Phiffer, Earl v. Hepp, Randall
Petitioner: Earl D. Phiffer
Respondent: Randall Hepp
Case Number: 3:2014cv00573
Filed: August 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Petitioner Earl Phiffer's motion for reconsideration, dkt. # 8 , is GRANTED and the October 21, 2014, judgment is VACATED. Phiffer's petition for a writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED for petitioner's failure to obtain the au thorization required by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3)(A). This court has no authority to consider it. No certificate of appealability shall issue. The clerk of court is directed to enter an amended judgment accordingly. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/30/2014. (jef),(ps)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT entered denying petitioner Earl D. Phiffer's petition for a writ of habeas corpus under U.S.C. § 2254. (PAO/nln). (nln),(ps)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying petitioner's request to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Petitioner to submit $5 filing fee or Trust fund account statement. ($5 fee or Trust Fund Account Statement due 9/15/2014. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/25/2014. (jef),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phiffer, Earl v. Hepp, Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randall Hepp
Represented By: Gregory M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Earl D. Phiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?