8 Exhibit 8 - ST Closing Liability, #9 Exhibit 9 - Vacca damages, #10 Exhibit 10 - Malackowski Direct Damages, #11 Exhibit 11 - Malackowski Rebuttal Damages, #12 Exhibit 12 - ST Closing Damages) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1222 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 620 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by ABS Global, Inc. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Opposition to ST's Motion for Attorney's Fees on ABS's Post-Remand Enablement Defense re: (1228 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 626 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Attorney Fees, (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1228 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 626 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1247 Brief in Support of Bill of Costs by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd re: (1225 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 623 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Bill of Costs to Facilitate Offset of Costs Awards filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 Declaration of Paul J. Zegger filed by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd Motion to Stay The Judgments with Respect to Ongoing Royalties re: (1245 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion to Stay, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - copy of 7-24-20 correspondence to Mr. O'Neill) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 Motion to Stay The Judgments With Respect to Ongoing Royalties by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd. Response due 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Draft Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (619 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1221 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for New Trial, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (616 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1218 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (618 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1220 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1241 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1219 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 617 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 Redaction to (634 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Notice (Other), Agreed Order Staying Enforcement of Paragraph 15 of the Second Amended Judgment by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 Redaction to (1237 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Notice (Other), Agreed Order Staying Enforcement of Certain Portions of the Judgment by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1237 Notice by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd Agreed Order Staying Enforcement of Certain Portions of the Judgment. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Draft letter of credit) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Agreed Order Staying Enforcement of Paragraph 15 of the Second Amended Judgment. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Draft letter of credit) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #1234 Motion for Extension of Time. (Dkt. 632 in 17-cv-446-wmc) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/21/2020. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies in Support of Post-Trial Motions by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. in Support of (628 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ABS's Reply in Support of Its Motion for the Reentry of Prior Costs Award to ABS and Response to ST's Cross-Motion Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 Objection to Bill of Costs by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1225 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 623 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Bill of Costs to Facilitate Offset of Costs Awards filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1230 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 628 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by ABS Global, Inc. ST's Response to ABS's Motion for Reentry of the Court's Prior Award of Costs to ABS & Cross Motion for Reentry of the Court's Net Award of Costs to ST & A One Day Extension of Time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 11/11/2018 letter, #2 Exhibit B - 10/29/2018 letter, #3 Exhibit C - 11/14/2018) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 Motion for Reentry of the Court's Prior Costs Award to ABS by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc.. Response due 7/13/2020. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 Declaration of George Andrew Lever Rosbrook filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1228 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 626 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Attorney Fees, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices, #2 Exhibit B - Chart of Attorney Time Calculation) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Rosbrook, George)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 Motion for Attorney Fees (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 7/27/2020. Brief in Reply due 8/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 08/15/2019 hrg transcript, #2 Exhibit B - 08/23/2019 hrg transcript, #3 Exhibit C - 08/30/2019 hrg transcript) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1227 Redaction to (619 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for New Trial Motion for a Remittitur or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial on Damages (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Mulder, Bryan)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1226 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd, Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd re: (1225 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Bill of Costs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Summary of Transcription Costs, #2 Exhibit A-2 Invoices for Transcription Costs, #3 Exhibit B-1 Summary of Printing Costs, #4 Exhibit B-2 Invoices for Printing Costs, #5 Exhibit C-1 Summary of Copying Costs, #6 Exhibit C-2 Invoices for Copying Costs) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 Bill of Costs to Facilitate Offset of Costs Awards by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd, Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd. Motions referred to Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court. Objection to Bill of Costs due 7/16/2020. Brief in Support to Bill of Costs due 7/27/2020. Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs due 7/31/2020. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1224 Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd, Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd re: (1213 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 608 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Bill of Costs filed by Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. re: (620 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Attorney Fees, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Sidley Invoices, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Summary Table) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 Motion for Attorney Fees Relating to ABS's Successful Antitrust Claim by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc.. Brief in Opposition due 7/27/2020. Brief in Reply due 8/6/2020. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1221 Motion for New Trial Motion for a Remittitur or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial on Damages (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Brief in Opposition due 7/24/2020. Brief in Reply due 8/3/2020. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Mulder, Bryan)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1220 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW and for a New Trial on Infringement for the Cytonome 476 and 309 Patents ( Brief in Opposition due 7/24/2020., Brief in Reply due 8/3/2020.) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Mulder, Bryan)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW that the Asserted Claims of the 987 Patent are Invalid for Lack of Enablement and, in the Alternative, for a New Trial ( Brief in Opposition due 7/24/2020., Brief in Reply due 8/3/2020.) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Mulder, Bryan)
July 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW of Invalidity on the Cytonome Patents, or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial ( Brief in Opposition due 7/24/2020., Brief in Reply due 8/3/2020.) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Mulder, Bryan)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1217 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Plaintiffs ABS Global, Inc., Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1213 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 608 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Bill of Costs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices for Pro Hac Vice Fees, #2 Exhibit B - Invoices for Process Server Fees, #3 Exhibit C - Invoices for Deposition Transcripts, #4 Exhibit D - Invoices for Deposition Videos, #5 Exhibit E - Invoices for hearing and trial transcripts, #6 Exhibit F-1 Receipts for Manish Deshpande, #7 Exhibit F-2 Receipts for Jonathan Sharpe, #8 Exhibit F-3 Receipts for John Nolan, #9 Exhibit F-4 Receipts for Giacomo Vacca, #10 Exhibit F-5 Receipts for Juan Moreno, #11 Exhibit F-6 Receipts for James Malackowski, #12 Exhibit F-7 Hotel Contract, #13 Exhibit G - Invoices for copying) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1216 Brief in Support of Bill of Costs by Plaintiffs ABS Global, Inc., Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1213 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 608 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Bill of Costs filed by Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct (607 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Judgment by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Modl, Michael)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 Objection to Bill of Costs by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd, Defendant Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd re: (1213 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 608 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Bill of Costs filed by Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 Bill of Costs by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Motions referred to Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court. Objection to Bill of Costs due 6/22/2020. Brief in Support to Bill of Costs due 6/30/2020. Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs due 7/6/2020. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT. (WMC /PAO) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jls).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 Order for Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/5/2020. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 Declaration of James E. Malackowski re (601 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1206 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Notice (Other),,,, (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1209 Declaration of Carrie L. Distler re (602 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1207 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Notice (Other), in Support of ABS and Genus's Proposed Judgments Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 Notice by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC re (602 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1207 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Notice (Other), Brief in Support of ABS and Genus's Proposed Judgments. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 Notice by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC ABS and Genus's Proposed Forms of Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Proposed ABS I Judgment, #2 Ex. B - Proposed ABS II Judgment) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re (1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1197 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 592 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order on Motion to Vacate Sentence per 28 USC 2255,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion Requesting Redactions to Transcript,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Seal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Proposed Form of Judgment. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Final Judgment - No. 14-cv-503, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Judgment - No. 17-cv-446, #3 Exhibit C - Redline Proposed Judgment - No. 14-cv-503, #4 Exhibit D - Redline Proposed Judgment - No. 17-cv-446) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 Redaction to (542 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Transcript, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 Redaction to (530 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Transcript, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 Redaction to (541 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Transcript, Day 6 (9-10) AM Transcript by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1202 Redaction to (544 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Transcript, Day 5 (9-9) PM Transcript by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 Redaction to (545 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Transcript, Day 6 (9-10) PM Transcript by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 Redaction to (538 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Transcript, Day 3 (9-5) AM Transcript by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ( #1151 in '503, 546 in '446) Motion for Award of Past Damages, an Accounting, Supplemental Damages and Prejudgment Interest for ABS's Infringement of the '987 Patent; granting in part and denying in part ( #1153 in '503, 548 in '446) Motion for an Accounting and Award of Supplemental Damages on the Cytonome Patents for Pre-Verdict Sales; granting in part and denying in part ( #1154 in '503, 549 in '446) Motion for an Accounting and Award of Supplemental Damages of Pre-Verdict Sales of Sexed Semen Straws that were Produced Abroad with Infringing Chips; granting in part and denying in part ( #1156 in '503, 551 in '446) Motion for an Ongoing Royalty and Alternatively, for Limited Injunctive Relief; granting in part and denying in part ( #1169 in '503, 564 in '446) Motion Requesting Redactions to Transcript; granting in part and denying in part ( #1182 in '503, 577 in '446) Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits Containing Confidential Information; granting in part and denying in part ( #1183 in '503, 578 in '446) ST's Request to Redact the Trial Transcript; granting in part and denying in part ( #1194 in '503, 589 in '446) Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits Containing Confidential Information; and setting 6/2/2020 as the deadline to file proposed judgments. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/12/2020. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of (589 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Seal, Trial Exhibits Containing Confidential Information (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC re: (1194 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 589 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Seal, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to (1194 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 589 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits Containing Confidential Information (Sealed Document). Brief in Opposition due 4/27/2020. Brief in Reply due 5/4/2020. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (kwf/bgw)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits Containing Confidential Information (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1193 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Steven Joseph Horowitz re: Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd., Withdrawing Eric T. O'Brien. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc. (Horowitz, Steven)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 USCA ORDER dismissing appeal re: (290 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 894 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Notice of Appeal by Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. No record to be returned. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc. (arw)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC of Filing of Trial Demonstratives, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opening Liability Demonstratives, #2 Exhibit B - Appleyard Liability Demonstratives, #3 Exhibit C - Di Carlo Liability Demonstratives, #4 Exhibit D - Closing Liability Demonstratives, #5 Exhibit E - Opening Damages Demonstratives, #6 Exhibit F - Di Carlo Damages Demonstratives, #7 Exhibit G - Malackowski Damages Demonstratives, #8 Exhibit H - Distler Damages Demonstratives, #9 Exhibit I - Closing Damages Demonstratives) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 1/17/2020. (lak)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting ( #1179 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, #574 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Joint Motion for Entry of Deposition Transcripts Played at Trial as Trial Exhibits, ( #529 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Unopposed Motion to File Sealed Documents Publicly in the Federal Circuit (Sealed Document) in case 3:14-cv-00503-wmc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 01/10/2020. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (rks)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Eric Taylor O'Brien re: Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Withdrawal as to Fitz B. Collings. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1188 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Eric Taylor O'Brien re: Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Withdrawal of Attorney David T. Pritikin. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1182 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 577 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits Containing Confidential Information filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 12/10/2019. (lak)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1183 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 578 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Request to Redact the Trial Transcript filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 12/10/2019. (lak)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (1184 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 579 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Respond to ST's Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits. Response due 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/4/2019. (arw)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 Motion to Respond to ST's Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits re: (577 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1182 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Response due 12/9/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 12/3/2019. (lak)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ST's Request to Redact the Trial Transcript (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Trial Day 1 PM, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Trial Day 2 AM, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts from Trial Day 5 PM, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from Trial Day 6 AM) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 11/26/2019 (jls).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 ST's Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits Containing Confidential Information (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 11/26/2019 (jls).
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Daniel L Moffett re: Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Withdrawal of Appearance as to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Rehan Safiullah. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Moffett, Daniel)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re (1178 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 573 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Text Only Order. Submission Regarding Updated Trial Exhibit 886. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Updated Trial Exhibit 886) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 Joint Motion for Entry of Deposition Transcripts Played at Trial as Trial Exhibits by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Trial Exhibit 418 (Gary Durack), #2 Exhibit B - Trial Exhibit 904 (Kenneth Michael Evans), #3 Exhibit C - Trial Exhibit 905 (Kenneth Michael Evans), #4 Exhibit D - Trial Exhibit 906 (Kenneth Michael Evans), #5 Exhibit E - Trial Exhibit 907 (Gary Durack), #6 Exhibit F - Trial Exhibit 908 (John Gilbert), #7 Exhibit G - Trial Exhibit 909 (Bernard Bunner) (Sealed Document) (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 10/25/2019. (lak/arw)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** On or before November 1, 2019, ABS is required to file an updated Exhibit 886, reflecting sales to end customers and transfers to foreign affiliates from July 1, 2019, through September 10, 2019. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/23/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1169 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 564 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion Requesting Redactions to Transcript, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Moffett, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 Brief in Reply by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC in Support of (1151 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 546 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. ST's Reply in Support of its Motion for Award of Past Damages, an Accounting, Supplemental Damages, and Prejudgment Interest for ABS's Infringement of the 987 Patent. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (546 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1151 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email from Baumgartner to Duncan dated April 5, 2017) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 Declaration of Kevin McNelis filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (546 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1151 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 Brief in Reply by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC in Support of (1156 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 551 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. ST's Reply in Support of its Motion for an Ongoing Royalty and Alternatively, for Limited Injunctive Relief. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 Declaration of Clayton N. Matheson filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1153 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 548 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ABS's Exhibit 777, bates-numbered ABS_2017_00087481 to ABS_2017_00087491, #2 Exhibit B - of ABS's Exhibit 778, bates-numbered ABS_2017_00087492 to ABS_2017_00087496, #3 Exhibit C - ABS's Exhibit 779, bates numbered ABS_2017_00102609 - ABS_2017_00102637, #4 Exhibit D - Exhibit 780, bates numbered ABS_2017_00102490 - ABS_2017_00102542) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Matheson, Clayton)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 Brief in Reply by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC in Support of (1153 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 548 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. ST's Reply in Support of Its Motion for an Accounting and Award of Supplemental Damages on the Cytonome Patents for Pre-Verdict Sales. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc.(O'Neill, Kirt)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 Brief in Reply by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC in Support of (1154 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 549 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. ST's Reply in Support of Its Motion for an Accounting and Award of Supplemental Damages on Pre-Verdict Sales of Sexed Semen Straws that were Produced Abroad with Infringing Chips. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Briefing Deadline as to (564 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion Requesting Redactions to Transcript (1150 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 545 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc), (544 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1149 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc), (1147 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 542 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc), (538 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1143 in 3:14-cv-0. Response due 10/16/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc/mh/wmc)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 Motion Requesting Redactions to Transcript (1150 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 545 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc), (544 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1149 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc), (1147 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 542 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc), (538 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1143 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc), (1146 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 541 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc), (540 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1145 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) (Sealed Document) by Counter Defendants Genus PLC, ABS Global, Inc., Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Redaction to Dkt. 1147, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Redaction to Dkt. 1143, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Redaction to Dkt. 1145, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Redaction to Dkt. 1149, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Redaction to Dkt. 1146, #6 Exhibit F - Proposed Redaction to Dkt. 1150) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 Declaration of David C. Appleyard filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Brief in Opposition re: (1156 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 551 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 10/7/2019: Last page is blank. (lak)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 Declaration of Carrie L. Distler (with Schedules Attached) filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Brief in Opposition re: (1153 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 548 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (1156 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 551 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (546 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1151 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 10/7/2019: There are documents attached to this. (lak)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 Declaration of Kirit Lezotte filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Brief in Opposition re: (1153 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 548 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (1154 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 549 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (1156 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 551 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (546 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1151 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Brief in Opposition re: (551 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1156 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2019-05-20 Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - 2019-08-14 Matheson Letter to Horowitz re: Second Supplemental Damages, #3 Exhibit C - 2019-09-10 Rosbrook Email, #4 Exhibit D - August 23, 2016 Notice of Termination) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael) Modified on 10/7/2019. (lak)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Brief in Opposition re: (546 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1151 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of 2015 Genus AR, #2 Exhibit B - 2015 Lenders' Presentation) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 Declaration of Eric T. O'Brien filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Brief in Opposition re: (1153 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 548 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PPT Project Green Update) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1156 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 551 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC for Enhanced Ongoing Royalty (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1154 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 549 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC for an Accounting and Supplemental Damages on Straws that were Produced Abroad (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1151 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 546 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC for Supplemental Damages on the 987 Patent (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1153 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 548 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC for an Accounting and Supplemental Damages on Cytonome Patents (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Briefing Deadlines set as to #1151 Motion for Award of Past Damages, an Accounting, Supplemental Damages and Prejudgment Interest for ABS's Infringement of the '987 Patent; #1153 Motion for an Accounting and Award of Supplemental Damages on the Cytonome Patents for Pre-Verdict Sales; #1154 Motion for an Accounting and Award of Supplemental Damages of Pre-Verdict Sales of Sexed Semen Straws that were Produced Abroad with Infringing; and #1156 Motion for an Ongoing Royalty and Alternatively, for Limited Injunctive Relief; Brief in Opposition due 10/4/2019. Brief in Reply due 10/11/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 Declaration of George Andrew Rosbrook filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (551 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1156 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for an Ongoing Royalty and Alternatively, for Limited Injunctive Relief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Preliminary Results Year ended June 30, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - Screenshots of ABS Sexcel Web Site, #3 Exhibit 3 - Screenshots of the "Benefits" Page of the Sexcel Website) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/24/2019. (lak)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 Declaration of James E. Malackowski filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1156 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 551 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 Motion for an Ongoing Royalty and Alternatively, for Limited Injunctive Relief (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Response due 9/30/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 Declaration of James E. Malackowski filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (1154 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 549 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for an Accounting and Award of Supplemental Damages of Pre-Verdict Sales of Sexed Semen Straws that were Produced Abroad with Infringing Chips, (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/24/2019. (lak)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 Motion for an Accounting and Award of Supplemental Damages of Pre-Verdict Sales of Sexed Semen Straws that were Produced Abroad with Infringing Chips (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Response due 9/30/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 Motion for an Accounting and Award of Supplemental Damages on the Cytonome Patents for Pre-Verdict Sales (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Response due 9/30/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (546 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1151 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Award of Past Damages, an Accounting, Supplemental Damages and Prejudgment Interest for ABS's Infringement of the '987 Patent, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ABS Royalty Report for the '987 Patent from July 1, 2018 to September 30, 2018, #2 Exhibit 2 - ABS Royalty Report for the '987 patent from October 1, 2018 to December 31, 2018) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/24/2019. (lak)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 Motion for Award of Past Damages, an Accounting, Supplemental Damages and Prejudgment Interest for ABS's Infringement of the '987 Patent (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Response due 9/30/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 Sealed Transcript of 6th Day Jury Trial, afternoon session, held 9/10/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 Sealed Transcript of 5th Day Jury Trial, afternoon session, held 9/9/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 Transcript of 3rd Day Jury Trial, held 9/5/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. AssociatedCases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 Transcript of 2nd Day Jury Trial, morning session, held 9/4/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. AssociatedCases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 Transcript of 6th Day Jury Trial, held 9/10/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: JLD. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 Transcript of 5th Day Jury Trial, morning session, held 9/9/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: JLD. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 Transcript of 4th Day Jury Trial, afternoon session, held 9/6/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: JLD. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 Sealed Transcript of 3rd Day Jury Trial, morning session, held 9/5/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: JLD. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 Transcript of 1st Day Jury Trial, morning session, held 9/3/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: JLD. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiffs Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC and Cytonome/ST, LLC's unopposed motion to file sealed documents publicly in Federal Circuit Appeal ('503 dkt. #1134 ; '446 dkt. #529) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/16/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 ORDER granting #1126 Motion for Entry of Separate Judgment ('446 dkt. 521); Briefing set re: Supplemental damages as to the '987 patent and Cytonome patents and injunctive relief. Motions due 9/23/2019, Brief in Opposition due 10/4/2019, Brief in Reply due 10/11/2019; Motions for attorneys' fees and costs due 28 days after the entry of judgment with a 21/10 briefing schedule to follow. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/16/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of ( #1126 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for the Entry of Separate Judgments Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Plaintiffs Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: ( #1126 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Entry of Separate Judgment filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Zylstra, Sarah)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 Transcript of 4th Day Jury Trial - afternoon session, held 9/6/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 Transcript of 2nd Day Jury Trial - afternoon session, held 9/4/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 Transcript of 1st Day Jury Trial - afternoon session, held 9/3/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. AssociatedCases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 Unopposed Motion to File Sealed Documents Publicly in the Federal Circuit (Sealed Document) by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Dr. John Nolan's expert report, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Defendants' Summary Judgment Brief) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (Zylstra, Sarah)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 Disregard, see #1134 . (Zylstra, Sarah) Modified on 9/12/2019 (jat).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is in receipt of ABS's motion for the entry of separate judgments. ('503 dkt. #1126 ; '446 dkt. #521.) ST may file a response to this motion on or before September 12, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. In that response, ST should also indicate whether it opposes the court entering judgment based on the jury's damages verdict, leaving the determination of any additional damages on sales after June 30, 2019, for an amended judgment. ABS may have until 3:00 p.m. on September 13, 2019, to file a reply as to both issues. No further briefing will be filed on these issues absent leave and extraordinary good cause shown. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/11/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 Court Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Trial Jury Question, #2 Exhibit 2-Trial Jury Question, #3 Exhibit 3-Trial Jury Question, #4 Exhibit 4-Trial Jury Question, #5 Exhibit 5-Trial Jury Question, #6 Exhibit 6-Trial Jury Question, #7 Exhibit 7-Trial Jury Question-Damages) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 Jury Verdict - Damages: Verdict returned in favor of Plaintiffs Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 Jury Verdict - Liability: Verdict returned in favor of Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 Damages Jury Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc) #1 Additional Damages Instructions) (voc).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 Deliberation Jury Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 Motion for Entry of Separate Judgment by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 9/11/2019 (jls).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 Liability Jury Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 Introductory Jury Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 Statement and Voir Dire Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 6th Day Jury Trial held on 9/10/2019. Damages verdict returned in favor of Inguran, LLC. [6:23] (Court Reporter JD/CS.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/10/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc/bw)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ST's Proposed Instructions Re: Book of Wisdom and Noninfringing Alternatives. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/10/2019. (lak)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Proposed Instruction Regarding Alternatives and the Book of Wisdom. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Horowitz, Steven)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Defendant ABS Global, Inc., and Genus plc's motion for curative instruction ('503 dkt. #1114 ; '446 dkt. #509 ) is DENIED for the reasons stated on the record. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/10/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 Proposed Jury Instructions - Damages. ST's Proposed Damages Instruction re: Number of Royalty-Bearing Units. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/10/2019. (lak)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties filed a number of motions for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(a). ('503 dkt. # #1103 , #1104 , #1106 , #1108 , #1110 ; '446 dkt. # #498 , #499 , 501 , #503 , #505 .) In allowing these challenged claims and defenses to proceed to the jury for their verdict, the court DENIED these motions. The parties, however, have preserved the arguments raised in their respective motions for purposes of bringing a renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law under Rule 50(b) or for a new trial under Rule 59. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/10/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 Motion for Curative Instruction by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Response due 9/17/2019. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc. (Mulder, Bryan)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 5th Day Jury Trial held on 9/9/2019. Liability verdict returned in favor of Inguran, LLC - Trial continues. [6:42] (Court Reporter CS/JD.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 ST's Responses to ABS's Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law re: (1108 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 503 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (1106 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 501 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (1103 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 498 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, (1104 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 499 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (1110 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 505 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/9/2019. (lak)
September 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 Corrected Brief in Support of ABS and Genus's Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law on the Cytonome Patents re: (503 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1108 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/9/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 4th Day Jury Trial held on 9/6/2019. Trial continues. [6:18] (Court Reporter LS/JD.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. ABS and Genus's Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on ST's Patent Infringement Claims. (Brief in Opposition due 9/27/2019. Brief in Reply due 10/7/2019.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 Brief in Support of (503 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) of ABS and Genus's Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law on the Cytonome Patents. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. ABS and Genus's Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law on the Cytonome Patents. (Brief in Opposition due 9/27/2019. Brief in Reply due 10/7/2019.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 Brief in Support of (501 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1106 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) ABS and Genus's Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims of the '987 Patent Are Not Enabled. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. ABS and Genus's Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law That the Asserted Claims of the '987 Patent Are Not Enabled. (Brief in Opposition due 9/27/2019., Brief in Reply due 10/7/2019.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 Brief in Support of (499 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1104 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) ABS and Genus's Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Breach of Contract. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. ABS and Genus's Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Breach of Contract. (Brief in Opposition due 9/27/2019. Brief in Reply due 10/7/2019.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. Plaintiffs' Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Sealed Document)(Brief in Opposition due 9/27/2019. Brief in Reply due 10/7/2019.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 Brief in Support of (505 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1110 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 Disregard. Refer to #1110 . Modified on 9/6/2019. (lak)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz re (493 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Proposed Jury Instructions, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Johnson 1989, #2 Exhibit B - Seidel 2002) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability. ABS's Brief and Proposed Instruction Regarding the "Full Scope" of the Inventions Claimed in the '987 Patent. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/9/2019. (lak)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 3rd Day Jury Trial held on 9/5/2019. Trial continues. [7:33] (Court Reporter JD/CS.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability ST's Proposed Jury Instruction and Claim Construction re Enriched Term of 987 Patent by Counter Defendants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 Memorandum in Support Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Their Requested Edits to the Court's September 4 Proposed Jury Instructions by Counter Defendants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Closing Liability Jury Instructions (ST's Redline), #2 Exhibit B - Liability Verdict (ST's Redline), #3 Exhibit C - Damages Instructions (ST's Redline), #4 Exhibit D - Damages Verdict (ST's Redline)) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC ABS's Brief in Support of Its Redlined Edits to the Court's Proposed Damages Instructions and Damages Verdict Form. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redlined Damages Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - Redlined Damages Verdict Form) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 2nd Day Jury Trial held on 9/4/2019. Trial continues. [7:39] (Court Reporter CS/LS.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 Expert Report of James Malackowski by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/5/2019: There's an exhibit attached to this. (lak)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 ORDER granting the reserved potions of #1050 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Nolan on Enablement-Related Issues Disclosed in Appleyard Deposition ('446 dkt. 445).Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability ST's Proposed Special Jury Instruction On The Proper Purity Method Under The 2012 Agreement by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 Brief in Reply by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC in Support re: Motion For Leave to Serve Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Nolan on Enablement-Related Issues Disclosed in Appleyard Deposition (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/4/2019. (lak)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Jury Selection and First Day of Trial held on 9/3/2019. Trial continues. [7:38] (Court Reporter JD/LS.) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (voc)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 Supplemental Expert Report of Carrie L. Distler (Rebuttal) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Distler CV, #2 Appendix B - Documents Reviewed Since Issuing Distler Rebuttal Report, #3 Appendix C - Updated Distler Rebuttal Schedules, Updated Only to Cite Corrected Bates Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 9/4/2019. (lak)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 Deposition Designations Order as to Ryan Christensen, Gary Durack, Kenneth Evans, Scott Holland and Juan Moreno. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/3/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ('446, dkt. 470; '503, dkt. 1075) is GRANTED without the need for a response. Attorney Kevin J. Palmersheim; Mark A. Ford and Elizabeth C. Mooney withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/3/19. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (jat)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER sustaining Inguran, LLC, Cytonome/ST, LLC, and XY, LLC's objection to ABS Global, Inc., Genus plc, and Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd.'s instruction on nonobviousness finding of the '987 patent; granting in part and denying in part #1050 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Nolan on Enablement-Related Issues Disclosed in Appleyard Deposition ('446 dkt. #445); Plaintiffs' reply in support of their motion to supplement Nolan's report is due by noon on 9/4/2019. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/3/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls) (Main Document 1085 replaced on 9/3/2019) (jls).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 Transcript of Continued Pretrial Telephonic Conference, held 8/29/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 Transcript of Continued Pretrial Telephonic Conference, held 8/30/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Trial Dates: 2nd Day Jury Trial set for 9/4/2019 at 08:30 AM; 3rd Day Jury Trial set for 9/5/2019 at 08:30 AM; 4th Day Jury Trial set for 9/6/2019 at 08:30 AM; 5th Day Jury Trial set for 9/9/2019 at 08:30 AM; 6th Day Jury Trial set for 9/10/2019 at 08:30 AM; and 7th Day Jury Trial set for 9/11/2019 at 08:30 AM. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
September 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** By noon on Wednesday, September 4, plaintiffs are directed to file a reply in support of their motion for leave to file a supplemental expert report of Dr. John Nolan, solely responding to defendants' argument that Nolan's proposed report extends beyond Appleyard's deposition testimony. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/2/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (bgw)
September 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 Exhibit List Inguran, LLC's and Cytonome/ST, LLC's First Amended Exhibit List by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/3/2019. (lak)
September 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC ST's Response to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Brief Regarding Objections to ST's Exhibit Nos. 157 and 382. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC ABS's Proffer Regarding Focusing. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Di Carlo Declaration) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC ABS's Brief Regarding Objections to ST's Exhibit Nos. 157 and 382. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC Stipulations of Fact. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 Expert Report of James E. Malackowski (Second Supplemental) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Calculation of Reasonable Royalty Damages, #2 Exhibit 2 - Comparison of Malackowski and Distler Royalty Bases, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summary of ABS' Sexcel Inventory, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summary of ABS's Third Party Processing Agreements, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summary of ABS's Sexcel Foreign Units, #6 Exhibit 6 - Comparison of ABS's Per Unit Chip Costs, #7 Exhibit 7 - Wall Street Journal GBP-USD Exchange Rate) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 9/3/2019. (lak)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Intervenor Defendant Cytonome/ST, LLC. Response due 9/6/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Palmersheim, Kevin)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 Deposition Designations Order as to Gary Durack and John Gilbert. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/30/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 ORDER on proposed closing liability instructions. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 08/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 closing liability instructions, #2 liability verdict) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (mfh)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 Objections to Trial Exhibits New Objection Based on the Court's Telephonic Hearing by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephonic (continued) Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/29/2019. [3:45] Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (mfh)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephonic (continued) Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/30/2019. [:45]Attention: In the event of a settlement of this matter over the weekend, counsel are advised to contact the Clerk of Court at (608) 287-4875 or the Chief Deputy Clerk at (608) 354-8004. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (mfh)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimant ABS Global, Inc., Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1050 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 445 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 ORDER granting #1016 Motion for Leave to File/Serve Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Giacomo Vacca ('446 dkt 411); granting #1054 Joint Motion for Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Reports ('446 dkt. 449). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/29/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference will continue 8/30/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge William M. Conley. Counsel for Inguran responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (lak)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC ABS's Color-Coded Deposition Designations. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bernard Bunner Designations, #2 Exhibit B - Ryan Christensen Designations, #3 Exhibit C - Gary Durack Designations, #4 Exhibit D - Kenneth Evans 30(b)(6) Designations, #5 Exhibit E - Kenneth Evans 8-19-2015 Personal Designations, #6 Exhibit F - Kenneth Evans 1-11-19 Personal Designations, #7 Exhibit G - John Gilbert Designations, #8 Exhibit H - Scott Holland 30(b)(6) Designations, #9 Exhibit I - Scott Holland Personal Designations, #10 Exhibit J - Juan Moreno 9-22-15 30(b)(6) Designations, #11 Exhibit K - Juan Moreno 9-23-15 30(b)(6) Designations, #12 Exhibit L - Juan Moreno 8-30-18 30(b)(6) Designations, #13 Exhibit M - Jonathan Sharpe Designations) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC ABS's Objections and Counter-Counter-Designations to ST's Objections and Counter-Designations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections and Counter-Counter-Designations) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC ABS's Amended Deposition Designations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Deposition Designations) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC Brief in Response to ST's Objections and Counter-Designations to ABS's Deposition Designations. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC Response to ST's Brief in Support of Its Proposed Modifications to the Closing Liability Instructions. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC Response to ST's Proffer Regarding Damages Expert Testimony. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 Objections to ST's Brief in Opposition to ABS's Proposed Redlines to the Court's Draft Jury Instructions by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 Objections to Trial Exhibits Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Amended Exhibit List by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections to Amd Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC ST's Color-Coded Deposition Designations of Gary Durack and John Gilbert. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Designations Gary Durack, #2 Exhibit B - Designations John Gilbert) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 Notice by Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC (Objections to ST's First Amended Exhibit List). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections to ST's First Amended Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 Deposition of Kirit Lezotte taken on October 25, 2018. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 Deposition of Kirit Lezotte taken on October 25, 2018. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 Deposition of Elon Roti Roti taken on June 20, 2018. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 Deposition of Olivier Hiers taken on September 21, 2018. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 Amended Exhibit List by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephonic Conference held on 8/23/2019 [1:45] Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (mfh) Modified on 8/28/2019. (lak)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 Joint Motion for Leave To Serve Supplemental Expert Reports by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Response due 9/3/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Horowitz, Steven)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 Deposition of Dino Di Carlo taken on 11-15-2018IPR2017-02162. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 Deposition of Dino Di Carlo taken on 11-15-2018IPR2017-02097. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 Deposition of Dino Di Carlo taken on 07-25-2018 IPR2017-02097. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1050 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Nolan on Enablement-Related Issues Disclosed in Appleyard Deposition ('446 dkt. 445). Defenants ABS's Response due 8/29/2019. (See '503 dkt. #1011 at par. 2) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Nolan on Enablement-Related Issues Disclosed in Appleyard Deposition (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Nolan) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/27/2019. (lak)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC ST'S Brief in Support of its Proposed Modifications to the Closing Liability Jury Instructions. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Closing Liability Jury Instructions Redline) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/27/2019. (lak)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC ST'S Proffer Regarding Damages Expert Testimony. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/27/2019. (lak)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC ABS Global, Inc. an dGenus PLC's Brief in Support of its Proposed Redlines to the Court's Draft Jury Instructions. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Closing Liability Jury Instructions Redline) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 Deposition of David C. Appleyard, Ph. D. taken on August 22, 2019. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (1044) Motion to Admit Paul Rogerson Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (lak)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 Motion to Admit Paul Rogerson Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 26JOA08U.) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Rogerson, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER setting pretrial submission deadlines; denying as moot #946 Motion in Limine to compel Dr. J. Paul Robinson's appearance ('446 dkt. 399); and setting Friday, August 30, 2019 at 3:00 pm as a possible date for a final telephonic conference. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 Transcript of Telephonic Conference, held 8/23/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. AssociatedCases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls) (Main Document 1042 replaced on 9/3/2019) (jls).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 Objections to Trial Exhibits Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Exhibit List by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections to Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC ST's Objections and Counter-Designations to ABS's Deposition Designations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections and CounterDesignations Chart) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re (392 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Deposition Designations "Objections and Counter-Designations to ST's Deposition Designations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections and Counter-Designations) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 Objections to Trial Exhibits "Objections To ST's Exhibit List" by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objections To ST's Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 OPINION AND ORDER: 1) The reserved portion of defendants and counter claimants ABS Global, Inc. Genus, PLC, and Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd.'s motion to strike ST's damages expert Malackowski's testimony ('503 dkt. #934 ; '446 dkt. #329) is GRANTED. 2) Defendants' Other MILs No. 5 ('503 dkt. #944 ; '446 dkt. #339) is DENIED. 3) The prior ruling on defendants' Other MILs No. 7 ('503 dkt. #944 ; '446 dkt. #339) is amended. That motion is now GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, consistent with the above opinion. 4) Defendants' Other MILs No. 9: Bar ST's expert Malackowski from presenting evidence relevant only to damages of the XY patents ('503 dkt. #944 ; '446 dkt. #339) is GRANTED. 5) The reserved portion of plaintiffs and counter defendants Inguran, LLC, Cytonome/ST, LLC and XY, LLC's Other MILs No. 11 ('503 dkt. #946 ; '446 dkt. #341) is GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. 6) Plaintiffs' motion to compel appearance of Robinson ('503 dkt. #1004 ; '446 dkt. #399) is DENIED IN PART AND RESERVED IN PART. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/23/19. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jat) Modified on 8/23/2019 (jat).
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC Joint Notice Regarding Objections to Exhibit Lists. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/23/2019 [1:40] Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (skv)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Response to ST's Proffer in Support of ST's Motion in Limine No. 11. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 Deposition Designations ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Response and Counter-Designation to Plaintiffs' Designation of Testimony of Dr. J. Paul Robinson by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robinson Report Counter-Designations) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (1016 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 411 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Opposition to ST's Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Giacomo Vacca (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court may have time during tomorrow's telephonic conference to address objections to exhibits (or at least to begin to address objections). To that end, the parties should strive to file ST's exhibit list with objections and provide the remaining contested exhibits (in electronic form) to the clerk's office by noon tomorrow. If that is not possible, the court will take up all objections next week and may schedule an additional telephonic hearing to make sure that this work is completed before the start of trial. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/22/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 Notice of Appearance filed by John W. McBride for Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC, Counter Claimant Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (McBride, John)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 Deposition Designations of Testimony of Dr. J. Paul Robinson and Response to ABS's Memorandum (Dkt. 414) by Counter Claimants Genus PLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Robinson Designations, #2 Exhibit B - Robinson Deposition Designations, #3 Exhibit C - Robinson Report Designations) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 Notice by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd, Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Proposed Stipulations of Fact Relating to Determinations in ABS I. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 Notice of Proposed Stipulated Fact Regarding The First Litigation by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability on the Relevance of Alternative Tests for Measuring Compliance with the Purity Requirement by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd, Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric) Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 Disregard. See #1030 . (Sealed Document) Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability by ST Regarding Relevance of Purity Tests, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/22/2019. (lak)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC of ST's Response to Defendants' Memorandum Regarding Testimony on Damages from Mr. Moreno. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC of ST's Response to ABS's Submission Regarding ABS's MIL No. 5. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 Objections to (410 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Proposed Jury Instructions. ABS Global and Genus PLC's Objections to ST's Proposed Jury Instruction re: Reasonable Royalty Evidence Arising After the Date of the Hypothetical Negotiation. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 8/21/2019. (lak)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (411 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. ABS Global and Genus PLC's Response to ST's Proffer in Support of its Technical Expert's Opinion on the Value of the Patents-in-Suit. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 8/21/2019. (lak)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC of ST's Proffer in Support of ST's Motion in Limine No. 11. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Final Pretrial Conference, #2 Exhibit 2 - Oct. 28, 2016 Opinion of Counsel for the '161 Patent (ABS_2017_00087936), #3 Exhibit 3 - Nov. 15, 2016 Opinion of Counsel for the '912 Patent (ABS_2017_00088694)) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 Response re: (406 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 406 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 406 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 406 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 406 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 406 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 1011 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1011 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1011 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1011 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1011 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 1011 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Compel. Memorandum Regarding Testimony from Dr. J. Paul Robinson at Trial by Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Counter Claimant Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court clarifies paragraph 16 of its August 16, 2019, order. The third sentence should read: "If not available, plaintiffs should provide the court with deposition designations, including any paragraphs of Robinson's report that they seek to present at trial, on or before Wednesday, August 21, 2019, to which defendants may respond on or before Friday, April 23, 2019." Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/19/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 Transcript of Final Pretrial Conference, held 8/15/2019 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. AssociatedCases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls) (Main Document 1017 replaced on 9/3/2019) (jls).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to ( #1016 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 411 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File/Serve Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Giacomo Vacca (Sealed Document). Response due 8/22/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 Motion for Leave to File/Serve Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Giacomo Vacca (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Giacomo Vacca) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/19/2019. (lak)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability and Damages Regarding Reasonable Royalty Evidence Arising After the Date of the Hypothetical Negotiation by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fed. Cir. Bar Assn. Model Patent Jury Instruction 6.6) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC of ST's Proffer in Support of Its Technical Expert's Opinion on the Value of the Patents-In-Suit. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ABS_00026616, #2 Exhibit B - ABS_00073542) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 Notice by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC. Submission Regarding ABS's Motion in Limine No. 5. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/19/2019. (lak)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 Notice by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC. Memorandum Regarding Testimony on Damages from Mr. Moreno. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/19/2019. (lak)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ORDERdenying as moot #928 Motion in Limine by ST to Exclude the Testimony of Matthew Ebersole ('446 dkt. 323); conditionally denying #933 Motion in Limine by ST to Exclude Enablement-Related Fact Testimony ('446 dkt. 328); denying #938 Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Dr. G. Charles Ostermeier ('446 dkt. 333); denying as moot #949 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Design Arounds and Non-Infringement ('446 dkt. 344); granting in part and denying in part #946 Motions in Limine ('446 dkt. 341); and reserving on #1004 Motion to Compel ST's Motion to Compel ABS to Secure the Attendance of Dr. J. Paul Robinson at Trial ('446 dkt. 399). Setting deadlines for pretrial submissions and a telephonic conference for Friday, 8/23/2019 at 1:00 pm. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/16/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 01:00 PM before Judge William M. Conley. Counsel for ST responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/15/2019. Discussion of motions in limine, witnesses, voir dire, introductory jury instructions, length of trial. Trial predicted to last six days. Fourteen jurors will be called forward, eight jurors will be empaneled. Continued final pretrial conference, by telephone, TBA. [3:12] (Court Reporter LS) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (arw)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (1004 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 399 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Compel, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #890 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report; granting #912 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; granting #925 Motion for Clarification; reserving on #928 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony; granting #929 Motion to Try Willfulness Separately; reserving on #933 Motion in Limine to Exclude Enablement-Related Fact Testimony; granting as unopposed in part, denying in part, and reserving in part #934 Motion in Limine in Exclude Inadmissible Opinions; granting in part, denying in in part, and reserving in part #938 Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony; granting in part and denying in part #939 Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Opinions; granting #940 Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony; denying #943 Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony; granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part #944 Motions in Limine; granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part #946 Motions in Limine; denying in part and reserving in part #949 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony in case 3:14-cv-00503-wmc; granting in part and denying in part (286) Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Report; granting (307) Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; granting (320) Motion for Clarification; reserving on (323) Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony; granting (324) Motion to Try Willfulness Separately; reserving on (328) Motion in Limine to Exclude Enablement-Related Fact Testimony; granting as unopposed in part, denying in part, and reserving in part (329) Motion in Limine in Exclude Inadmissible Opinions; granting in part, denying in in part, and reserving in part (333) Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony; granting in part and denying in part (334) Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Opinions; granting (335) Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony; denying (338) Motion in Limine to Exclude Opinion Testimony; granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part (339) Motions in Limine; granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part (341) Motions in Limine; denying in part and reserving in part (344) Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony in case 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/14/19. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jat) Modified on 8/14/2019 (jat).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 Notice by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC of Identification of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (Amended). Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 Corrected Exhibit List by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (O'Brien, Eric)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (399 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Compel, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Moffett to Horowitz dated August 5, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Horowitz to Moffett dated August 8, 2019) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 Motion to Compel ST's Motion to Compel ABS to Secure the Attendance of Dr. J. Paul Robinson at Trial (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 8/20/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/30/2019 (voc/bw). Modified on 8/30/2019 (voc/bw).
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 Disregard. See #1006 . Modified on 8/14/2019. (lak)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 Exhibit List by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 Deposition Designations by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Designations) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 Exhibit List by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit List) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 999 Disregard. See #1002 . Modified on 8/12/2019. (lak)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 998 Disregard. See #1001 . Modified on 8/12/2019. (lak)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 997 Deposition Designations by ST, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/12/2019. (lak)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 996 Objections to (922 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 317 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Proposed Jury Instructions by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PJC 115.4) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 995 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC in Support of ST's Responses to ABS's Motions in Limine re: (944 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 339 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - John Sharpe Deposition Exhibit - Drawing) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/2/2019. (lak)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 994 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (944 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 339 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motions in Limine filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 993 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (934 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 329 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 992 Objections to (316 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 921 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Proposed Special Verdict by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 991 Declaration of Eric T. O'Brien filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Responses re: (341 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 8-12), #2 Exhibit 2 - Microfluidic Chip Summary, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendants (No.13), #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt from Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentionsr, #5 Exhibit 5 - First Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 990 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (341 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 989 Declaration of Eric T. O'Brien filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Opposition re: (328 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Genus Board Presentation on GSS Technology) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 988 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (328 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC to Exclude Enablement-Related Fact Testimony. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 987 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC in support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's response re: (344 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Infringement Contentions (excerpt), #2 Exhibit 2 - Koh Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Allergan v. Sandoz Dkt. 319) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 986 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (939 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 334 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. ST's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of ST's Technical Expert Giacomo Vacca, Ph.D. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 985 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (344 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC to Exclude Testimony Regarding Design Arounds and Non-Infringement. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 984 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (338 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Defendants' Expert Dr. Dino Di Carlo Related to Obviousness. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 983 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (333 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Dr. G. Charles Ostermeier. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 982 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (335 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Defendants' Damages Expert Carrie Distler. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 981 Objections to (346 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Proposed Special Verdict by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 980 Objections to (347 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Proposed Jury Instructions, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 979 Response to (952 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 347 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Sealed) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 8/1/2019. (arw)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 978 Objection to Rule 26(a)(3) Designations by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 977 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (919 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 314 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Notice. ST's Objections to ABS's Proposed Expert Narratives. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 976 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Opposition re: (323 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosure, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Horowitz to Moffett, dated May 10, 2019, #3 Exhibit C - Letter from Horowitz to Moffett, dated June 12, 2019, #4 Exhibit D - Letter from Horowitz to Moffett, dated June 12, 2019) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 975 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (313 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 918 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Notice. ST's Objections to ABS's 282 Notice. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 974 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (323 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC to Exclude the Testimony of Matthew Ebersole. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 973 Objection to Rule 26(a)(3) Designations by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 972 Objection to Rule 26(a)(3) Designations by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 971 Objections to (322 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Proposed Voir Dire by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 970 Redaction to (931 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 326 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Declaration, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email dated January 11, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sealed Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence from Horowitz to Matheson, #4 Exhibit 4 - Sealed Exhibit) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/31/2019. (lak)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 969 Redaction to (928 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 323 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine by ST to Exclude the Testimony of Matthew Ebersole (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 968 Redaction to (964 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Brief in Opposition, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 967 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendants/counterclaim plaintiffs Inguran, LLC d/ b/a Sexing Technologies and XY, LLC's unopposed motion to release supersedeas bond ('503 dkt. #966 ; '446 dkt. 361) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/29/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 966 Unopposed Motion to Release Supersedeas Bond by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 965 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill re: #929 Motion to Try Willfulness Separately, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of Trial Transcript No. 16-cv-497. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/26/2019: Linked to the motion to which it relates. (lak)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 964 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (929 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 324 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Try Willfulness Separately filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/26/2019. (lak)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 963 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (925 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 320 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Clarification, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 962 Redaction to (947 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 342 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Declaration, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 10 - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 11 - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 961 Redaction to (944 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 339 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motions in Limine (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 960 Redaction to (936 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 331 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Brief in Support, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 959 Redaction to (934 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 329 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 958 Redaction to (327 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 932 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Declaration, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of DSM IP Assets v. Lallemand Specialties, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections and Responses to Discovery, #3 Exhibit 3 - Copy of June 7, 2018 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 957 Redaction to (325 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 930 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Brief in Support, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 956 Redaction to (320 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 925 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Motion for Clarification, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 955 Redaction to (336 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 941 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Brief in Support, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/24/2019. (lak)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 954 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In reviewing the parties' motions in limine filed yesterday, the court notes that a number of them touch on the admissibility of expert testimony. In light of this, it would be helpful for the court to have courtesy hard copies of any expert reports that are the subject of motions in limine. The court requests that the parties submit such copies on or before the due date for the responses to motions in limine. If any attachments to the reports are voluminous, the parties should use their discretion to determine whether those should be included. If excluded, the court can review those materials, as necessary, electronically. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/19/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 953 Brief in Support re: (347 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Proposed Jury Instructions, by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 952 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability and Damages by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - The Federal Circuit Bar Association Model Patent Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - Texas Pattern Jury Charge) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 951 Proposed Special Verdict - Liability and Damages by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 950 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: (344 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - July 9, 2018 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants Amended Response to Deposition 30(b)(6), #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants Response and Objections to ST's First Supplemental Notice of Deposition 30(b)(6)) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 949 Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Design Arounds and Non-Infringement (Sealed Document) by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 948 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: (341 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - May 14, 2019 Letter from Moffett to Horowitz, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 21, 2019 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 947 Declaration of Eric T. O'Brien filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (339 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6/7/18 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett, #2 Exhibit 2 - 8/30/10 Freedom to Operate Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10/28/10 Updated Freedom to Operate Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - 03/19/14 Freedom to Operate Opinion re: Cyntonome, #5 Exhibit 5 - 04/08/14 Supplemental Freedom to Operate Opinion, #6 Exhibit 6 - 10/28/09 Due Dilligence Investigation Report, #7 Exhibit 7 - 10/28/16 Invalidity and Non-Infringement Opinon, #8 Exhibit 8 - 10/28/16 Invalidity and Non-Infrongement Report re: Patent 476, #9 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Second Amended Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition, #11 Exhibit 11 - Current Design of GigaSort Chip) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 946 Motions in Limine (Sealed Document) by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 945 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: (338 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 6, 2019 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 23, 2019 Letter from Moffett to Horowitz, #3 Exhibit 3 - May 21, 2019 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett, #4 Exhibit 4 - June 5, 2019 Letter from Moffett to Horowitz) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 944 Motions in Limine (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 943 Motion in Limine to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Defendants' Expert Dr. Dino Di Carlo Related to Obviousness (Sealed Document) by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 942 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: (335 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PX-447) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 941 Brief in Support of (334 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine. Daubert Motion to Exclude Inadmissible Opinions of Technical Expert Giacomo Vacca, PH.D. by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 940 Motion in Limine. Daubert Motion to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Defendants' Damages Expert Carrie Distler (Sealed Document) by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 939 Motion in Limine. Daubert Motion to Exclude Inadmissible Opinions of Technical Expert Giacomo Vacca, PH.D. by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 938 Motion in Limine. Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony fo Dr. G. Charles Ostermeier (Sealed Document) by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 937 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (329 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Acantha v. Depuy Decision and Order) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 936 Brief in Support of (329 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine. Daubert Motion to Exclude Inadmissible Opinions of Damages Experts James E. Malackowski by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 935 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: (328 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ABS_00001784, #2 Exhibit 2 - ABS_00021406, #3 Exhibit 3 - ABS Invalidity Contentions, #4 Exhibit 4 - ABS Fourth Amended Rule 26 Initial Disclosures, #5 Exhibit 5 - June 12, 2019 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett, #6 Exhibit 6 - ABS's Second Amended Rule 26 Initial Disclosures, #7 Exhibit 7 - ABS's Amended Response to Notice of Deposition 30(b)(6), #8 Exhibit 8 - June 18, 2019 Letter from Moffett to Horowitz, #9 Exhibit 9 - June 25, 2019 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett, #10 Exhibit 10 - June 26, 2019 Letter from Moffett to Horowitz, #11 Exhibit 11 - July 12, 2019 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 934 Motion in Limine. Daubert Motion to Exclude Inadmissible Opinions of Damages Experts James E. Malackowski (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) ).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 933 Motion in Limine by ST to Exclude Enablement-Related Fact Testimony (Sealed Document) by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019.(lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 932 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: (324 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Try Willfulness Separately, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of DSM IP Assets v. Lallemand Specialties, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Copy of June 7, 2018 Letter from Horowitz to Moffett) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 931 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: (323 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion in Limine, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email dated January 11, 2019, #2 Exhibit 2 - ABS's Second Amended Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 3 - Correspondence from Horowitz to Matheson, #4 Exhibit 4 - ABS_2017_0062273) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 930 Brief in Support of (324 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion to Try Willfulness Separately by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2019.(lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 929 Motion to Try Willfulness Separately by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Response due 7/25/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 928 Motion in Limine by ST to Exclude the Testimony of Matthew Ebersole (Sealed Document) by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 927 Proposed Voir Dire by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 926 Witness List (ST's) by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 925 Motion for Clarification re: (280 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 280 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion to Clarify the Court's Claim Construction Order, (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Response due 7/25/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 924 Notice by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC of Expert Narratives. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 923 Proposed Voir Dire by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 922 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability and Damages by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 921 Proposed Special Verdict - Liability and Damages by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 920 Witness List by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2019. (lak)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 919 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC of Expert Narratives. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 918 Notice by Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Identification of Prior Art Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of the parties' joint motion to modify the scheduling order, moving up the deadline by which the parties must file exhibit lists and deposition designations. (Dkt. #916 ; 311 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) The parties explain that this request is made to provide more time to prepare responses. While the court is sympathetic to that request, the court recently changed the pretrial process -- based on feedback from the patent bar -- to allow parties the benefit of the court's rulings on motions in limine before filing these disclosures. By moving up this disclosure date, the parties will not have the benefit of the court's rulings. Nonetheless, the joint motion is GRANTED, though the parties should meet and confer and withdraw exhibits and deposition designations mooted by the court's rulings before filing their respective responses. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/17/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 916 Joint Motion to Modify The Scheduling Order by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC, Counter Claimant Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Horowitz, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 915 Redaction to (309 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Brief in Opposition, by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 914 Brief in Opposition by Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd re: (307 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, filed by Inguran, LLC. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 913 Redaction to (307 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File a Sur Reply (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimant Inguran, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Sur-Reply to Defendants Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Di Carlo Report) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/2/2019. (lak)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 912 Motion for Leave to File a Sur Reply (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply to Defendants Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Di Carlo Report) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/2/2019. (lak)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 911 Redaction to (304 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Brief in Reply, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 910 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Michael J. Modl re: Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd, Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Premium Genetics (UK) Ltd. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as to Lindsay Eastman. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 909 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC in Support of (890 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 286 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File/Serve Supplemental Expert Report of Dino Di Carlo, Ph.D.. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 908 JUDGMENT from USCA remanding to District Court as to #874 Notice of Appeal, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. No record to be returned. (Attachments: #1 Nonprecedential Disposition, #2 Mandate) (jls)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 907 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (906) Motion to Admit Thomas Watson Landers, IV Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/25/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (lak)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 906 Motion to Admit Thomas Watson Landers, IV Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2489976.) by Defendant Inguran, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Landers, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 905 Redaction to (896 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 292 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Brief in Opposition, by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (900) Motion to Admit Thomas D. Rein Pro Hac Vice in case 3:14-cv-00503-wmc; granting (296) Motion to Admit Thomas D. Rein Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/21/19. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jat)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (899) Motion to Admit Stephanie P. Koh Pro Hac Vice in case 3:14-cv-00503-wmc; granting (295) Motion to Admit Stephanie P. Koh Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/21/19. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jat)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (898) Motion to Admit Erin O'Brien Pro Hac Vice in case 3:14-cv-00503-wmc; granting (294) Motion to Admit Erin O'Brien Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/21/19. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jat)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 901 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting (897) Motion to Admit Bryan C. Mulder Pro Hac Vice in case 3:14-cv-00503-wmc; granting (293) Motion to Admit Bryan C. Mulder Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 6/21/19. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jat)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 900 Motion to Admit Thomas D. Rein Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2488848.) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Rein, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 899 Motion to Admit Stephanie P. Koh Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2488838.) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Koh, Stephanie)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 898 Motion to Admit Eric Taylor O'Brien Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2488831.) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Brien, Eric)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 897 Motion to Admit Bryan Clifford Mulder Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2488818.) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Mulder, Bryan)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 896 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC re: (890 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 286 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Supplemental Expert Report of Dino Di Carlo, Ph. D. (Sealed Document) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (O'Neill, Kirt)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 19-2042 for (290 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 894 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc) Notice of Appeal filed by Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (jat)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 895 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Information Sheet, Opinion and Order, Judgment and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re: #290 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Information Sheet, #2 Opinion and Order, #3 Partial Judgment, #4 Docket Sheet) (lak)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 894 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Plaintiffs Cytonome/ST, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC as to (284 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Judgment, (270 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Supplement. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2484728 paid. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Moffett, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 893 Redaction to (287 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Declaration by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael) Modified on 6/6/2019 (jat).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 892 Redaction to (286 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File /Serve Supplemental Expert Report of Dino Di Carlo, Ph.D. (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (Modl, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Briefing Deadlines as to (890 in 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 286 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File/Serve Supplemental Expert Report of Dino Di Carlo, Ph.D. (Sealed Document). Brief in Opposition due 6/19/2019. Brief in Reply due 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 891 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: (286 in 3:17-cv-00446-wmc) Motion for Leave to File, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of 5/24/19 Supplemental Expert Report of Dino Di Carlo, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories) Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 6/5/2019. (lak)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 890 Motion for Leave to File/Serve Supplemental Expert Report of Dino Di Carlo, Ph.D. (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. (Modl, Michael)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 889 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference, held 5/13/19 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court's new policy regarding electronic transcripts of court proceedings: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions. AssociatedCases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jat)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 888 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #272 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 3:17-cv-00446-wmc. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/14/2019. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (jls)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 887 Scheduling Order. Motions in Limine due 7/18/2019. Response to Motion due 8/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 02:00 PM. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 02:00 PM; Inguran responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/3/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/14/2019. Associated Cases: 3:14-cv-00503-wmc, 3:17-cv-00446-wmc (jls)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/13/2019 [:30] Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00446-wmc, 3:14-cv-00503-wmc (mfh)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel: The District Court has consolidated cases 14-cv-503-wmc and 17-cv-446-wmc. All future docketing will take place in the lower numbered case, 14-cv-503-wmc. CM/ECF will automatically spread docket entries to the higher numbered case, 17-cv-446-wmc. (arw/bgw)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines and Hearings: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge William M. Conley. Counsel for Inguran, LLC responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. (arw/bgw)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 886 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Joint Request Pursuant to Seventh Circuit Rule 36. (Moffett, Daniel)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Returned. (jls)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 885 JUDGMENT from USCA affirming in part, reversing and remanding in part as to #793 Notice of Appeal, filed by ABS Global, Inc., and Genus PLC. Record returned. (Attachments: #1 Appellate Opinion, #2 Petition for Rehearing Denial, #3 Mandate) (jls)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 884 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that:1) The $4,865,324.13 Capitol Indemnity Corporation appeal bond (dkt. #879-1) is APPROVED.2) Enforcement of the $4,865,324.13 attorneys' fee award against ST and the $21,759.27 cost award against ABS are STAYED pending final resolution of the appeal in this case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/2/2019. (voc)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 883 Brief in Reply by Defendant Inguran, LLC in Support of #879 Motion for Supersedeas Bond. (Moffett, Daniel)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 882 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. re: #879 Motion for Supersedeas Bond, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter dated October 29, 2018) (lak)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 881 Disregard. Modified on 11/29/2018. (lak)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 880 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. re: #879 Motion for Supersedeas Bond filed by Inguran, LLC. (Horowitz, Steven)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 879 Motion for Supersedeas Bond and Stay Enforcement of Attorenys' Fee Award by Defendant Inguran, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supersedeas Bond) (Moffett, Daniel)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #879 Motion for Supersedeas Bond and Stay Enforcement of Attorenys' Fee Award. Brief in Reply due 12/6/2018. No Surreply. (jls)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 878 Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet re #874 Notice of Appeal. (jat)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 877 Transcript Request Form by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #874 Notice of Appeal. (O'Neill, Kirt)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 876 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: #874 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Docket Sheet) (lak)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 875 Appeal Information Packet. (lak)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 18-3317 for #874 Notice of Appeal filed by Inguran, LLC, and XY, LLC. (jls)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 874 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC as to #873 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order Taxing Costs, Order on Motion for Leave to File. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2346304 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 873 ORDER denying #807 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part #810 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part #814 Bill of Costs; granting #817 Bill of Costs; granting #847 Motion for Leave to File a reply brief. Attorneys' fees are awarded in favor of plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. and against defendants in the amount of $4,865,324.13, plus post-judgment interest of 1.02% compounded annually, between April 21, 2017, and the date of the payment. Costs are awarded in favor of defendant ST and against plaintiffs in the amount of $21,759.27. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/27/2018. (jls)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The unopposed motion to postpone any request for costs and associated briefing (dkt. #871 ) is GRANTED. The deadline to submit requests for costs and associated briefing will be 30 days after the resolution of ABS's appeal of this court's April 24, 2017 amended partial final judgment (dkt. #790 ) by the Seventh Circuit. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/22/2018. (voc)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 871 Unopposed Motion to Postpone any Request for Costs and Associated Briefing by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 870 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT. (WMC /PAO)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 869 FINAL JUDGMENT. (WMC /PAO)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #867 Motion to Lift Stay of Proceedings Relating to U.S. Patent Nos. '920 and '425 and for Entry of Judgment in favor of ABS and Genus. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/7/2018. (jls)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 867 Unopposed Motion to Lift Stay of Proceedings Relating to U.S. Patent Nos. '920 and '425 and for Entry of Judgment in favor of ABS and Genus by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judgment on '920 patent, #2 Exhibit B - Judgment on '425 patent, #3 Exhibit C - Opinion in XY, LLC v. Trans Ova Genetics) (Modl, Michael)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 866 Second Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re: #793 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Certification) (lak)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 865 First Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re: #793 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Certification) (lak)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 864 **TEXT ONLY ORDER** Judge Conley recently modified his attachments to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, which you may access via this hyperlink: # Attachments to Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order. Please note that occasionally Judge Conley makes changes to these attachments. As such, unless you do not have access to the attachments electronically (e.g., you are a pro se litigant), you should review the most recent version of the appropriate attachment to assure compliance when preparing summary judgment or other pre-trial submissions. (lak)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ORDER from USCA Regarding Sealed Documents. (lak)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 862 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Michael J. Modl re: Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Withdrawal of Russell E. Cass. (Modl, Michael)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 861 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re: #793 Amended Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Certification) (lak)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 860 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Michael J. Modl re: Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as to Pro Hac Vice Counsel William H. Baumgartner, Jr. (Modl, Michael)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 859 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Regarding the Status of Antitrust Claim on Appeal. (Modl, Michael)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ORDER from USCA dismissing cross-appeal as to #836 Notice of Appeal, filed by Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. No record to be returned. (Attachments: #1 Mandate) (jls)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 857 Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet re #836 CROSS NOTICE OF APPEAL. (jls)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 856 Redaction to #855 Brief in Opposition, by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Moffett, Daniel)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 855 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #847 Motion for Leave to File, filed by ABS Global, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Moffett, Daniel) Modified on 6/6/2017. (lak)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 854 Transcript Request Form by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #836 Notice of Appeal. (O'Neill, Kirt)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 853 Redaction to #850 Declaration, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 5/22/17 Letter from Kevin Fee to C. Fairley Spillman, #2 Exhibit B - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - 5/26/17 Letter from Kevin Fee to Daniel Moffett, #4 Exhibit D - 5/26/17 Letter from Daniel Moffett to Kevin M. Fee) (Modl, Michael)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 852 Redaction to #849 Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 851 Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #817 Bill of Costs filed by ABS Global, Inc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/31/2017. (lak)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 850 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC in Support of ABS Global, Inc.'s and Genus PLC's Reply Brief in Support of Their Objection re: #814 Bill of Costs, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 5/22/17 Letter from Kevin Fee to C. Fairley Spillman, #2 Exhibit B - 5/24/17 Letter from C. Fairley Spillman to Kevin M. Fee, #3 Exhibit C - 5/26/17 Letter from Kevin Fee to Daniel Moffett, #4 Exhibit D - 5/26/17 Letter from Daniel Moffett to Kevin M. Fee) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 5/31/2017. (lak)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 849 Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #814 Bill of Costs filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 848 Redaction to #847 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion for Attorney's Fees (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply in Support of Attorney's Fees) (Clarkowski, Andrew) Modified on 5/30/2017. (lak)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 847 Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion for Attorney's Fees (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Reply in Support of Attorney's Fees) (Clarkowski, Andrew) Modified on 5/29/2017. (lak)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 846 Brief in Support of Bill of Costs by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #814 Bill of Costs filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/26/2017: Also see Brief in Support filed 5/5/2017 at #816 . (lak)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 845 Brief in Support of #817 Bill of Costs, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. (Clarkowski, Andrew) Modified on 5/26/2017. (lak)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 844 Redaction to #842 Declaration, by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sealed, #2 Exhibit B - Sealed, #3 Exhibit C - Sealed, #4 Exhibit D-1 - Sealed, #5 Exhibit D-2 - Sealed, #6 Exhibit D-3 - Sealed, #7 Exhibit D-4 - Sealed) (Moffett, Daniel) Modified on 5/23/2017. (lak)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 843 Redaction to #841 Brief in Opposition, by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Moffett, Daniel)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 842 Declaration of C. Fairley Spillman filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #810 Motion for Attorney Fees, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices, #2 Exhibit B - Invoices, #3 Exhibit C - Invoices, #4 Exhibit D1 - Invoices, #5 Exhibit D2 - Invoices, #6 Exhibit D3 - Invoices, #7 Exhibit D4 - Invoices) (Moffett, Daniel)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 841 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #810 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (Moffett, Daniel) Modified on 5/21/2017. (lak)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 840 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #807 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Clarkowski, Andrew)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 839 Transmission of Notice of Cross-Appeal, Order, Amended Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: #836 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Order No.: 803, #2 Amended Judgment, #3 Docket Sheet) (lak)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 838 Appeal Information Packet. (lak)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 837 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Andrew J. Clarkowski re: Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Withdrawal of Appearance as to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Matthew S. Jorgenson, Esq. (Clarkowski, Andrew)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 836 CROSS NOTICE OF APPEAL by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC as to #790 Judgment, #803 Order. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2029801 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/19/2017. (lak)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 17-2055 for #836 Notice of Appeal, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (voc)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 835 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Regarding Perfection of Appeal. (Horowitz, Steven)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 834 Objection to Bill of Costs by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #817 Bill of Costs filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/16/2017: Linked to the correct Bill of Costs. (lak)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 833 Objection to Bill of Costs by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #814 Bill of Costs filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC (Clarkowski, Andrew)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 832 Partial Satisfaction of Judgment by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: 830 Order on Motion for Supersedeas Bond. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/11/2017. (lak)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #828 Joint Motion for Entry of Deposition Transcripts Excerpts Played at Trial as Trial Exhibits. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/9/2017. (jls)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The court is in receipt of ABS Global Inc. and Genus plc's motion for supersedeas bond and to stay enforcement of judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(d). (Dkt. #804 .) Having obtained a supersedeas bond in the full amount of the money judgment owed under 13 of the amended partial final judgment and filed a copy of the bond with the court (dkt. #806 -2), their motion is GRANTED, subject to perfecting their notice of appeal in the appropriate appellate court within seven (7) days. Having also filed proof of payment of the remainder of the money judgment owed under 10, 17 and 18 of the amended partial final judgment (dkt. #806 -1), ABS and Genus also seek an order acknowledging satisfaction of those obligations. Since Inguran and XY have not yet filed a notice of satisfaction, they may have until May 15, 2017, to file a notice of satisfaction or otherwise respond. Failure to do either will result in the court entering an order acknowledging satisfaction per ABS and Genus's request. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/9/2017. (jls)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ORDER from USCA dismissing appeal as to #787 Notice of Appeal filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. No record to be returned. (Attachments: #1 Mandate) (jls)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 828 Joint Motion for Entry of Deposition Transcripts Excerpts Played at Trial as Trial Exhibits by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Response due 5/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1704 - Ian Biggs, #2 Exhibit 1705 - Gary Durack, #3 Exhibit 1706 - Andre Barnabe, #4 Exhibit 1707 - Ryan Christensen, #5 Exhibit 1708 - Kenneth Mike Evans (personal), #6 Exhibit 1709 - Kenneth Mike Evans (30(b)(6)), #7 Exhibit 1710 - David Thorbahn, #8 Exhibit 1711 - John Pasquesi, #9 Exhibit 1712 - Ben Verwer) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/9/2017. (lak)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 827 Redaction to #813 Declaration of Michael J. Modl by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Filed Under Seal) (Modl, Michael)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 826 Redaction to #812 Declaration of Kevin Fee by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B-1 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit B-2 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit D - Filed Under Seal) (Modl, Michael)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 825 Redaction to #811 Brief in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees Relating to its Successful Antitrust Claim by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 824 Redaction to #810 Motion for Attorney Fees Relating to its Successful Antitrust Claim (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 823 Redaction to #819 Declaration of Kevin M. Fee In Support Of Bill Of Costs by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 1 - Transcripts, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Transcript Invoices, #3 Exhibit B - Calculations, #4 Exhibit C - 40020 and 40050 Duplication Costs, #5 Exhibit D - 40020 and 40050 Litigation Support Costs, #6 Exhibit E - Thorbahn Subpoena Invoice, #7 Exhibit F - Combined Expenses Summaries) (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 5/8/2017. (lak)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 822 Letter/Designation of Record on Appeal by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #787 Notice of Appeal, #793 Notice of Appeal. DVD and physical exhibits maintained in Clerk's Office exhibit room. (lak)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 821 Court Reporter Certification of Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet re #793 Notice of Appeal. (jls)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 820 Redaction to #806 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz in Support of ABS's Motion for Approval of Supersedeas Bond by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Appeal Bond, #3 Exhibit C - 4/28/17 Letter from Atty Baumgartner to Atty O'Neill, #4 Exhibit D - 5/2/17 Letter from Atty O'Neill to Atty Baumgartner, #5 Exhibit E - 5/2/17 Letter from Atty Baumgartner to Atty O'Neill, #6 Exhibit F - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit G - 5/3/17 Letter frrom Atty Baumgartner to Atty O'Neill, #8 Exhibit H - 5/3/17 Letter from Atty O'Neill to Atty Baumgartner, #9 Exhibit I - 5/3/17 Letter from Atty Baumgartner to Atty O'Neill, #10 Exhibit J - 5/3/17 Letter from Atty O'Neill to Atty Baumgartner) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 5/9/2017. (lak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 819 Declaration of Kevin M. Fee re: #817 Bill of Costs filed by ABS Global, Inc. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Transcripts, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Transcript Invoices, #3 Exhibit B - Calculations, #4 Exhibit C - 40020 and 40050 Duplication Costs, #5 Exhibit D - 40020 and 40050 Litigation Support Costs, #6 Exhibit E - Thorbahn Subpoena Invoice, #7 Exhibit F - Combined Expenses Summaries) (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 5/8/2017: Three events were selected to file this Declaration. (lak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 818 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #814 Bill of Costs, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices, #2 Exhibit B - Invoices for Charges in Connection with Service and Subpoenas, #3 Exhibit C - Invoices for Transcripts and Videos, #4 Exhibit D - 1 - Costs Incurred by Todd Schoettelkotte, #5 Exhibit D-2 - Costs Incurred by Scott Holland, #6 Exhibit D-3 - Costs Incurred by Richard Neis, #7 Exhibit D-4 - Costs Incurred by Juan Moreno, #8 Exhibit D-5 - Costs Incurred by Maurice Rosenstein, #9 Exhibit D-6 - Costs Incurred by Cynthia Ludwig, #10 Exhibit D-7 - Costs Incurred by John Nolan, #11 Exhibit D-8 - Costs Incurred by Barry Harris, #12 Exhibit D-9 - Hotel Contract, #13 Exhibit E - Expense Reports of Copies Made In-house, #14 Exhibit F - Invoices from Outside Vendors for Copies, #15 Exhibit G-1 - Expense Report, #16 Exhibit G-2 - Expense Report, #17 Exhibit H-1 - Invoices from Outside Vendor for Review and Processing of Electronically Submitted Documents, #18 Exhibit H-2 - Invoices from Outside Vendor for Electronically Stored Documents, #19 Exhibit I - Invoice from Outside Vendor for Rental of Two Photocopiers During Trial) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/8/2017: Corrected typos, etc. (lak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 817 Bill of Costs by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Motions referred to Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court. Objection to Bill of Costs due 5/15/2017. Brief in Support to Bill of Costs due 5/25/2017. Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs due 5/30/2017. (Horowitz, Steven)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 816 Brief in Support of Bill of Costs by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #814 Bill of Costs filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/8/2017. (lak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 815 Motion for Bill of Costs by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Motions referred to Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court. Objection to Bill of Costs due 5/15/2017. Brief in Support to Bill of Costs due 5/25/2017. Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs due 5/30/2017. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/8/2017: Terminated motion and briefing schedule. See #814 for Bill of Costs (motion) and briefing schedule. (lak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 814 Bill of Costs by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Motions referred to Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court. Objection to Bill of Costs due 5/15/2017. Brief in Support to Bill of Costs due 5/25/2017. Brief in Reply in Opposition to Bill of Costs due 5/30/2017. (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 813 Declaration of Michael J. Modl filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #810 Motion for Attorney Fees, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Axley Invoices Calculations, #2 Exhibit A-2 - Axley Redacted Invoices) (Modl, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 812 Declaration of Kevin M. Fee filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #810 Motion for Attorney Fees, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Fees and Costs re: ABS Invoices, #2 Exhibit A-2, Part 1 - Invoices 2014-2017, #3 Exhibit A-2, Part 2 - Invoices 2014-2017, #4 Exhibit B-1 - LegalPeople Calculations, #5 Exhibit B-2 - Vendor Invoices, #6 Exhibit C - Engagement Letter, #7 Exhibit D - Sidley Success Bonus Invoice) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 5/8/2017. (lak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 811 Brief in Support of #810 Motion for Attorney Fees Relating to its Successful Antitrust Claim by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 810 Motion for Attorney Fees Relating to its Successful Antitrust Claim (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 809 Declaration of George A. L. Rosbrook filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #807 Motion for Attorney Fees. (O'Neill, Kirt)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 808 Brief in Support of #807 Motion for Attorney Fees by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Black's Law Dictionary, #2 Exhibit B - Uniform Trade Secrets Act, #3 Exhibit C - Court's Initial Damages Verdict Form) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/8/2017. (lak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 807 Motion for Attorney Fees by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 5/8/2017. (lak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 806 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #804 Motion for Supersedeas Bond, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Document Confirming Wire Transfer, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of Appeal Bond, #3 Exhibit C - 4/28/17 Letter from Atty Baumgartner to Atty O'Neill, #4 Exhibit D - 5/2/17 Letter from Atty O'Neill to Atty Baumgartner, #5 Exhibit E - 5/2/17 Letter from Atty Baumgartner to Atty O'Neill, #6 Exhibit F - 5/2/17 Letter from Atty O'Neill to Atty Baumgartner, #7 Exhibit G - 5/3/17 Letter from Atty Baumgartner to Atty O'Neill, #8 Exhibit H - 5/3/17 Letter from Atty O'Neill to Atty Baumgartner, #9 Exhibit I - 5/3/17 Letter from Atty Baumgartner to Atty O'Neill, #10 Exhibit J - 5/4/17 Letter from Atty O'Neill to Atty Baumgartner) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 5/8/2017: Corrected typo, etc. (lak)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 805 Brief in Support of #804 Motion for Supersedeas Bond Approval by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC (Modl, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 804 Motion for Supersedeas Bond Approval by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER denying #797 Motion to Correct the Wording of the Issued Injunction, or in the Alternative, for an Indicative Rule Under Rule 62.1. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/5/2017. (voc)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 802 Transcript Request Form by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. (Horowitz, Steven)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 801 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant ABS Global, Inc., re: #797 Motion to Correct the Wording of the Issued Injunction, or in the Alternative, for an Indicative Rule Under Rule 62.1, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 5/5/2017. (lak)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 800 Deposition of Ryan Christensen (30(b)(6)) taken on August 27, 2015. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 799 Deposition of Kenneth Michael Evans (30(b)(6)) taken on August 19, 2015. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 798 Deposition of John M. Pasquesi taken on November 18, 2015. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 797 Motion to Correct the Wording of the Issued Injunction, or in the Alternative, for an Indicative Rule Under Rule 62.1, by Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Response due 5/5/2017. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 4/28/2017. (lak)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** With respect to its order granting Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's motion to bifurcate briefing on attorney fees and expenses (dkt. #792), the court clarifies that the parties claiming entitlement to fees and costs must only file their brief regarding whether they are entitled to fees and costs on or before May 5, 2017, and only responses to any briefs are due on or before May 19, 2017. In light of the parties' request, the court agrees that the parties are not required to provide supporting documentation regarding fees and expenses until the court has ruled on impending motions claiming entitlement to attorney fees and expenses, at which time it will set additional deadlines, if necessary. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/27/2017. (jls)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 795 Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal, Orders, Judgment, Amended Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: #793 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Order No.: 572, #2 Order No.: 587, #3 Order No.: 772, #4 Judgment, #5 Amended Judgment, #6 Docket Sheet) (lak)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 794 Appeal Information Packet. (lak)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 793 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC as to #786 Judgment. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2012395 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 4/26/2017: See #789 for transmission of short record. The amended judgment has already been provided to the Court of Appeals. A filing fee was not paid for this Notice of Appeal. The receipt number from the first appeal was entered for this filing. (lak)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's unopposed motion to bifurcate briefing on attorney fees and expenses (dkt. #791 ) is GRANTED. Inguran and XY may have until May 5, 2017, to file a brief regarding whether they are entitled to fees and costs, and if so, to provide supporting documentation including their retainer agreement, invoices paid, invoices outstanding and internal billing invoices of the firm with any response from ABS and Genus due on or before May 19, 2017, including, if disputed, the same documentation with respect to their firm's retainer agreement, invoices and internal billing invoices. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/26/2017. (jls)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Briefing set re: Inguran and XY motion for fees and costs. Brief in Support due 5/5/2017. Brief in Opposition due 5/19/2017. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/26/2017. (jls)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 17-1873 for #793 Notice of Appeal filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (jls)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 791 Unopposed Motion to Bifurcate Briefing on Attorney Fees and Expenses by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Response due 5/2/2017. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 4/25/2017. (lak)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 790 AMENDED PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT. (WMC /PAO)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 789 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Orders, Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: #787 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Order No.: 572, #2 Order No.: 587, #3 Order No.: 772, #4 Judgment, #5 Docket Sheet) (lak) Modified on 4/24/2017: Amended judgment #790 provided to the Court of Appeals for their case opening. (lak)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 788 Appeal Information Packet. (lak)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 17-1847 for #787 Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (jls)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 787 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC as to #786 Judgment. Filing fee of $ 505, receipt number 0758-2012395 paid. No Docketing Statement filed. (Horowitz, Steven)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 786 PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT. (WMC /PAO)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER denying #774 Motion for Prejudgment Interest on Trade Secret Misappropriation Damages. Under Wisconsin law, XY will be awarded post-verdict interest in the amount of $24,595.20 on its trade secret misappropriation claim. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/21/2017. (jls)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 784 Redaction #726 Transcript, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC . (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 4/19/2017: Linked to the sealed version. (lak)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 783 Redaction to #723 Transcript by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 4/19/2017: Linked to the sealed version. (lak)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 782 Redaction #715 Transcript by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 4/19/2017: Linked to the sealed version. (lak)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 781 Redaction #714 Transcript by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 4/19/2017: Linked to the sealed version. (lak)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 780 Redaction to Trial Exhibit 97 by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 4/19/2017. (lak)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 779 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: #774 Motion for Prejudgment Interest on Trade Secret Misappropriation Damages filed by Inguran, LLC. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 4/14/2017. (lak)
April 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 778 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Joint Proposed Final Partial Judgment, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment in a Civil Case) (lak)
April 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 777 Declaration of Todd Schoettelkotte filed by Defendant Inguran, LLC re: #774 Motion for Prejudgment Interest on Trade Secret Misappropriation, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Calculation of Prejudgment Interest - Trade Secret Misappropriation, #2 Exhibit B - Calculation of Prejudgment Interest - Patent Infringement) (lak)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 776 Disregard. See #778 with Proposed Judgment in a Civil Case attached separately and described. Modified on 4/9/2017. (lak)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 775 Disregard. See #777 for Declaration with exhibits attached separately and described. Modified on 4/9/2017. (lak)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 774 Motion for Prejudgment Interest on Trade Secret Misappropriation Damages by Defendant Inguran, LLC. Response due 4/14/2017. (O'Neill, Kirt)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #764 Motion for Reconsideration re: 763 Order on Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part #744 Motion to Seal Portions of the Trial Court Record; maintaining transcripts #714 , #715 , #717 , #718 , #719 , #723 , and #726 under seal; unsealing ST's redacted versions of transcripts at dkt. #750 -7, #750 -9, and #750 -10; and setting April 19, 2017 as the deadline for ST to file redacted versions of exhibit 97 and the trial transcripts at dkts. #714 , #715 , #723 and #726 . Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/5/2017. (jls)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER denying as moot #660 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot #662 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot #663 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot #664 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot #668 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot #670 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot #686 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part and denying in part #738 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting in part and denying in part #741 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting #736 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b); granting #746 Motion for Leave to File Surreply; granting #758 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority; granting #766 Request for Ruling on Motion for Permanent Injunction; granting in part and denying in part #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction. A permanent injunction is entered pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65. The court awards ST nominal damages in the amount of $1.00. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/31/2017. (arw)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 771 Redaction to #770 Brief in Opposition, by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 770 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #766 Request for Ruling on its Motion for Permanent Injunction, filed by ABS Global, Inc. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 769 Redaction to #767 Declaration, filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 1/14/2017. (lak)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 768 Redaction to #766 Request for a Ruling on Motion for Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 1/14/2017. (lak)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 767 Declaration of Arvind Gautam filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. re: #766 Request for Ruling on its Motion for Permanent Injunction, #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 1/14/2017. (lak)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 766 Request for Ruling on its Motion for Permanent Injunction re: #680 MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. Response due 1/20/2017. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 1/14/2017. (lak)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 765 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #764 Motion for Reconsideration filed by ABS Global, Inc. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 11/13/2016. (lak)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 764 Motion for Reconsideration re: 763 Order on Motion to Seal by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant ABS Global, Inc. Response due 11/10/2016. (Modl, Michael)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #762 Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits Containing Sensitive Business Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/3/2016. (jls)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 762 Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits Containing Sensitive Business Information by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 11/2/2016. (lak)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER granting #760 Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits Containing Technical Trade Secret Information. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/27/2016. (jls)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 760 Joint Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits Containing Technical Trade Secret Information by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 10/26/2016. (lak)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 759 Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: #758 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Modl, Michael)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 758 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority re: #738 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW and Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Apple v. Samsung) (Zylstra, Sarah) Modified on 10/12/2016. (lak)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 757 Redaction to #756 Brief in Reply, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 756 Brief in Reply by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC in Support of #741 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 755 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC in Support re: #738 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Inguran's Fourth Supplemental Initial Disclosures) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 10/4/2016. (lak)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 754 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC in Support of #738 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (Modl, Michael)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 753 Declaration of James L. Duncan III filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #738 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Response of ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC to Inguran's Third Set of Interrogatories) (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 752 Brief in Opposition by Inguran, LLC, and XY, LLC re: #738 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/27/2016 (jls).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 751 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #741 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC (Modl, Michael) Modified on 9/26/2016 (jls).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 750 Brief in Reply by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC in Support of #744 Motion to Seal, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Redactions, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of Dkt. 710, #3 Exhibit B - Redacted Version of Dkt. 715, #4 Exhibit C - Redacted Version of Dkt. 712, #5 Exhibit D - Redacted Version of Dkt. 709, #6 Exhibit E - Redacted Version of Dkt. 713, #7 Exhibit F - Redacted Version of Dkt. 718, #8 Exhibit G - Redacted Version of Dkt. 714, #9 Exhibit H - Redacted Version of Dkt. 719, #10 Exhibit I - Redacted Version of Dkt. 717, #11 Exhibit J - Redacted Version of Dkt. 729, #12 Exhibit K - Redacted Version of Dkt. 722, #13 Exhibit L - Redacted Version of Dkt. 726, #14 Exhibit M - Redacted Version of Dkt. 731) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/18/2016. (lak)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 749 Redaction to #727 Brief in Opposition, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 748 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #746 Motion for Leave to File, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Modl, Michael)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 747 Redaction to #745 Brief in Opposition to Inguran's Motion to Seal Portions of the Trial Court Record by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 746 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to ABS Global, Inc.'s Motion for Permanent Injunction (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Inguran's Surreply in Opposition to ABS Global, Inc.'s Motion for Permanent Injunction) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 9/13/2016. (lak) Motion unsealed at the request of counsel . Modified on 9/13/2016 (voc).
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 745 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #744 Motion to Seal, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 744 Motion to Seal Portions of the Trial Court Record by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Zylstra, Sarah)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Statement of Requested Redactions to #713 Transcript, #722 Transcript, #718 Transcript, #709 Transcript, #710 Transcript, #731 Transcript, #715 Transcript, #719 Transcript, #729 Transcript, #714 Transcript, #726 Transcript, #717 Transcript, #712 Transcript, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted version of Dkt. 710, #2 Exhibit B - Redacted verions of Dkt. 715, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted version of Dkt. 712, #4 Exhibit D - Redacted version of Dkt. 709, #5 Exhibit E - Redacted version of Dkt. 713, #6 Exhibit F - Redacted version of Dkt. 718, #7 Exhibit G - Redacted version of Dkt. 714, #8 Exhibit H - Redacted version of Dkt. 719, #9 Exhibit I - Redacted version of Dkt. 717, #10 Exhibit J - Redacted version of Dkt. 729, #11 Exhibit K - Redacted version of Dkt. 722, #12 Exhibit L - Redacted version of Dkt. 726, #13 Exhibit M - Redacted version of Dkt. 731) (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 742 Brief in Support of #741 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 741 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 9/23/2016. Brief in Reply due 10/3/2016. (O'Neill, Kirt)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 740 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC re: #738 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Draft of the Court's Closing Liability Instructions Sent on 7/27/16, #2 Exhibit B - Draft of the Court's Closing Liability Instructions Sent on 8/5/16) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 9/5/2016. (lak)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 739 Brief in Support of #738 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, and Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 738 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW and Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Brief in Opposition due 9/23/2016. Brief in Reply due 10/3/2016. (Modl, Michael)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 737 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC in Support of #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction. (Modl, Michael)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 736 Unopposed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT under Rule 54(b) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 735 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #729 Transcript, #726 Transcript, #731 Transcript. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 734 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #722 Transcript. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 733 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #720 Transcript, #717 Transcript. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 732 Declaration of Clayton N. Matheson filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Karim Bitar, #2 Exhibit 2 - ABS Press Release, #3 Exhibit 3 - ABS 4th Amended Initial Disclosures) (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 731 Transcript of Tenth Day of Jury Trial, Afternoon Session, held 8/12/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 730 Transcript of Ninth Day of Jury Trial, held 8/11/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 729 Transcript of Seventh Day of Jury Trial, Afternoon Session, held 8/9/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 728 Disregard. See #732 . Modified on 8/29/2016. (lak)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 727 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 726 **(Sealed Document)** Transcript of Tenth Day of Jury Trial, Morning Session, held 8/12/2016 before District Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (arw) Modified on 4/19/2017. (lak)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 725 Transcript of First Day of Jury Trial, Morning Session, held 8/1/2016 before District Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (arw)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 724 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #719 Transcript, #714 Transcript, #711 Transcript, #713 Transcript, #712 Transcript, #718 Transcript, #709 Transcript, #710 Transcript, #715 Transcript. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 723 **(Sealed Document)** Transcript of Tenth Day of Jury Trial, Morning Session, held 8/12/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (kwf) (Main Document 723 replaced on 8/26/2016) (voc/ls). Modified on 4/19/2017. (lak)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 722 Transcript of Eighth Day of Jury Trial, Afternoon Session, held 8/10/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 721 Transcript of Seventh Day of Jury Trial, Morning Session, held 8/9/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 720 Transcript of Sixth Day of Jury Trial, Afternoon Session, held 8/8/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 719 **(Sealed Document)** Transcript of Fifth Day of Jury Trial, Afternoon Session, held 8/5/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc) Modified on 4/19/2017. (lak)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 718 **(Sealed Document)** Transcript of Fourth Day of Jury Trial, Afternoon Session, held 8/4/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: CS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc) Modified on 4/19/2017. (lak)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 717 **(Sealed Document)** Transcript of Sixth Day of Jury Trial, Morning Session, held 8/8/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (voc) Modified on 4/19/2017. (lak)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 716 Amended Brief in Support of #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. (Modl, Michael)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 715 **(Sealed Document)** Transcript of Jury Trial - 2nd day, PM session, held 8/2/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls) Modified on 4/19/2017. (lak)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 714 **(Sealed Document)** Transcript of Jury Trial - 5th day, AM session, held 8/5/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls) Modified on 4/19/2017. (lak)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 713 Transcript of Jury Trial - 4th day, AM session, held 8/4/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Transcript of Jury Trial - 3rd day, AM session, held 8/3/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 711 Transcript of Jury Trial - 2nd day, AM session, held 8/2/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 710 Transcript of Jury Trial - 1st day, PM session, held 8/1/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 709 Transcript of Jury Trial - 3rd day, held 8/3/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: JLD. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 708 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #662 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. Response to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Certain of ST's Claims (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/18/2016. (lak)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** All briefing schedules on post-trial motions are struck, and the following briefing schedules shall apply: (1) ABS's revised opening brief in support of its motion for a permanent injunction, removing factual citations outside of the trial record, is due by August 19, with ST's response due by August 26 and ABS's reply due by September 2; and (2) JMOL motions are due by September 2, with responses due by September 23 and replies due by October 3. JMOL motions are to include any issues raised in earlier post-trial motions as well. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/17/2016. (jls)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 706 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Response to ABS Global, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief Regarding its Motion for Permanent Injunction. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/18/2016: Linked to the pending motion instead of the brief in support. (lak)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/17/2016 [:10] (skv)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 705 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #663 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Supplemental Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of 8/15/16 Email from Kirt O'Neill to William Baumgartner) (Modl, Michael)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Supplemental Brief in Support of #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Telephone Status Conference: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/17/2016 at 11:30 AM before Judge William M. Conley. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. (voc/mh)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 702 Joint Exhibit List of All Admitted Trial Exhibits by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Zylstra, Sarah) Modified on 8/16/2016. (lak)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 701 Court Exhibits from Jury Trial held before District Judge William M. Conley. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 700 Jury Verdict - Damages. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Jury Verdict - Liability: Special Verdict #4. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 698 Jury Verdict - Liability: Special Verdict #3. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Jury Verdict - Liability: Special Verdict #2. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 696 Jury Verdict - Liability. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 695 Damages Jury Instructions. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 694 Additional Jury Instructions on Liability. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 693 Deliberation Jury Instructions. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 692 Liability Jury Instructions. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 691 Introductory Jury Instructions. (voc)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 690 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 10th Day Jury Trial held on 8/12/2016. [7:21] (Court Reporter LS/CS.) (voc)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 689 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #668 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, #660 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/14/2016. (lak)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 688 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #664 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/14/2016. (lak)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 687 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #679 Notice. ST's Response to ABS's Notice of Objection to Inconsistent Jury Verdict on Patent Issues. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/15/2016. (lak)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 686 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW on ST's Claims for Damages (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Brief in Opposition due 9/2/2016. Brief in Reply due 9/12/2016. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/14/2016. (lak)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 685 Declaration of David C. Thorbahn filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction. (Horowitz, Steven)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Declaration of Joel Groskreutz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction. (Sealed Document) (Horowitz, Steven)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Declaration of Marjorie Faust filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction. (Sealed Document) (Horowitz, Steven)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 682 Declaration of Adam Schilffarth filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction. (Sealed Document) (Horowitz, Steven)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 681 Brief in Support of #680 Motion for Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Horowitz, Steven)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 680 MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Horowitz, Steven)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 679 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. of Objection to Inconsistent Jury Verdict on Patent Issues. (Jorgenson, Matthew) Modified on 8/12/2016. (lak)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 677 Disregard. See #689 . Modified on 8/14/2016. (lak)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 676 Disregard. See #688 . Modified on 8/14/2016. (lak)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Date: 11th Day Jury Trial set for 8/15/2016 at 08:30 AM. (voc)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 678 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 9th Day Jury Trial held on 8/11/2016. Trial continues. [:51] (Court Reporter CS.) (voc)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 674 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #672 Notice. ST's Opposition to ABS's Proposal to Ask the Jury to Explain a Verdict of Material Breach. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/12/2016. (lak)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #671 Notice. ST's Proposed Instruction Regarding the Parties' Damages Theories. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ST's Damages Instructions with Proposed Modifications) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/11/2016. (lak)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 672 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Proposed Special Interrogatory Regarding the Basis for a Finding of Breach of Contract. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/11/2016. (lak)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 671 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Proposed Instruction Regarding the Parties' Damages Theories. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/11/2016: Exhibit A is not attached separately. (lak)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Date: 10th Day Jury Trial set for 8/12/2016 at 08:30 AM. (voc)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 675 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 8th Day Jury Trial held on 8/10/2016. Trial continues. [3:28] (Court Reporter LS.) (voc)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 670 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW That the Asserted Claims of the '987 and '092 Patents are Valid by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 8/31/2016. Brief in Reply due 9/12/2016. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 669 Brief in Support of #668 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (Horowitz, Steven)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 668 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW Memorializing The August 5, 2016 Oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on ABS's Claims, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Brief in Opposition due 8/31/2016. Brief in Reply due 9/12/2016. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/10/2016. (lak)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Date: 9th Day Jury Trial set for 8/11/2016 at 08:30 AM. (voc)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 667 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 7th Day Jury Trial held on 8/9/2016. Trial continues. [7:31] (Court Reporter LS/CS.) (voc)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER denying #429 Motion in Limine (Daubert Motion) to Exclude Certain Testimony of W. Todd Schoettelkotte; denying #432 Motion in Limine (Daubert Motion) to Exclude Certain Testimony of Barry C. Harris; granting in part and denying in part #471 Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Testimony of Jane Tereba; denying #473 Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony of Kevin Murphy; reserving on #474 Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Testimony of Kirit Lezotte ; denying #475 Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude the Damages Opinions of Kevin Murphy, Kirit Lezotte and Jane Tereba. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/9/2016. (jls)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 664 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW That the Liquidated Damages Provision of Section 4(a) of the Parties' 2012 Agreement is Unenforceable by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Brief in Opposition due 8/30/2016. Brief in Reply due 9/9/2016. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/10/2016. (lak)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 663 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW That the Asserted Claims of the '987 and '092 Patents are Invalid by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Brief in Opposition due 8/30/2016. Brief in Reply due 9/9/2016. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/10/2016. (lak)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 662 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW on Certain of ST's Claims by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Brief in Opposition due 8/30/2016. Brief in Reply due 9/9/2016. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/10/2016. (lak)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Date: 8th Day Jury Trial set for 8/10/2016 at 08:30 AM. (voc)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 665 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 6th Day Jury Trial held on 8/8/2016. Trial continues. [7:37] (Court Reporter LS/CS.) (voc)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 661 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC Objections of Genus and ABS Global to the Jury Instructions Proposed by the Court on August 8, 2016. (Horowitz, Steven)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 660 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW (Sealed Document) by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Brief in Opposition due 8/29/2016. Brief in Reply due 9/8/2016. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 659 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re #646 Notice (Other) Response to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus plc's Bench Memorandum on Whether a Monopolist in an Emerging Industry Can Be Liable Under Section 2 of the Sherman Act. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 658 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC ABS and Genus's Proffer of Evidence in Support of '092 Patent Invalidity Under Claim Construction Proposed by ABS and Genus. (Horowitz, Steven)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 655 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC Response to ABS Global, Inc.'s and Genus plc's Proposed Revisions to the Court's Proposed Closing Jury Instructions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ST's Proposed Revisions to Closing Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit 2 - ST's Proposed Revisions to Verdict Form) (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 654 Disregard. See #669 . (Sealed Document) Modified on 8/10/2016. (lak)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 653 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Brief Regarding the Court's Proposed Jury Instructions. (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline to Proposed Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - Redline to Proposed Verdict) (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/10/2016. (lak)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 652 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Bench Memorandum on Why the 2007 XY Acquisition and the 2008 Monsanto Patent Purchase Should Go to the Jury as Part of ABS's Overall Claim That ST Engaged in Unlawful Monopolization. (Sealed Document) (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/10/2016. (lak)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Date: 7th Day Jury Trial set for 8/9/2016 at 08:30 AM. (voc)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 657 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 5th Day Jury Trial held on 8/5/2016. Trial continues. [7:45] (Court Reporter LS/ CS.) (jat)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 651 Trial Brief Written Statement Regarding the Impact of an Antitrust Finding on Their Breach of Contract and Infringement Counterclaims by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC (Zylstra, Sarah)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 650 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re #593 Order, ABS and Genus's Brief on Whether Evidence of the Cross-Elasticity of Demand is Necessary to Prove a Relevant Market Under Seventh Circuit Law. (Horowitz, Steven)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 649 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC Memorandum of Law Concerning Plaintiff ABS Global's Burden to Offer Evidence of Lack of Cross-Elasticity of Demand. (O'Neill, Kirt)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 648 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re #593 Order, ABS and Genus's Statement Regarding the Need for the Jury to Decide Patent and Contract Issues if ABS Prevails on its Monopolization Claim. (Horowitz, Steven)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 647 Transcript of Continued Final Hearing, held 7/29/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 646 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Bench Memorandum on Whether a Monopolist in an Emerging Industry Can be Liable Under Section 2 of the Sherman Act. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/5/2016. (lak)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Trial Date: 6th Day Jury Trial set for 8/8/2016 at 08:30 AM. (jat)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 656 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 4th Day Jury Trial held on 8/5/2016. Trial continues. [7:41] (Court Reporter LS/CS.) (voc)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 645 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 3rd Day Jury Trial held on 8/3/2016. Trial continues. [7:50] (Court Reporter LS/JD.) (voc) (Main Document 645 replaced on 8/4/2016) (voc).
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 644 Transcript of Continued Final Hearing, held 7/28/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER on deposition designations as to Gary Durack. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/4/2016. (KC)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 642 Motion to Bar John Nolan's Proposed Testimony Relating to ST's Confidential Information (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Response due 8/11/2016. (Horowitz, Steven)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 641 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability Concerning Stipulated Claim Elements of the '092 Patent by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Duncan, James)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Date: 5th Day Jury Trial set for 8/5/2016 at 08:30 AM. (voc)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 640 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability. Proposed Special Instruction Regarding Trade Secret Issues by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/4/2016. (lak)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER on deposition designations as to Ian Biggs. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/3/2016. (KC)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 638 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: 2nd Day Jury Trial held on 8/2/2016. Trial continues. [7:21] (Court Reporter LS.) (voc)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Date: 4th Day Jury Trial set for 8/4/2016 at 08:30 AM. (voc)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 637 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. John Nolan Concerning Breach of Confidentiality, Dated April 15, 2016, by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Documents Considered) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/3/2016. (lak)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER on deposition designations as to Ben Verwer, Kenneth Michael Evans, Ryan Christensen, James Wood and Cynthia Ludwig. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/2/2016. (voc)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Date: 3rd Day Jury Trial set for 8/3/2016 at 08:30 AM. (voc)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 635 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Jury Selection and First Day of Trial held on 8/1/2016. Trial continues. [6:31] (Court Reporter LS.) (voc)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 634 Notice by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #629 Response to Order. Response to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Brief on the Court's Proposed Closing Jury Instructions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Texas Pattern Jury Charges - Civil) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/2/2016. (lak)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 633 Notice by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #628 Response to Order. Response to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Proffer as to Exhibits 176-79, 189-94, 196-99 and 202 Relating to the FACS DIVA Prior Art Reference. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/2/2016. (lak)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER on deposition designations as to Andre Barnabe, David Thorbahn and John Pasquesi. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/1/2016. (jls)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Trial Date: 2nd Day Jury Trial set for 8/2/2016 at 08:30 AM. (voc)
July 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 631 Corrected Deposition Designations. Corrected Amended Objections & Counter-Counter Designations to Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Counter Designations by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/1/2016. (lak)
July 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 630 Counter Deposition Designations. Amended Objections & Countercounter-Designations to ABS & Genus PLC's Counter Designations by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/1/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 629 Response re: #612 Scheduling Order. Brief on the Court's Proposed Closing Jury Instructions by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 8/1/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 628 Response re: #612 Scheduling Order. Proffer as to Exhibits 176-79, 189-194, 196-99 and 202 Relating to the FACS DIVA Prior Art References by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc. (Jorgenson, Matthew) Modified on 8/1/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 627 Counter Deposition Designations. Objections and Counter-Counter Designations to Inguran, LLC and XY, Inc.'s Counter-Designations by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Fee, Kevin) Modified on 8/1/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 626 Counter Deposition Designations. Objections and Counter-Counter Designations to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Counter-Designations by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/1/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 625 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz re: #624 Trial Brief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of an 4/21/16 Letter for O'Neill to Baumgartner) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 8/1/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 624 Trial Brief. Response to Inguran's Trial Brief by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 8/1/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** In light of the parties' proposed submission regarding former XY employee Kathy Mean, the court intends to make the following statement to the jury at trial: "ABS hired a former XY employee named Kathy Mean in 2007. Ms. Mean took certain trade secrets when she left XY involving confidential media protocols for sperm sorting. She used those protocols at ABS when she was asked to design media protocols for the GSS technology. By virtue of Ms. Mean's conduct, ABS concedes that it is liable for the misappropriation of ST's trade secret protocols, and that it is accountable for any damages that may have resulted." Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/29/2016. (jls)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER permitting ABS to assert non-infringement defenses with respect to claims 40, 41, 42, 44, and 46 of the '092 patent; Granting ABS's motion in limine No. 14 (dkt. #480 ); Denying ST's motion in limine No. 9 (dkt. #488 ); and Granting in part and denying in part ST's motion in limine No. 3 (dkt. #488 ). Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/29/2016. (jls)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Proposed Jury Instructions - Liability. Proposed Preliminary Jury Instruction re: ABS's Trade Secret Misappropriate re: Kathy Mean by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 8/1/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 620 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #576 Order on Motion in Limine, #610 Notice, #592 Response to Order. Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Supplement to Its Support of Motion In Limine No. 9. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/29/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 619 Proposed Jury Instructions (Proposed Preliminary Instruction Regarding Kathy Mean Misappropriation) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/29/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 618 Notice by Counter Claimants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor Defendant Cytonome/ST, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #612 Scheduling Order. Joint Notice Regarding Exhibits and Objections. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/29/2016. (lak)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephone Conference held on 7/29/2016 [1:35] (Court Reporter LS.) (mfh)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 617 Counter Deposition Designations and Objections to Inguran, LLC and XY, Inc.'s Amended Deposition Designations by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Fee, Kevin)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 616 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #593 Order, #594 Response to Order. Reply in Support of Proffer on Commercial Success for the '092 Patent. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/29/2016: Corrected typo, etc. (lak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 615 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz re: #614 Response to Order/ABS and Genus Response Regarding the Prejudice That Would Result From Barring ABS from Presenting a Non-Infringement Defense on Claims 40-46 of the '092 Patent at Trial, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of a 2/29/16 Letter from James Duncan to Matt Jorgenson) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/29/2016. (lak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 614 Response re: #593 Order/Response Regarding the Prejudice That Would Result From Barring ABS from Presenting a Non-Infringement Defense on Claims 40-46 of the '092 Patent at Trial by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/29/2016. (lak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 613 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #582 Response to Order. Reply in Support of Their Proffer Regarding Patents Owned by ABS. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/29/2016: Corrected typos, etc. (lak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Scheduling Order setting deadlines. Telephonic Conference set for 7/29/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge William M. Conley. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/28/2016. (jls)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 611 Supplemental Expert Report of J. Paul Robinson on Non-Infringement in Response to First Supplemental Expert Report of John Nolan by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/29/2016. (lak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 610 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #605 Notice. Corrected Response to Inguran's Support of Motion in Limine No. 9. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/29/2016. (lak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 609 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #607 Response to Order. ST'S Corrected Statement Regarding a Reduction in the Number of Asserted Patent Claims. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/29/2016. (lak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 608 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC of Proposed Revisions to the Court's Proposed Closing Instructions on Liability. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 7/29/2016. (lak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 607 Response re: #575 Order on Motion in Limine, #593 Order, #572 Order on Motion Requesting Claims Construction, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. ST'S Statement Regarding a Reduction in the Number of Asserted Patent Claims by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/28/2016. (lak)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 605 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC re: #592 Response to Order. Response to ST and XY's Support of Motion in Limine No. 9. (Sealed Document) (Horowitz, Steven)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/1/2016 at 08:00 AM. (jat)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Conference set for 7/29/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge William M. Conley. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. (jls)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Conference set for 8/1/2016 at 08:00 AM. (jls)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Telephone Conference held on 7/28/2016 [2:15] (Court Reporter LS.) (mfh)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 604 Objections to Trial Exhibits. Objections to ABS Global, Inc.'s and Genus PLC's Third Amended Exhibit List by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Objections to Exhibit List) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/28/2016. (lak)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 603 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz re: #602 Response to Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ABS's First Amended Invalidity Contentions) (Horowitz, Steven)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 602 Response re: #576 Order on Motion in Limine. Response to Order on ST's Objection to ABS's Section 282 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 7/28/2016. (lak)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 601 Objections to Trial Exhibits. Objections to ST and XY's Second Amended Exhibit List by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 7/28/2016. (lak)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 600 Counter Deposition Designations to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Amended Deposition Designations by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Objections and Counter- Designations to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Amended Deposition Designations) (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 599 Trial Brief by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 598 Response re: #587 Order on Motion for Clarification by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 597 Response re: #576 Order on Motion in Limine, in Reply to Dkt. 582 by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 596 Transcript of Final Hearing, held 7/26/2016 before Judge William M. Conley. Court Reporter: LS. Please review the court policy regarding electronic transcripts: see #Electronic Transcript Instructions and #Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. (jls)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 595 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz re: #594 Response to Order. Response to Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Response to Inguran, LLC's Profferon Evidence of Commercial Success for the '092 Patent (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of ABS's 7/20/15 Notice of Deposition of Inguran, LLC) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/28/2016. (lak)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 594 Response re: #593 Order. Response to Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Response to Inguran, LLC's Proffer on Evidence of Commercial Success for the '092 Patent by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/28/2016. (lak)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Order on Motions in Limine. The court will hold a telephonic conference at 10:00 am on Thursday, July 28, 2016 to discuss the length of trial, closing liability instructions, individual exhibit objections and expert witness narratives. ABS's counsel to initiate the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/27/2016. (jls)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 592 Response re: #576 Order on Motion in Limine/Brief in Support of Motion in Limine No. 9, by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (Duncan, James) Modified on 7/28/2016. (lak)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 606 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William M. Conley: Final Pretrial Conference held on 7/26/2016. Trial predicted to last 2 weeks. 14 jurors will be called forward. 8 jurors will be empaneled. [2:33]Attention: In the event of a settlement of this matter over the weekend, counsel are advised to contact the Clerk of Court at (608) 287-4875 or the Chief Deputy Clerk at (608) 354-8004. (Court Reporter LS.) (jat)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 591 Third Amended Exhibit List by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Horowitz, Steven) Modified on 7/27/2016. (lak)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Amended Deposition Designations by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. (Horowitz, Steven)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 589 Second Amended Exhibit List by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibit List) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/27/2016. (lak)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Amended Deposition Designations by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #580 Motion for Clarification. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/26/2016. (jls)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Response re: #575 Order on Motion in Limine. Proffer on Evidence of Commercial Success for the '092 Patent by Counter Claimant XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (Duncan, James) Modified on 7/27/2016. (lak)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 585 Brief in Opposition by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimant XY, LLC re: #580 Motion for Clarification, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (Duncan, James)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 584 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC of Proposed Revisions to the Court's Proposed Voir Dire and Introductory Jury Instructions, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ABS Redline to the Court's Orientation Remarks and Voir Dire, #2 Exhibit B - ABS Redline to the Court's Introductory Jury Instructions) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/26/2016. (lak)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 583 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #578 Motion for Clarification filed by Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/26/2016: Linked to the correct Motion for Clarification. (lak)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 Response re: #576 Order on Motion in Limine. Proffer Regarding Patents Owned by ABS, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/26/2016. (lak)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 581 Proposed Jury Instructions. Proposed Special Instruction Regarding Developments in the Case that Occurred Before Trial by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Motion for Clarification re: #572 Order on Motion Requesting Claims Construction, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendant Genus PLC. Response due 8/1/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Order) (Horowitz, Steven)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER denying as moot #441 Motion in Limine ; granting in part and denying in part #472 Motion in Limine Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 07/25/2016. (mfh)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 578 Motion for Clarification re: #575 Order on Motion in Limine Regarding MIL No. 18 by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. Response due 8/1/2016. (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Redaction to #570 Notice. Response to Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Objection to the Designation of Cynthia Ludwig's Deposition Testimony by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc.,Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER granting in part, denying in part and reversing in part #488 Motion in Limine; granting #444 Motion in Limine to Exclude Witness and Documents Disclosed After Close of Discovery; reversing on defendants' objection to ABS's 282 Notice (dkts. #503 and #509 ); and denying #519 Joint Motion for Use of Juror Questionnaire. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/25/2016. (jls)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Set Hearing: Telephonic Conference set for 7/28/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge William M. Conley. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5087. (jls)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and reserving in part #480 Plaintiff's Motions in Limine. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 07/22/2016. (mfh)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 574 First Amended Exhibit List by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Exhibit List) (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/27/2016: See #589 for Second Amended Exhibit List. (lak)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Second Amended Exhibit List by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/27/2016: See #591 for Third Amended Exhibit List. (lak)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #382 Motion Requesting Claims Construction; granting in part and denying in part #246 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #235 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/21/2016. (jls)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Notice by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC Regarding Status of Contested Exhibits. (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #512 Objections to Rule 26(a)(3) Designations. Response to Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Objection to the Designation of Cynthia Ludwig's Deposition Testimony. (Sealed Document) (Modl, Michael)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz re: #568 Notice of ABS Global's and Genus PLC's Response to Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Objection to the Designation of Dr. James C. Wood's Deposition Testimony, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of a CV for Dr. James C. Wood) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/21/2016. (lak)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC re: #515 Objections to Rule 26(a)(3) Designations. Response to Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Objection to the Designation of Dr. James C. Wood's Deposition Testimony. (Modl, Michael)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 567 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill filed by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #546 Motion to Preclude Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC from Relitigating an Issue Resolved Against Them in the Final Judgment From the Trans Ova Litigation, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - XY, LLC v. Trans Ova Genetics, LC, Order on Post-Trial Motions) (Zylstra, Sarah) Modified on 7/19/2016. (lak)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Brief in Opposition by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC re: #546 Motion to Preclude Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC from Relitigating an Issue Resolved Against Them in the Final Judgment From the Trans Ova Litigation, filed by ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Zylstra, Sarah) Modified on 7/19/2016. (lak)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 565 Deposition Designations. Objections to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Deposition Counter-Designations by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 564 Deposition Designations. Objections to the Counter-Designations of ST and XY's Deposition Designations and Stipulated Corrections to Both Sides' Designations by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 563 Amended Witness List by Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (O'Neill, Kirt) Modified on 7/18/2016. (lak)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 562 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz re: #561 Notice, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Ccopy of ABS and Genus's Second Amended Invalidity Contentions, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of ABS and Genus's First Amended Invalidity Contentions, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of PTAB's Final Written Decision in IPR2014-01161) (Modl, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Notice by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC, Genus PLC re: #509 Notice. Response to Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC's Objections to ABS Global, Inc. and Genus PLC's Sec. 282 Notice. (Modl, Michael)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Redaction to #538 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Redaction to #537 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 558 Redaction to #526 Declaration, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidential; Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - Confidential; Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of Trans Ova Verdict Form, #4 Exhibit D - Copy of Complaint from XY, LLC v. Trans Ova Genetics, #5 Exhibit E - Confidential; Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit F - Copy of ST's Medial Release, #7 Exhibit G - Confidential; Filed Under Seal) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/14/2016. (lak)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Redaction to #525 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc. Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 556 Redaction to #535 Declaration, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants BS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidential; Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - Confidential; Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - Inguran's Fourth Supplemental Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D - Inguran's Objections to ABS's Seventh Set of Interrogatories) (Modl, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Redaction to #521 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 554 Redaction to #533 Declaration, by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidential; Filed Under Seal) (Modl, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 553 Redaction to #532 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Redaction to #529 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Redaction to #547 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidential; Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit B - Confidential; Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit C - Verdict Form in XY, LLC v. Trans Ova Genetics, #4 Exhibit D - Copy of the Final Judgment Entered in XY, LLC v. Trans Ova Genetics) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/14/2016. (lak)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 550 Redaction to #546 Motion to Preclude Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC from Relitigating an Issue Resolved Against Them in the Final Judgment From the Trans Ova Litigation (Sealed Document) by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC. (Modl, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** For the convenience of the court, the final pretrial conference is rescheduled to July 26, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 7/13/2016. (jls)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Redaction to #530 Declaration of Kirt S. O'Neill by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Confidential Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Confidential Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Confidential Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Confidential Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Confidential Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - XY, LLC's Website Home Page) (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 548 Redaction to #528 Brief in Opposition to ABS and Genus's Motions in Limine by Counter Claimants Inguran, LLC, XY, LLC, Defendant Inguran, LLC, Third Party Plaintiff Inguran, LLC, Intervenor XY, LLC. (Zylstra, Sarah)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 Declaration of Steven J. Horowitz filed by Plaintiff ABS Global, Inc., Counter Defendants ABS Global, Inc., Genus PLC, re: #546 Motion to Preclude Inguran, LLC and XY, LLC from Relitigating an Issue Resolved Against Them, (Sealed Document) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Stock Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Maurice Rosenstein to David Faber, #3 Exhibit C - Verdict Form in XY, LLC v. Trans Ova Genetics, #4 Exhibit D - Copy of the Final Judgment Entered in XY, LLC v. Trans Ova Genetics) (Modl, Michael) Modified on 7/13/2016. (lak)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order