Woodman's Food Market, Inc. v. The Clorox Company et al

Plaintiff: Woodman's Food Market, Inc.
Defendant: The Clorox Company and The Clorox Sales Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv00734
Filed: October 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Rock
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:13
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 101 Motion for Reconsideration and granting Defendants' 103 Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Appellate Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/13/2015. (jls)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER that plaintiff Woodman's Food Market, Inc.'s 2 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/28/15. (jls)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 63 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; granting 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/27/15. (jls)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 OPINION AND ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/2/15. (jat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodman's Food Market, Inc. v. The Clorox Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodman's Food Market, Inc.
Represented By: Kraig A. Byron
Represented By: John Alan Kassner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clorox Company
Represented By: Stacy Ann Alexejun
Represented By: Rachel Anne Graham
Represented By: Michael Robert Huston
Represented By: Donald Karl Schott
Represented By: Joshua H. Soven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clorox Sales Company
Represented By: Stacy Ann Alexejun
Represented By: Rachel Anne Graham
Represented By: Michael Robert Huston
Represented By: Donald Karl Schott
Represented By: Joshua H. Soven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?