March 20, 2024 |
Filing
617
ORDER granting 616 Joint Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/20/2024. (lam)
|
August 1, 2022 |
Filing
600
ORDER on restitution, civil penalties, and permanent injunctive relief. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/1/2022. (jls)
|
December 5, 2019 |
Filing
435
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Docketing Statement, Judgment, Amended Judgment and Docket Sheet to Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals re: 433 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Docketing Statement, # 2 Judgment, # 3 Amended Judgment, # 4 Docket Sheet) (lak)
|
November 5, 2019 |
Filing
420
JUDGMENT in favor of Consumer Financial Protection Bureau against The Mortgage Law Group, LLP, Jason E. Searns, Jeffrey J. Aleman, Thomas G. Macey, Consumer First Legal Group, LLC, Harold E. Stafford in the amount of $59,003,271.78. (WMC /PAO)
|
November 4, 2019 |
Filing
419
ORDER on restitution and disgorgement, civil penalties, and permanent injunctive relief. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/4/2019. (jls)
|
November 15, 2018 |
Filing
409
ORDER deciding remaining factual issues after court trial and providing briefing for damages and injunctive relief. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 11/15/2018. (mfh/jls)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing
360
ORDER denying 257 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 4/20/2017. (voc)
|
July 20, 2016 |
Filing
191
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties have until August 2, 2016 to meet, confer and submit a proposed trial plan in writing. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/10/2016 at 01:00 PM before Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5447. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/20/2016. (jls)
|
May 13, 2016 |
Filing
190
ORDER reinstating 83 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT solely with respect to the questions whether defendants violated Regulation O and the Consumer Protection Act, whether the individual defendants are liable for those violations and what remedies are potentially available; reinstating 96 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT solely with respect to the issue of the individual liability of defendants Macey and Stafford; and denying 188 plaintiff's request for supplemental briefing. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/13/2016. (jls)
|
April 21, 2016 |
Filing
187
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting with respect to the partial invalidation of Regulation O and denying with respect to the qualification of defendants The Mortgage Law Group and Consumer First Legal Group for the attorney exemption in the Consumer Financial Protection Act, 12 U.S.C. § 5517(e), and Regulation O, 12 C.F.R. § 1015.7. Denying with prejudice with respect to the individual liability of defendants Macey and Stafford; Denying 83 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to the validity of Regulation O and the corporate defendants' failure to qualify for the attorney exemption in the Consumer Protection Act, 12 U.S.C. § 5517(e), and Regulation O, 12 C.F.R.  7; 1015.7 and denying without prejudice in all other respects. The parties shall have until May 6, 2016 to inform the court whether they wish to renew their motions for summary judgment with respect to any of the issues raised in their motions that the court denied without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/21/2016. (jls)
|
January 14, 2016 |
Filing
144
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted only to the extent that the court finds 12 C.F .R. §§ 1015.7(a)(3) and (b) to be invalid. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is granted only to the extent that defendants have the burden of proving that they qualify for the attorney exemption in the Consumer Financial Protecti on Act, 12 U.S.C. § 5517(e), and Regulation O, 12 C.F.R. § 1015.7, to the extent that the exemption in the regulation remains valid. Defendants have until 2/5/2016 to file a supplemental brief in support of their motion for summary judgment , plaintiff has until 2/19/2016 to respond, and defendants have until 2/26/2016 to reply. The deadlines for Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures and motions in limine, the 2/4/2016 Final Pretrial Conference, and the 2/16/2016 trial date are stricken. The court will set new deadlines for the remainder of this case, including the parties' renewed motions for summary judgment, after it resolves the outstanding issues concerning the validity of Regulation O. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/14/2016. (arw)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing
34
ORDER denying 17 Motion to Abstain. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/21/14. (rep)
|