Cose, Roger v. Schrubbe, Belinda et al

Plaintiff: Roger Allen Cose
Defendant: Belinda Schrubbe, Mary Gorske and Charles Larson
Case Number: 3:2014cv00540
Filed: August 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Chippewa
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Presiding Judge: James D. Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying plaintiff Roger Cose's motion for transcription of the preliminary pretrial conference at government expense pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 753(f) without prejudice to Cose's renewing his motion accompanied by a statement explaining how the transcript is relevant to the issues he intends to raise on appeal. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/15/2018. (jef),(ps)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 68 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds; granting 75 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Roger Cose may have until May 16, 2018, to submit a check or money order made payable to the clerk of court in the amount of $22.22 as an initial partial payment for his appeal. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/20/2018. (jef),(ps)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants dismissing this case. Signed by Peter A. Oppeneer, Clerk of Court on 2/12/2018. (jef),(ps)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying plaintiff's 21 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 10/3/2016. (jef),(ps)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 4/18/2016. (jef),(ps)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 11 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/5/2016. (jef),(ps)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing 1 complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. Amended complaint due 12/7/2015. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/13/2015. (jef),(ps)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Initial Order for Paid Pro Se: Plaintiff complaint taken under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/4/2014. (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cose, Roger v. Schrubbe, Belinda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Allen Cose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Schrubbe
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Gorske
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Larson
Represented By: Corey Francis Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?